Anthony Ayiomamitis v. Creamy W Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Ayiomamitis
Defendant: Creamy W Group LLC doing business as greekschannel.com, Does 1-10, inclusive and Creamy W Group LLC a Delaware limited liability company, individually doing business as greekschannel.com
Case Number: 2:2023cv02192
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Wesley L Hsu
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-034) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-02192 WLH(AFMx). (rn)
March 28, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis, upon Defendant Creamy W Group LLC served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Creamy W Group LLC individually and d/b/a GreeksChannel.com c/o Legalinc Corporate Services, Inc. - Diane Gibbs (Managing Agent) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
March 27, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Creamy W Group LLC. (jtil)
March 24, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
March 24, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
March 23, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 23, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis, (Burroughs, Scott)
March 23, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35013664 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Anthony Ayiomamitis(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Ayiomamitis v. Creamy W Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ayiomamitis
Represented By: Scott A. Burroughs
Represented By: Frank Trechsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creamy W Group LLC doing business as greekschannel.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creamy W Group LLC a Delaware limited liability company, individually doing business as greekschannel.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?