Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. v. Ashlee Chu Hewitt et al
Plaintiff: MERCER GLOBAL ADVISORS, INC and Mercer Global Advisors Inc.
Defendant: ASHLEE CHU HEWITT, ALAN CHARLES HEWITT, HEWITT ADVISORS, INC. and Hewitt Advisors Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv03659
Filed: May 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Filing 24 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: This matter is currently set for a Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) scheduling conference on June 29, 2023. However, Defendants have filed a motion to dismiss #20 which is set to be heard on August 7, 2023. In light thereof, the scheduling conference is continued to August 7. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 22, 2023 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-9 days, filed by Plaintiff Mercer Global Advisors Inc... (Rigali, Paul)
June 22, 2023 Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The time to appear for the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set on June 29, 2023 is changed from 8:30 a.m. to 11:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 16, 2023 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Causes of Action #20 filed by Defendants Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt, Hewitt Advisors Inc.. (Scheibe, Benjamin)
June 16, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Causes of Action filed by Defendants Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt, Hewitt Advisors Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/7/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin D. Scheibe, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mercer Webpage, #3 Exhibit 2 - TESS Record List Display of 1294, #4 Exhibit 3 - TESS Record List Display of 624, #5 Exhibit 4 - Serial No. 74691300, #6 Exhibit 5 - Serial No. 75039402, #7 Exhibit 6 - Serial No. 86252957, #8 Exhibit 7 - Serial No. 85114778, #9 Exhibit 8 - Serial No. 76310978, #10 Proposed Order) (Scheibe, Benjamin)
June 7, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Bledsoe counsel for Plaintiff Mercer Global Advisors Inc.. Adding Andrew S. Bledsoe as counsel of record for Mercer Global Advisors Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mercer Global Advisors Inc.. (Attorney Andrew Bledsoe added to party Mercer Global Advisors Inc.(pty:pla))(Bledsoe, Andrew)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H. Wu. APPLICATION of Attorney Andrew Walker Gust to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt, Hewitt Advisors Inc., designating Benjamin D. Scheibe as local counsel GRANTED.; GRANTING #17 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Walker Gust (aco)
June 2, 2023 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Walker Gust to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt, Hewitt Advisors Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35425254) filed by Defendants Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt, Hewitt Advisors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scheibe, Benjamin)
May 26, 2023 Filing 16 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt, Hewitt Advisors Inc... (Scheibe, Benjamin)
May 26, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Mercer Global Advisors Inc.. (Rigali, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt, Hewitt Advisors Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 served on May 17, 2023. (Scheibe, Benjamin)
May 18, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mercer Global Advisors Inc., identifying Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. and Mercer Advisors Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. (Rigali, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Mercer Global Advisors Inc., upon Defendant Alan Charles Hewitt acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/16/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Benjamin D. Scheibe, Attorney for Defendant Alan Charles Hewitt. (Rigali, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Mercer Global Advisors Inc., upon Defendant Ashlee Chu Hewitt acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/16/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Benjamin D. Scheibe, Attorney for Defendant Ashlee Chu Hewitt. (Rigali, Paul)
May 17, 2023 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), filed by Defendants Hewitt Advisors Inc., Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt.(Scheibe, Benjamin)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for June 29, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than June 22, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
May 16, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
May 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
May 12, 2023 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Alan Charles Hewitt, Ashlee Chu Hewitt, Hewitt Advisors Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Mercer Global Advisors Inc. ( SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 12, 2023 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Mercer Global Advisors Inc., upon Defendant Hewitt Advisors Inc. served on 4/14/2023, answer due 5/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 12, 2023 Filing 3 (NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ALAN CHARLES HEWITT, ASHLEE CHU HEWITT, HEWITT ADVISORS, INC., identifying Ashlee Chu Hewitt; Alan Charles Hewitt; Hewitt Advisors, Inc.. (Scheibe, Benjamin)
May 12, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ALAN CHARLES HEWITT, ASHLEE CHU HEWITT, HEWITT ADVISORS, INC.. (Scheibe, Benjamin)
May 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 2023CUBC007455 Receipt No: ACACDC-35305009 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants HEWITT ADVISORS, INC., ALAN CHARLES HEWITT, ASHLEE CHU HEWITT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 EXHIBIT B, #4 EXHIBIT C, #5 EXHIBIT D, #6 EXHIBIT E) (Attorney Benjamin D Scheibe added to party ALAN CHARLES HEWITT(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin D Scheibe added to party ASHLEE CHU HEWITT(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin D Scheibe added to party HEWITT ADVISORS, INC.(pty:dft))(Scheibe, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. v. Ashlee Chu Hewitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCER GLOBAL ADVISORS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercer Global Advisors Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony Rigali
Represented By: Andrew Bledsoe
Represented By: Andrew Emilio Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEE CHU HEWITT
Represented By: Benjamin D Scheibe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Scheibe
Represented By: Andrew W. Gust
Represented By: Milin Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN CHARLES HEWITT
Represented By: Benjamin D Scheibe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Scheibe
Represented By: Andrew W. Gust
Represented By: Milin Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEWITT ADVISORS, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin D Scheibe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewitt Advisors Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin D. Scheibe
Represented By: Andrew W. Gust
Represented By: Milin Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?