The Tolkien Trust et al v. Demetrious Polychron
Plaintiff: The Tolkien Trust and The Tolkien Estate Ltd
Defendant: Demetrious Polychron
Case Number: 2:2023cv04300
Filed: June 1, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katie Marie Charleston counsel for Defendant Demetrious Polychron. Adding Katie M. Charleston as counsel of record for Demetrious Polychron for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Demetrious Polychron. (Attorney Katie Marie Charleston added to party Demetrious Polychron(pty:dft))(Charleston, Katie)
June 28, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff The Tolkien Trust, The Tolkien Estate Ltd. upon Demetrious Polychron waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/8/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Katie Charleston. (Karev, Gili)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 23-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-02831 SVW(Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-04300 SVW(Ex). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (rn)
June 6, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by The Tolkien Estate Ltd, The Tolkien Trust. (Karev, Gili)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING #6 Non-Resident Attorney Lacy ("Lance") H Koonce APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs The Tolkien Estate Ltd, The Tolkien Trust, designating Kevin L Vick as local counsel. (jp)
June 5, 2023 Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv)
June 5, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, there was a delay in adding the assigned judges to the docket Re: Add and Terminate Judges (lh)
June 2, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
June 2, 2023 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Demetrious Polychron. (lh)
June 2, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
June 2, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
June 1, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lacy H. Koonce, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs The Tolkien Estate Ltd, The Tolkien Trust (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35419720) filed by plaintiffs The Tolkien Estate Ltd, The Tolkien Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vick, Kevin)
June 1, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff The Tolkien Estate Ltd, The Tolkien Trust. (Vick, Kevin)
June 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs The Tolkien Estate Ltd, The Tolkien Trust. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-02831-SVW-E (Vick, Kevin)
June 1, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs The Tolkien Estate Ltd, The Tolkien Trust. (Vick, Kevin)
June 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Tolkien Estate Ltd, The Tolkien Trust, (Vick, Kevin)
June 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35419607 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiffs The Tolkien Trust, The Tolkien Estate Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint) (Attorney Kevin L Vick added to party The Tolkien Estate Ltd(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin L Vick added to party The Tolkien Trust(pty:pla))(Vick, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Tolkien Trust et al v. Demetrious Polychron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Tolkien Trust
Represented By: Kevin L Vick
Represented By: Gili Karev
Represented By: Lacy H. Koonce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Tolkien Estate Ltd
Represented By: Kevin L Vick
Represented By: Gili Karev
Represented By: Lacy H. Koonce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrious Polychron
Represented By: Katie Marie Charleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?