Unicolors, Inc. v. Lavish Boutique, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Defendant: Lavish Boutique, LLC, The Rustic Leopard, 7 Islands Fashion, Inc., Desaree Marie Corporation, Jinnah Group, LLC, Della Direct, LLC, Hampton Point Boutique, LLC, Clotho J&J USA, Streamline Remarketing, Inc., Monroe & Main, Inc., Silkroll, Inc., Rose Swimsuits, DOES 1 through 10, Desaree Marie Corporation a Virginia corporation doing business as Dash of Sparkle Boutique, Jinnah Group, LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Sushine and Rodeos, Della Direct, LLC a Utah limited liability company doing business as She and Sho Clothing Co., Clotho J and J USA a California corporation Erroneously Sued As CLOTHO J&J USA INC doing business as Collection By Cezelle, Streamline Remarketing, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Maya Antonia and Monroe and Main, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv04529
Filed: June 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement as to Streamline Remarketing, Inc. Only filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Barrett, Trevor)
July 20, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #19 (Barrett, Trevor)
July 18, 2023 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Monroe and Main, Inc. served on 7/18/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Cory Schneider/Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified (Barrett, Trevor)
July 18, 2023 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Jinnah Group, LLC served on 7/18/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shela "Doe" (Manager)/Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Barrett, Trevor)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: IMPROPER JOINDER (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing, no later than July 21, 2023, why all but the first named defendant should not be dropped from this case for misjoinder. (lc)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (dbe)
July 13, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Clotho J and J USA, identifying Clotho J&J USA Inc. and Unicolors, Inc.. (Myung, S)
July 13, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Clotho J and J USA.(Attorney S Calvin Myung added to party Clotho J and J USA(pty:dft))(Myung, S)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (dbe)
July 5, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Streamline Remarketing, Inc. served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Legalzoom, Inc. c/o Augle R. (Refused Last Name)/Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Barrett, Trevor)
June 30, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Silkroll, Inc. served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Janet Wu/Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Barrett, Trevor)
June 30, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant The Rustic Leopard served on 6/27/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy Lynn/Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Barrett, Trevor)
June 29, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Clotho J and J USA served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jum Hee Jung c/o Jane Doe (Refused Name)/Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Barrett, Trevor)
June 28, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Hampton Point Boutique, LLC served on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Molly R. Lloyd (Owner) c/o Jane Doe(Mother) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Barrett, Trevor)
June 9, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants 7 Islands Fashion, Inc., Clotho J and J USA, Della Direct, LLC, Desaree Marie Corporation, Hampton Point Boutique, LLC, Jinnah Group, LLC, Lavish Boutique, LLC, Monroe and Main, Inc., Rose Swimsuits, Silkroll, Inc., Streamline Remarketing, Inc., The Rustic Leopard. (et)
June 9, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
June 9, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
June 8, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Barrett, Trevor)
June 8, 2023 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Barrett, Trevor)
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Barrett, Trevor)
June 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Barrett, Trevor)
June 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35462266 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attorney Trevor William Barrett added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Barrett, Trevor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicolors, Inc. v. Lavish Boutique, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Frank Trechsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavish Boutique, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rustic Leopard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 Islands Fashion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desaree Marie Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinnah Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Della Direct, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton Point Boutique, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clotho J&J USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streamline Remarketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe & Main, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silkroll, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Swimsuits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desaree Marie Corporation a Virginia corporation doing business as Dash of Sparkle Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinnah Group, LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Sushine and Rodeos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Della Direct, LLC a Utah limited liability company doing business as She and Sho Clothing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clotho J and J USA a California corporation Erroneously Sued As CLOTHO J&J USA INC doing business as Collection By Cezelle
Represented By: S Calvin Myung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streamline Remarketing, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Maya Antonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe and Main, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?