Arch Insurance Group v. Volvo Group North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Group
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, Inc., Cottrell, East Coast Truck & Trailer Sales, PACCAR dba Peterbilt Motors Company, East Coast Truck and Trailer Sales, PACCAR doing business as Peterbilt Motors Company and Does 1 through 30, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv05845
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. To date, Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint with adequate jurisdictional allegations. Accordingly, the Court closes this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
July 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon was assigned to the case in error. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero is now assigned to the case. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-05845 ODW(MAAx). (rn)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff asserts federal subject matter jurisdiction on the basis of diversity pursuant to 28 USC 1332(a). Plaintiff alleges that Defendant "Volvo Group North America, Inc. is a Delaware Corporation." However, this allegation is insufficient to establish Defendant Volvo's citizenship, and therefore Plaintiff's allegations areinsufficient to establish this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint, with leave to amend the jurisdictional allegations within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Failure to file a timely amended complaint that includes adequate jurisdictional allegations in light of the authorities above will be deemed a concession by Plaintiff that diversity jurisdiction is lacking, and the Court will close this case. (lc)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cottrell, East Coast Truck and Trailer Sales, PACCAR, Volvo Group North America, Inc. (et)
July 20, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
July 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
July 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Group, (Evans, Neil)
July 19, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Arch Insurance Group. (Evans, Neil)
July 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Group. (Evans, Neil)
July 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35700679 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Arch Insurance Group. (Attorney Neil C Evans added to party Arch Insurance Group(pty:pla))(Evans, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arch Insurance Group v. Volvo Group North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Group
Represented By: Neil C Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Coast Truck & Trailer Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR dba Peterbilt Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Coast Truck and Trailer Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR doing business as Peterbilt Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?