Sara Flores Bernal v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Sara Flores Bernal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2023cv07768
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV23-7768 MRW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Request is GRANTED. (iv)
September 25, 2023 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Pena, Jonathan)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 Text Only Entry - IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: The parties are directed to comply with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions (effective Dec. 1, 2022). See Judge Wilner's posted procedures at the Court's website for more information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh)
September 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Pena, Jonathan)
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sara Flores Bernal. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support Sara Flores Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pena, Jonathan)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request. (Attorney Jonathan Omar Pena added to party Sara Flores Bernal (pty:pla))(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sara Flores Bernal v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Flores Bernal
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?