Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP v. Diaz
Plaintiff: Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP
Defendant: Ulises Pizano Diaz and Ulises Pizano-Diaz
Case Number: 2:2023cv08299
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 17 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ulises Pizano-Diaz, (Welch, Kevin)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for December 18, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than December 11, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. Pursuant to the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #15 filed on November 13, 2023, Defendant is to file his Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. (aco)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Ulises Pizano-Diaz.(Attorney Kevin Matthew Welch added to party Ulises Pizano-Diaz(pty:dft))(Welch, Kevin)
October 30, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP, upon Defendant Ulises Pizano-Diaz served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kalle E. Mikkola - Attorney/Authorized to Accept on Behalf in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed (Paris, Louise Jillian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
October 4, 2023 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ulises Pizano-Diaz. (lh)
October 4, 2023 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 4, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 4, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh)
October 3, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP. (Paris, Louise Jillian)
October 3, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Louise Jillian Gatchalian Paris counsel for Plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP. Adding Ariana Santoro as counsel of record for Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP. (Paris, Louise Jillian)
October 3, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Louise Jillian Gatchalian Paris counsel for Plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP. Adding Omid E. Khalifeh as counsel of record for Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP. (Paris, Louise Jillian)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP, (Paris, Louise Jillian)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP. (Paris, Louise Jillian)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP. (Paris, Louise Jillian)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36153691 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Louise Jillian Gatchalian Paris added to party Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP(pty:pla))(Paris, Louise Jillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP v. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yagoubzadeh Law Firm LLP
Represented By: Louise Jillian Gatchalian Paris
Represented By: Louise Jillian Paris
Represented By: Ariana Santoro
Represented By: Omid Emile Khalifeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulises Pizano Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulises Pizano-Diaz
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?