Steven Howse et al v. Chiquita Canyon, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Howse, Christian Olaguez, Sarah Olaguez, Elizabeth Leal-Perez, Holly Kaufmann, Amy Knoles, Steven Lee, Christina Orellana, Guillermo Orellana, Fran Cantella, Vincent Cantella, Romeo Walter Centeno, Amber Enzen, Wendy Davila, Susan M. Evans, Lioness-Sia Kamara, Daryl Kratz, Tracy Sequeira, Carmen Gonzalez, Gavin Tate, Natalie Tate, Parker Tate, Thomas Tate, Alicia Hernandez, Sue Hernandez and Ron Cunningham
Defendant: Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Los Angeles County and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv08380
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Filing 35 Mail Returned addressed to Dylan Hackett re Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #26 (yl)
November 27, 2023 Filing 34 Notice of Intent to file First Amended Complaint filed by plaintiffs Steven Howse. (Sethi, Rahul)
November 24, 2023 Filing 33 REPLY SUPPORT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Plaintiff Steven Howse. (Orchid, Oshea)
November 17, 2023 Filing 32 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Defendant Chiquita Canyon, LLC. (Chan, Paul)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS (ECF No. #29 ) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from February 8, 2024 to April 25, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 14, 2023 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Chiquita Canyon, LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Strike the Class Allegations #29 served on November 14, 2023. (Chan, Paul)
November 13, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Strike the Class Allegations filed by Defendant Chiquita Canyon, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chan, Paul)
November 8, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dusan Pavlovic counsel for Defendant Los Angeles County. Adding Dusan Pavlovic as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Dusan Pavlovic added to party Los Angeles County(pty:dft))(Pavlovic, Dusan)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #20 #24 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., and Los Angeles County, designating Paul S Chan as local counsel. Granting #20 #24 Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. Marzec Morgan (rolm)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #19 #23 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., and Los Angeles County, designating Paul S Chan as local counsel. Granting #19 #23 Non-Resident Attorney James B. Slaughter (rolm)
November 7, 2023 Filing 27 Mail Returned addressed to Dylan Hackett re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 12 (rolm)
November 6, 2023 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. Marzec Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/3/2023, Receipt No. 36349783) filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chan, Paul)
November 6, 2023 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/3/2023, Receipt No. 36349880) filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chan, Paul)
November 6, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice F #19 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. Marzec Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc. (Pro Hac Vi #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
November 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Steven Howse. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Orchid, Oshea)
November 3, 2023 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. Marzec Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36349880) filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chan, Paul)
November 3, 2023 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36349783) filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chan, Paul)
November 3, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shoshana E Bannett counsel for Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. Adding Shoshana E. Bannett as counsel of record for Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., and Waste Connections US, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., and Waste Connections US, Inc.. (Attorney Shoshana E Bannett added to party Chiquita Canyon, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shoshana E Bannett added to party Waste Connections Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shoshana E Bannett added to party Waste Connections US, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shoshana E Bannett added to party Waste Connections of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bannett, Shoshana)
November 3, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aharon Kaslow counsel for Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. Adding Aharon B. Kaslow as counsel of record for Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., and Waste Connections US, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., and Waste Connections US, Inc.. (Attorney Aharon Kaslow added to party Chiquita Canyon, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Aharon Kaslow added to party Waste Connections Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aharon Kaslow added to party Waste Connections US, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aharon Kaslow added to party Waste Connections of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kaslow, Aharon)
November 3, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul S Chan counsel for Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. Adding Paul S. Chan as counsel of record for Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., and Waste Connections US, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., and Waste Connections US, Inc.. (Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Chiquita Canyon, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Waste Connections Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Waste Connections US, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party Waste Connections of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chan, Paul)
November 3, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel A Neuman counsel for Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. Adding Ariel A. Neuman as counsel of record for Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., and Waste Connections US, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections of California, Inc., Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., and Waste Connections US, Inc.. (Attorney Ariel A Neuman added to party Chiquita Canyon, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ariel A Neuman added to party Waste Connections Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ariel A Neuman added to party Waste Connections US, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ariel A Neuman added to party Waste Connections of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Neuman, Ariel)
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Chiquita Canyon, LLC, re Notice (Other) #13 of Civil Standing Order served on 10/27/2023. (Duginski, Jacob)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Civil Standing Order filed by DEFENDANT Chiquita Canyon, LLC. (Duginski, Jacob)
October 20, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibility of the parties to maintain familiarity with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Chiquita Canyon, LLC, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on 10-11-2023. (Duginski, Jacob)
October 10, 2023 Filing 10 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chiquita Canyon, LLC answer now due 11/10/2023, filed by Defendant Chiquita Canyon, LLC.(Duginski, Jacob)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. Morgan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James B. Slaughter. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil)
October 4, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Lioness-Sia Kamara, Christian Olaguez, Natalie Tate, Romeo Walter Centeno, Amber Enzen, Sue Hernandez, Vincent Cantella, Parker Tate, Gavin Tate, Thomas Tate, Guillermo Orellana, Susan M. Evans, Carmen Gonzalez, Holly Kaufmann, Ron Cunningham, Amy Knoles, Daryl Kratz, Christina Orellana, Tracy Sequeira, Alicia Hernandez, Steven Howse, Elizabeth Leal-Perez, Steven Lee, Fran Cantella, Sarah Olaguez, Wendy Davila in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/25/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 served on 10/04/2023. (Duginski, Jacob)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc., identifying Chiquita Canyon, Inc.; Waste Connections US Holdings, Inc.; Great American E&S Insurance Company; Evanston Insurance Company; Beazley USA Services, Inc.; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; Waste Connections, Inc.. (Duginski, Jacob)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections of California, Inc.. (Duginski, Jacob)
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, case number 23STCV20524 Receipt No: ACACDC-36166146 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Waste Connections of California, Inc., Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections Management Services, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Attorney Jacob Paul Duginski added to party Chiquita Canyon, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Paul Duginski added to party Waste Connections Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Paul Duginski added to party Waste Connections US, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Paul Duginski added to party Waste Connections of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Duginski, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Howse et al v. Chiquita Canyon, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Howse
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Olaguez
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Olaguez
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Leal-Perez
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Kaufmann
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Knoles
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lee
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Orellana
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Orellana
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Cantella
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Cantella
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo Walter Centeno
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Enzen
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Davila
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Evans
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lioness-Sia Kamara
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Kratz
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Sequeira
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Gonzalez
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin Tate
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Tate
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Tate
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tate
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Hernandez
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Hernandez
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Cunningham
Represented By: Oshea V Orchid
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Shelby Miner
Represented By: Dylan Hackett
Represented By: Vasili George Brasinikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Canyon, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Paul Duginski
Represented By: Ariel A Neuman
Represented By: Aharon Kaslow
Represented By: James B. Slaughter
Represented By: Megan L. Marzec Morgan
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Shoshana E Bannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Connections of California, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Paul Duginski
Represented By: Gary J. Smith
Represented By: Aharon Kaslow
Represented By: Ariel A Neuman
Represented By: James B. Slaughter
Represented By: Megan L. Marzec Morgan
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Shoshana E Bannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Connections Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Paul Duginski
Represented By: Gary J. Smith
Represented By: Aharon Kaslow
Represented By: James B. Slaughter
Represented By: Ariel A Neuman
Represented By: Megan L. Marzec Morgan
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Shoshana E Bannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Connections US, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Paul Duginski
Represented By: Aharon Kaslow
Represented By: Gary J. Smith
Represented By: Ariel A Neuman
Represented By: James B. Slaughter
Represented By: Megan L. Marzec Morgan
Represented By: Paul S Chan
Represented By: Shoshana E Bannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County
Represented By: Dusan Pavlovic
Represented By: James B. Slaughter
Represented By: Megan L. Marzec Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?