Noe Moreno v. Brian Cates
Petitioner: Noe Moreno
Respondent: Brian Cates
Case Number: 2:2023cv08676
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Return to Habeas Petition (2254) #9 (Attachments: #1 Lodged Doc. 1, Vol. I, #2 Lodged Doc. 1, Vol. II, #3 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. I, #4 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. II, #5 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. III, #6 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. IV, #7 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. V, #8 Lodged Doc. 2, Vol. VI, #9 Lodged Doc. 3, #10 Lodged Doc. 4, #11 Lodged Doc. 5, #12 Lodged Doc. 6, #13 Lodged Doc. 7, #14 Lodged Doc. 8, #15 Lodged Doc. 9, #16 Lodged Doc. 10, #17 Lodged Doc. 11, #18 Lodged Doc. 12)(Tetef, Herbert)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Respondent Brian Cates.(Tetef, Herbert)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Granting #3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. (rolm)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Herbert S. Tetef on behalf of Respondent Brian Cates. (Attorney Herbert S Tetef added to party Brian Cates(pty:res))(Tetef, Herbert)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. That Respondent Brian Cates file Answer to the Petition not later than 12/4/2023. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 11/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (mba)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #1 Filing missing last page. The document has been replaced with a corrected version. (lro)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees filed by Petitioner Noe Moreno. (car)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Noe Moreno. The Petitioner does not consent. (car)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early.(Filing fee $ 5. Due), filed by Petitioner Noe Moreno. (car) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/19/2023) (lro).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noe Moreno v. Brian Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Noe Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Cates
Represented By: Herbert S Tetef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?