Carl Alfred Alexander v. Martin O'Malley
Plaintiff: Carl Alfred Alexander
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Martin O'Malley
Case Number: 2:2023cv09736
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SUBSTITUTING CURRENT COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION AS DEFENDANT by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Commissioner Martin O'Malley is hereby substituted as the Defendant in this action. (hr)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV23-9736 AS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 8, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tarn, Jennifer)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO EXTENDTHE SCHEDULE IN THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #7 . IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have an extension until February 15, 2024 to file the Answer and file and serve the certified administrative record, with all other dates extended accordingly. (et)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kilolo Kijakazi answer now due 2/15/2024, filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Carl Alfred Alexander. (Cho, Young)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (IN CHAMBERS) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for details) (hr)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carl Alfred Alexander, (Cho, Young)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carl Alfred Alexander. (Cho, Young)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36421871 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Carl Alfred Alexander. (Attorney Young Chul Cho added to party Carl Alfred Alexander (pty:pla))(Cho, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carl Alfred Alexander v. Martin O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Alfred Alexander
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?