Mark Viniello et al v. Catalonia Fashion
Plaintiff: MARK VINIELLO and OVER ACTIVE IMAGINATIONS, INC.
Defendant: CATALONIA FASHION and LIDERSTAR
Case Number: 2:2023cv09759
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephanie S Christensen
Referring Judge: Wesley L Hsu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #13 as to Defendant Catalonia Fashion. (lom)
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #13 filed by plaintiff Over Active Imaginations, Inc., Mark Viniello. (Murthy, Karthik)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Catalonia Fashion amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by plaintiff Mark Viniello, Over Active Imaginations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Murthy, Karthik)
December 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Mark Viniello, Over Active Imaginations, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Liderstar. (Murthy, Karthik)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc)
November 19, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Over Active Imaginations, Inc., Mark Viniello, identifying Steve Johnson, Karthik K. Murthy, Murthy Patent Law Inc., Michal Liderstar. (Murthy, Karthik)
November 19, 2023 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Over Active Imaginations, Inc., Mark Viniello. (Murthy, Karthik)
November 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
November 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
November 19, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (lh)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs OVER ACTIVE IMAGINATIONS, INC., MARK VINIELLO. (Murthy, Karthik)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36424743 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff MARK VINIELLO, OVER ACTIVE IMAGINATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit) (Attorney Karthik Krishna Murthy added to party OVER ACTIVE IMAGINATIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Karthik Krishna Murthy added to party MARK VINIELLO(pty:pla))(Murthy, Karthik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark Viniello et al v. Catalonia Fashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK VINIELLO
Represented By: Karthik Krishna Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OVER ACTIVE IMAGINATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Karthik Krishna Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATALONIA FASHION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIDERSTAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?