Gullermo Alfredo Valle Santana v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Guillermo A Valle Santana and Guillermo A. Valle Santana
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2023cv10015
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, DKT. #3 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Plaintiff has not manifested an inability to articulate his claims pro se. Furthermore, Plaintiff has not demonstrated a likelihood of success on the merits at this early stage of the proceedings. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Request for Counsel, Dkt. #3 is DENIED, without prejudice. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR DETAILS. (vam)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi, re Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final #9 served on 12/13/2023. (Marriott, Michael)
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Marriott, Michael)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael K Marriott counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Michael Marriott as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT Commissioner of Social Security. (Marriott, Michael)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael K Marriott counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Michael Marriott as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: The parties are directed to follow 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) ("Supplemental Rules") for the procedures for pleading, serving, and litigating this action. Any issue not raised in the briefing may be deemed to have been waived. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (et)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) #2 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (lc)
December 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION TO APPOINT PRO BONO COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Guillermo A Valle Santana. (car)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Guillermo A Valle Santana. (car)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Case assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, filed by Plaintiff Guillermo A Valle Santana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gullermo Alfredo Valle Santana v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo A Valle Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo A. Valle Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?