Kenneth Martinez v. ABM Industry Groups LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Martinez
Defendant: ABM, ABM Industry Groups LLC and Does 1-10 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv10687
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SUBMITTING ALL ISSUES TO ARBITRATION by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, re Stipulation for Order #20 . The final and binding arbitration shall be conducted using the California Civil Code, California Evidence Code, and the California Code of Civil Procedure as applicable. The Court sets a Status Conference re Status of Arbitration for Wednesday, June 12, 2024 at 10:00 AM. (see document for further details) (hr)
January 30, 2024 Filing 20 First STIPULATION for Order Submitting All Issues to Arbitration filed by Defendant ABM Industry Groups LLC.(Teinert, Paul)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for February 5, 2024 before Judge Wilson is RESET to March 20, 2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kim, and will be held via Zoom videoconference. (see document for further details) (hr)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (hr)
January 29, 2024 Filing 17 CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-10687 SK. (rn)
January 26, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Jointly re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #12 (Teinert, Paul)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 2/5/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant ABM Industry Groups LLC.(Teinert, Paul)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 27, 2023 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (sh)
December 21, 2023 CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants ABM Industry Groups LLC, Does. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Martinez. [FILED IN STATE COURT 10/30/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
December 21, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant ABM, re Notice (Other) #7 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Disclosure #5 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 , Notice (Other) #6 , Notice (Other) #8 , Declaration #4 , Declaration #3 served on 12-21-2023. (Teinert, Paul)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ABM. (Teinert, Paul)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Counsel Kaitlin J. Hall filed by Defendant ABM. (Teinert, Paul)
December 21, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Apperance of Counsel Paul M. Teinert filed by Defendant ABM. (Teinert, Paul)
December 21, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ABM (Teinert, Paul)
December 21, 2023 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Allison A. Nelson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant ABM. (Teinert, Paul)
December 21, 2023 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Paul M. Teinert re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant ABM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint)(Teinert, Paul)
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 PETITION Civil Cover Sheet with filing fee previously paid ($405.00 paid on 12-21-2023, receipt number ACACDC-36616548), filed by Defendant ABM.(Teinert, Paul)
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV26491 Receipt No: ACACDC-36616548 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant ABM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint) (Attorney Paul Mitchell Teinert added to party ABM(pty:dft))(Teinert, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Martinez v. ABM Industry Groups LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Martinez
Represented By: Brandon J Sweeney
Represented By: Jonathan J Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM
Represented By: Paul Mitchell Teinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Industry Groups LLC
Represented By: Paul Mitchell Teinert
Represented By: Kaitlin Ji Hae Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?