Eric Doyle et al v. FKA Distributing Co. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Doyle and Gabriel Contreras
Defendant: FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics LLC, Walmart, Inc., FKA Distributing Co. LLC a Michigan limited liability company doing business as Homedics LLC and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv10807
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephanie S Christensen
Referring Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Doyle, Gabriel Contreras, upon Defendant FKA Distributing Co. LLC served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mel Nowak, Managing Agent for Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Wolf, Alexander)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Mark A. Cantor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FKA Distributing Co., LLC, designating Mark Mizrahi as local counsel #13 . (iv)
February 5, 2024 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark A. Cantor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants FKA Distributing Co. LLC, Walmart Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36854074) filed by defendants FKA Distributing Co. LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mizrahi, Mark)
January 24, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Walmart Inc. answer now due 2/26/2024; FKA Distributing Co. LLC answer now due 2/26/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants Walmart Inc.; FKA Distributing Co. LLC.(Attorney Mark B. Mizrahi added to party FKA Distributing Co. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark B. Mizrahi added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Mizrahi, Mark)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Doyle, Gabriel Contreras, upon Defendant Walmart Inc. served on 1/4/2024, answer due 1/25/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nadia Bellamy, Agent for Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Wolf, Alexander)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (iv)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants FKA Distributing Co. LLC, Walmart Inc.. (sh)
December 28, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (sh)
December 27, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Gabriel Contreras, Eric Doyle. (Wolf, Alexander)
December 27, 2023 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Eric Doyle and Gabriel Contreras re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 CLRA Venue Declaration filed by Plaintiffs Gabriel Contreras, Eric Doyle. (Wolf, Alexander)
December 27, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Gabriel Contreras, Eric Doyle, (Wolf, Alexander)
December 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Gabriel Contreras, Eric Doyle. (Wolf, Alexander)
December 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36634633 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Eric Doyle, Gabriel Contreras. (Attorney Alexander E. Wolf added to party Gabriel Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander E. Wolf added to party Eric Doyle(pty:pla))(Wolf, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Doyle et al v. FKA Distributing Co. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Doyle
Represented By: Alexander E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Contreras
Represented By: Alexander E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FKA Distributing Co. LLC a Michigan limited liability company doing business as Homedics LLC
Represented By: Dana M. Silva
Represented By: Mark A. Cantor
Represented By: Mark B. Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Dana M. Silva
Represented By: Mark A. Cantor
Represented By: Mark B. Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?