HHS Government Services, LLC v. ACEPEX Management Corporation
Plaintiff: HHS Government Services, LLC
Defendant: Acepex Management Corporation
Case Number: 2:2024cv00148
Filed: January 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2024 Filing 43 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Acepex Management Corporation answer now due 3/21/2024, re Amended Complaint, #10 filed by Defendant Acepex Management Corporation.(Clark, David)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the February 22, 2024 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. Amended Pleadings due by 3/22/2024. Discovery cut-off 9/13/2024. Motions due by 12/2/2024. Status Report due by 9/26/2024. Jury Trial set for 1/14/2025 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2025 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Status Conference set for 9/30/2024 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #38 Non-Resident Attorney Ashley R. Presson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of HHS Government Services, LLC, designating Steven Ryan Inouye as local counsel. (lom)
February 20, 2024 Filing 40 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set on Thursday, February 22, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 16, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ashley R. Presson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36933845) #38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing date set, but no hearing required. (lt)
February 16, 2024 Filing 38 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ashley R. Presson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36933845) filed by Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC. Application set for hearing on 3/18/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Inouye, Steven)
February 9, 2024 Filing 37 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 - 5 days, filed by Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC.. (Inouye, Steven)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #34 by Judge George H Wu. It is hereby ordered that the Scheduling Conference set for February 12, 2024 be continued until February 22, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed no later than February 12, 2024. (rolm)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H Wu. APPLICATION of LaCrecia L. Perkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Acepex Management Corporation, designating David B. Clark as local counsel GRANTED.; granting #33 Non-Resident Attorney LaCrecia L. Perkins. (aco)
January 25, 2024 Filing 34 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from February 12, 2024 to February 19, 2024 filed by Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Continuing Scheduling Conference)(Inouye, Steven)
January 25, 2024 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney LaCrecia L. Perkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Acepex Management Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36793541) filed by Defendant Acepex Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Clark, David)
January 23, 2024 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Brandon Clark counsel for Defendant Acepex Management Corporation. Adding David B. Clark as counsel of record for ACEPEX Management Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ACEPEX Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney David Brandon Clark added to party Acepex Management Corporation(pty:dft))(Clark, David)
January 18, 2024 Filing 31 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Taylor Ryan Yetter on behalf of Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
January 18, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Gregg J Lytle on behalf of Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
January 18, 2024 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Ashley R Presson on behalf of Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
January 18, 2024 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Ryan Inouye counsel for Plaintiff HHS Government Services, LLC. Adding Steven R. Inouye as counsel of record for HSS Government Services, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff HSS Government Services, LLC. (Attorney Steven Ryan Inouye added to party HHS Government Services, LLC(pty:pla))(Inouye, Steven)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for February 12, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than February 5, 2024. See Local Rule 26-1. (rolm)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
January 10, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney LaCrecia L. Perkins. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
January 10, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Ryan Yetter. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
January 10, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregg J. Lytle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
January 10, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ashley R. Presson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
January 10, 2024 Filing 21 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:23-cv-00988, from U.S. District Court Western District of Texas, Austin. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:24-cv-00148 GW (MRWx). (jtil)
January 7, 2024 Filing 17 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Western
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION to Dismiss and the Court hereby TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by ACEPEX Management Corporation, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim and Opposed Motion to Stay filed by Defendant ACEPEX Management Corporation (Perkins, LaCrecia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
October 11, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by HHS Government Services, LLC, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim and Opposed Motion to Stay filed by Defendant ACEPEX Management Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Yetter, Taylor) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim and Opposed Motion to Stay by ACEPEX Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher Moylan, #2 Proposed Order)(Perkins, LaCrecia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 10), this motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
September 12, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by HHS Government Services, LLC, re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendant ACEPEX Management Corporation (Presson, Ashley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
September 12, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACEPEX Management Corporation amending, filed by HHS Government Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of G. Davis, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Jacqueline Alba-Gomez)(Presson, Ashley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 29, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by ACEPEX Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Perkins, LaCrecia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACEPEX Management Corporation Amended Certificate of Service #1 Notice of Removal (Perkins, LaCrecia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by ACEPEX Management Corporation. (Perkins, LaCrecia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal. Your Certificate of Service indicates ECF service on counsel who had not been added to the docket at the time of case opening and therefore have not been served via CM/ECF. Please file an Amended Certificate of Service as a SEPARATE PLEADING. Use the "Certificate of Service" event under the "Service of Process" menu and link it to the original document. (pg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal. The Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because you failed to attach the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the Supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (pg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 25, 2023 Notice of Correction: Please disregard notice of transfer , this was docketed in error and it has now been removed from the docket. Thank you. (pg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 22, 2023 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HHS Government Services, LLC. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 22, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 22, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ACEPEX Management Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CJS2 LLC for ACEPEX Management Corporation. (Perkins, LaCrecia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 APPENDIX to #1 Notice of Removal by ACEPEX Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Perkins, LaCrecia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACEPEX Management Corporation (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17798447), filed by ACEPEX Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins, LaCrecia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/10/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HHS Government Services, LLC v. ACEPEX Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HHS Government Services, LLC
Represented By: Ashley R Presson
Represented By: Gregg J Lytle
Represented By: Taylor Ryan Yetter
Represented By: Steven Ryan Inouye
Represented By: Ashley R. Presson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acepex Management Corporation
Represented By: LaCrecia L Perkins
Represented By: David Brandon Clark
Represented By: LaCrecia L. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?