Adriana Romo v. Martin O'Malley
Plaintiff: Adriana Romo
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Case Number: 2:2024cv00252
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referring Judge: Stephanie S Christensen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-021) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, this case is transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to the calendar of Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-00252 MRA(SSC). (cbr)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Non-Prisoner Case). (gk)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Procedures in SocialSecurity Appeals by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. The Court sets the following briefing schedule pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for the Review of Social Security Decisions under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g): a. Defendant must file and serve an Answer no later than March 11, 2024; b. Plaintiff must file and serve Plaintiff's Brief no later than April 10, 2024; c. Defendant must file and serve Commissioner's Brief no later than May 10, 2024; and d. Plaintiff may file an optional Reply Brief no later than May 24, 2024. (tsn)
January 11, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (jtil)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Adriana Romo. (Sackett, Harvey)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adriana Romo. (Sackett, Harvey)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Adriana Romo. (Attorney Harvey P Sackett added to party Adriana Romo(pty:pla))(Sackett, Harvey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adriana Romo v. Martin O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Romo
Represented By: Harvey P Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?