Netgear, Inc. v. Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.
Plaintiff: Netgear, Inc.
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00824
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: A Joel Richlin
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NETGEAR INC.'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DECLARATION OF BLAIR M. JACOBS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE UNDER SEAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff's Application #40 , #42 is GRANTED. Select portions of Exhibit 3 of Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service to be filed under seal #42 . (gk)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NETGEAR INC.'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING ATTACHMENT NOS. 1, 2, 3, AND 4 OF DOCKET NO. 42 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiff's Application #43 is GRANTED. Attachment Nos. 1, 2, 3 and 4 of Docket No. #42 shall be sealed. (gk)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #37 #47 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc., designating Theresa C Becerra as local counsel. Granting #37 Non-Resident Attorney John S. Holley (rolm)
March 15, 2024 Filing 47 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Holley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/13/2024, Receipt No. ACACDC-37088140) filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Becerra, Theresa)
March 14, 2024 Filing 46 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Holley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37088140) #37 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; incorrect initials of Judge. (ak)
March 14, 2024 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Theresa C. Becerra in support of Application for Order Sealing Attachment #1, 2, 3, and 4 of Docket #42 APPLICATION to Amend APPLICATION to file document Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service under seal #42 Attachments 1 - 4 of Docket #42 #43 filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Becerra, Theresa)
March 14, 2024 Filing 44 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service under seal #42 filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jacobs Declaration in Support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service Under Seal, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A (Part 1), #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit A (Part 2), #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit B)(Becerra, Theresa)
March 14, 2024 Filing 43 APPLICATION to Amend APPLICATION to file document Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service under seal #42 Attachments 1 - 4 of Docket #42 filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document) (Becerra, Theresa)
March 14, 2024 Filing 42 APPLICATION to file document Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service under seal filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 SEALED ATTACHMENT - Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Application for Leave to File Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service Under Seal, #2 SEALED ATTACHMENT - Exhibit A (Part 1) (Unredacted Version of Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service, #3 SEALED ATTACHMENT - Exhibit A (Part 2) (Unredacted Version of Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service, #4 SEALED ATTACHMENT - Exhibit B (Redacted Version of Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service, #5 Proposed Order Granting Application for Leave to file Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service Under Seal)(Becerra, Theresa) [SEALED ATTACHMENT NOS. 1-4 PER ORDER ON 3/28/2024, SEE DOCKET NO. 49] Modified on 3/29/2024 (gk).
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 13, 2024 Filing 40 APPLICATION to File Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 4/26/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Redacted) of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Application for Leave to File Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Application for Leave to File Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service Under Seal) (Becerra, Theresa)
March 13, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for for Alternative Service filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service, #2 Declaration (Redacted) of Blair M. Jacobs in support of Motion for Order for Alternative Service, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Order for Alternative Service) (Becerra, Theresa)
March 13, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-00824 AB(AJRx). (rn)
March 13, 2024 Filing 37 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Holley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37088140) filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Becerra, Theresa)
March 12, 2024 Filing 36 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Becerra, Theresa)
March 8, 2024 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Theresa C Becerra counsel for Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. Adding Theresa C. Becerra as counsel of record for Netgear, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Theresa C. Becerra. (Attorney Theresa C Becerra added to party Netgear, Inc.(pty:pla))(Becerra, Theresa)
March 1, 2024 Filing 34 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: Granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Christina A. Ondrick APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc., designating Robert M. Harkins as local counsel. (et)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: Granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Blair M. Jacobs APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc., designating Robert M. Harkins as local counsel. (et)
February 15, 2024 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blair M. Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/30/2024, Receipt No. 36824201) filed by plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harkins, Robert)
February 15, 2024 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christina A. Ondrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/30/2024, Receipt No. 36824244) filed by plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harkins, Robert)
February 14, 2024 Filing 29 SEALED DOCUMENT Complaint re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #20 filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc..(Harkins, Robert)
February 13, 2024 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan P. Block counsel for Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. Alan P. Block is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan P. Block counsel for Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. Stuart McCommas is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan P. Block counsel for Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. John S. Holley is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan P. Block counsel for Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. Elizabeth Bernard is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan P. Block counsel for Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. Arvind Jairam is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 12, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert M Harkins on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Attorney Robert M Harkins added to party Netgear, Inc.(pty:pla))(Harkins, Robert)
February 6, 2024 Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Plaintiff's deadline to e-file the sealed complaint is extended to February 14, 2024. #20 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NETGEAR, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #10 APPLICATION to Seal Document(s). Within three business days, Counsel is directed to e-file the proposed document UNDER SEAL, properly labeled "FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER OF THE COURT DATED February 2, 2024," and link the filing to this Order. (see document for further details) (hr)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (hr)
February 1, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) #14 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Holley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. #8 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) #11 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stuart McCommas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. #9 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) #12 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arvind Jairam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. #5 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christina A. Ondrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. #7 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blair M. Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. #6 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Counsel is ordered to re-file the above-referenced applications, correcting the deficiencies stated in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies (ECF 11, 12, 13, 14, 15) as soon as possible for the Court's consideration. (hr)
February 1, 2024 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (ghap)
February 1, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap)
January 31, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stuart McCommas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824319) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge (ak)
January 31, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Holley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824280) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge. (ak)
January 31, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christina A. Ondrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824244) #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge (ak)
January 31, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blair M. Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824201) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge (ak)
January 31, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arvind Jairam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824008) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge (ak)
January 30, 2024 Filing 10 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blair M. Jacobs, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stuart McCommas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824319) filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Holley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824280) filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christina A. Ondrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824244) filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blair M. Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824201) filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arvind Jairam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Netgear, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36824008) filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc., (Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Block, Alan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36823599 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Alan P. Block added to party Netgear, Inc.(pty:pla))(Block, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netgear, Inc. v. Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netgear, Inc.
Represented By: Alan P. Block
Represented By: Arvind Jairam
Represented By: Blair M Jacobs
Represented By: Christina A Ondrick
Represented By: John S. Holley
Represented By: Stuart McCommas
Represented By: Robert M Harkins
Represented By: Theresa C Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?