Joseph Davis v. Raymond Rosas et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Davis
Defendant: Officer Raymond Rosas, Officer Jesse Cardella, Officer Gerardo Diaz, Officer Cory Milleson, Officer Jose Quinones, Raymond Rosas, Jesse Cardella, Gerardo Diaz, Cory Milleson, Jose Quinones and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2024cv02165
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Jesse Cardella, Gerardo Diaz, Cory Milleson, Jose Quinones, Raymond Rosas, identifying Joseph Davis, Plaintiff, Raymond Rosas, Defendant, Brandon Cardella, Defendant, Gerardo Diaz, Defendant, Cory Milleson, Defendant, Jose Quinones, Defendant. (Lee, Lisa)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #14 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (rolm)
April 15, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 11, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Jesse Cardella, Gerardo Diaz, Cory Milleson, Jose Quinones, Raymond Rosas.(Attorney Lisa W. Lee added to party Jesse Cardella(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W. Lee added to party Gerardo Diaz(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W. Lee added to party Cory Milleson(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W. Lee added to party Jose Quinones(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W. Lee added to party Raymond Rosas(pty:dft))(Lee, Lisa)
March 28, 2024 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Davis, upon Defendant Raymond Rosas served on 3/21/2024, answer due 4/11/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lt. Ruben Soriano, authorized to accept service on behalf of Officers in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory)
March 28, 2024 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Davis, upon Defendant Cory Milleson served on 3/21/2024, answer due 4/11/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lt. Ruben Soriano, authorized to accept service on behalf of Officers in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory)
March 28, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Davis, upon Defendant Jose Quinones served on 3/21/2024, answer due 4/11/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lt. Ruben Soriano, authorized to accept service on behalf of Officers in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory)
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Davis, upon Defendant Gerardo Diaz served on 3/21/2024, answer due 4/11/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lt. Ruben Soriano, authorized to accept service on behalf of Officers in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Jesse Cardella, Gerardo Diaz, Cory Milleson, Jose Quinones, Raymond Rosas. (car)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
March 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Davis, identifying Defendants Raymond Rosas, Jesse Cardella, Gerardo Diaz, Cory Milleson, and Jose Quinones are all individuals and officer of the City of Alhambra. (Kirakosian, Gregory)
March 18, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Davis. (Kirakosian, Gregory)
March 18, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Davis. (Kirakosian, Gregory)
March 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37110864 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Davis. (Attorney Gregory Levon Kirakosian added to party Joseph Davis(pty:pla))(Kirakosian, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Davis v. Raymond Rosas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Davis
Represented By: Gregory Levon Kirakosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Raymond Rosas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jesse Cardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gerardo Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cory Milleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jose Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Rosas
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Cardella
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Diaz
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Milleson
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Quinones
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?