Alonzo McKinney v. Rocha
Petitioner: Alonzo McKinney
Respondent: Rocha
Case Number: 2:2024cv02295
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #5 (hr)
May 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Objections to R&R due by 5/22/2024. (hr)
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Respondent Rocha, amending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 , filed by Petitioner Alonzo McKinney(hr)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than April 30, 2024 why the Petition should not be dismissed for violating Habeas Rule 2 and for constituting an unauthorized second or successive petition. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Habeas Corpus Petition Form, #2 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 (Attachments: #1 CV-60P)(car)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.(Filing fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Alonzo McKinney. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonzo McKinney v. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alonzo McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?