Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. California Testing and Inspections Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Workers' Compensation Trust, Contract Administration Fund and Workers Compensation Trust
Defendant: California Testing & Inspections, Inc. and California Testing and Inspections Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv02588
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust, Workers Compensation Trust, re Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #5 , Amended Complaint/Petition,, #9 served on May 13, 2024. (Nguyen, Diana)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Workers Compensation Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, upon Defendant California Testing and Inspections Inc., Fabiola Jaque-Diaz President served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. (et)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant California Testing and Inspections Inc. (et)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Defendant California Testing and Inspections Inc. (et)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant California Testing and Inspections Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 , filed by plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Workers Compensation Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust(Nguyen, Diana)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Workers Compensation Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, upon Defendant California Testing and Inspections Inc. served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Miguel D., Person apparently in charge in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy (Nguyen, Diana)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (es)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 as to Defendant California Testing and Inspections Inc.. (sh)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust, Workers' Compensation Trust. (Nguyen, Diana)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Nguyen, Diana)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust, Workers' Compensation Trust. (Nguyen, Diana)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37194543 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Workers' Compensation Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust. (Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Contract Administration Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Nguyen added to party Workers' Compensation Trust(pty:pla))(Nguyen, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. California Testing and Inspections Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation Holiday Savings Trust
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workers' Compensation Trust
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contract Administration Fund
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workers Compensation Trust
Represented By: Diana Nguyen
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Testing & Inspections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Testing and Inspections Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?