Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina v. Seda Arustamyan et al
Plaintiff: Occidential Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, a North Carolina Corporation and Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina
Defendant: Seda Arustamyan, Roman Arustamyan and Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2024cv03285
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Roman Arustamyan answer now due 7/3/2024; Seda Arustamyan answer now due 7/3/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina.(Tamaddon, Ray)
June 10, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolinato Order to Show Cause, #11 TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (Tamaddon, Ray)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before June 12, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco)
May 15, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, upon Plaintiff Roman Arustamyan acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/4/2024; Seda Arustamyan acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Robert M. Barta, Attorney for Defendants Seda Arustamyan and Roman Arustamyan. (Tamaddon, Ray)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Roman Arustamyan, Seda Arustamyan. (car)
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Occidential Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, a North Carolina Corporation. (Tamaddon, Ray)
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Occidential Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, a North Carolina Corporation, (Tamaddon, Ray)
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Occidential Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, a North Carolina Corporation. (Tamaddon, Ray)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37326427 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Occidential Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, a North Carolina Corporation. (Attorney Ray Tamaddon added to party Occidential Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, a North Carolina Corporation(pty:pla))(Tamaddon, Ray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina v. Seda Arustamyan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Occidential Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, a North Carolina Corporation
Represented By: Ray Tamaddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina
Represented By: Ray Tamaddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seda Arustamyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Arustamyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?