Paul Navarrete Quintana et al v. Cynthia E. Lermond et al
Plaintiff: Paul Navarrete Quintana
Defendant: Cynthia E. Lermond, Melisa Jones, Nicole L. Paglione, Dae Peter Lee, Rae M. Huebner, Johnny Jelhaouli, Melinda Wolbransky, Ashley Cabadas, Ashely Cabadas, Lisa Real, Kimberly Clabbet, Meredith Michaels, Kermeila Desai, Department of State Hospital-Los Angeles, Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center- Conditional Outpatient, Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-FCTP-Gateway-Conplep Administration, Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-FCTP-Forensic Community Treatment Program, Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-Gateways Satellite Program, Golden Legacy-Care Center-Forensic Unit and Mental Health Management, Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv03524
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Wesley L Hsu
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Filing 11 Affidavit in Support of APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel in Support of Civil Rights Action filed by Plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana. (es)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REFERRING APPLICATION for Writ of Mandate to Compel Performance of Duty, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction, Complaint Under Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) filed by Plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana (DKT. #8 ) and Application to Compel An Answer Complaint Under Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) filed by Plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana (DKT. #9 ) TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICIA DONAHUE by Judge WESLEY L. HSU: The Court has reviewed the Applications and has concluded that this matter can be referred to Judge Patricia Donahue for her to review with an order to be presented this Court for a final determination. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 Application to Compel An Answer Complaint Under Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) filed by Plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana. (es)
May 28, 2024 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Writ of Mandate to Compel Performance of Duty, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction, Complaint Under Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) filed by Plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana. (es)
May 16, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTES (In Chambers): by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. (Docket No. #2 ). (lom)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
April 25, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Civil Rights Complaint Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana. (ghap)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel in Support of Civil Rights Complaint Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana. (ghap)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Paul Navarrete Quintana in Support of Civil Rights Complaint Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana. (ghap).
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana. (ghap)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Ashely Cabadas, Ashley Cabadas, Kimberly Clabbet(PSY, D., official capacity), Kimberly Clabbet(individual), Department of State Hospital-Los Angeles, Kermeila Desai(individual), Kermeila Desai(PSY, D., official capacity), Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center- Conditional Outpatient, Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-FCTP-Forensic Community Treatment Program, Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-FCTP-Gateway-Conplep Administration, Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-Gateways Satellite Program, Golden Legacy-Care Center-Forensic Unit, Rae M. Huebner(official capacity), Rae M. Huebner(individual), Johnny Jelhaouli(LCSW, official capacity), Johnny Jelhaouli(individual), Melisa Jones(individual), Melisa Jones(PSY, D, official capacity), Dae Peter Lee(individual), Dae Peter Lee(PSY, D., official capacity), Cynthia E. Lermond(individual), Cynthia E. Lermond(PSY, D, official capacity), Mental Health Management, Services, Inc., Meredith Michaels(PSY, D., official capacity), Meredith Michaels(individual), Nicole L. Paglione(PSY, D., official capacity), Nicole L. Paglione(individual), Lisa Real(individual), Lisa Real(PSY, D., official capacity), Melinda Wolbransky(individual), Melinda Wolbransky(PSY, D., official capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Wesley L. Hsu and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue., filed by plaintiff Paul Navarrete Quintana. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Navarrete Quintana et al v. Cynthia E. Lermond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Navarrete Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia E. Lermond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melisa Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole L. Paglione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dae Peter Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae M. Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Jelhaouli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Wolbransky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Cabadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashely Cabadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Real
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Clabbet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kermeila Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State Hospital-Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center- Conditional Outpatient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-FCTP-Gateway-Conplep Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-FCTP-Forensic Community Treatment Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateways Hospital and Mental Health Center-Gateways Satellite Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Legacy-Care Center-Forensic Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Management, Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?