Adam Michael Kendall v. Ongaro et al.
Plaintiff: Adam Michael Kendall
Defendant: Ongaro, Markarde, Flores, Camacho, Walker, McNeal, Rios, Garcia, Palomino, Hernandez and Martinez
Case Number: 2:2024cv03591
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter GRANTING REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #9 . It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $47.33 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (jp)
June 11, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Adam Michael Kendall. (hr)
June 11, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Camacho, Flores, Garcia, Hernandez, Markarde, Martinez, McNeal, Ongaro, Palomino, Rios, Walker, amending Complaint #1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Adam Michael Kendall(hr)
May 17, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Adam Michael Kendall. (hr)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter that ruling on the Request #2 is POSTPONED for 30 days. FURTHER ORDERED that Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a certified copy of a trust fund statement covering the six months prior to the filing of the Complaint on 4/30/2024. See document for further information. (jp)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Sign Complaint #1 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by 6/11/2024, why the Complaint should not be stricken for failure to comply with Rule 11. Failure to file an amended complaint that complies with Rule 11 will result in the Complaint being stricken and may result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with court orders or prosecute this action. (jp)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document lacks required signature. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jtil)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Adam Michael Kendall. (jtil)
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Adam Michael Kendall against Defendants Camacho, Flores, Garcia, Hernandez, Markarde, Martinez, McNeal, Ongaro, Palomino, Rios and Walker pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam Michael Kendall v. Ongaro et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Michael Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palomino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?