Jamie Cid v. Gillespie et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Cid
Defendant: Lieutenant Gillespie and Sergeant Falfal
Case Number: 2:2024cv03643
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Filing 16 REQUEST for U.S. Marshalls [sic] Delivery of Summons filed by Plaintiff Jamie Cid. (hr)
June 14, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel filed by plaintiff Jamie Cid. (rolm)
June 14, 2024 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST for Court Clerk to Issue Summons filed by plaintiff Jamie Cid. (rolm)
June 3, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Plaintiff, Jamie Cid, Claimant, Submitting of Additional Material Evidence, etc. filed by Plaintiff Jamie Cid. (hr)
May 29, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Submitting Material Evidence filed by Plaintiff Jamie Cid. (hr)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #2 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Request is GRANTED. Plaintiff now owes the Court the total filing fee of $350.00. (iv)
May 2, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
May 2, 2024 Filing 9 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
May 1, 2024 Filing 8 Remark: case sent to ECFhelpdesk to be transferred to Central District of CA (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.]
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This case is transferred to the Central District of CA. The Court defers to the Central District for ruling on the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/30/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) copy placed in O:drive for mailing on 4/30/2024. [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.]
April 24, 2024 RemarK- mailed Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction to plaintiff. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2024) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.]
April 23, 2024 Filing 5 DOCKETING ERROR; Please disregard this blank form issued in error. CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024) Modified on 4/24/2024 (ljf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.]
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Jamie Cid. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, Jamie Cid BXO722, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jamie Cid. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2024) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.] Modified on 5/2/2024 (ghap).
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Falfal, Gillespie. Filed by Jamie Cid. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2024) Modified on 4/23/2024 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2024: #1 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/2/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamie Cid v. Gillespie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Cid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Falfal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?