Dino Moody v. C2 Educational Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dino Moody
Defendant: C2 Educational Systems Inc. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2024cv04249
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2024 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Tauler counsel for Plaintiff Dino Moody. Adding Camrie Ventry as counsel of record for Plaintiff Dino Moody for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Dino Moody. (Tauler, Robert)
July 15, 2024 Filing 24 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial One Week, filed by Plaintiff Dino Moody.. (Tauler, Robert)
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendant C2 Educational Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Case #12 , calendared for hearing on 7/15/2024, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 1, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc.. (Crosner, Ryan)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #20 Non-Resident Attorney David P. Thatcher APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants C2 Educational Systems Inc., designating Ryan H. Crosner as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lt)
June 26, 2024 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David P. Thatcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37725282) filed by Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case PHV) (Crosner, Ryan)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin W Perry APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc, designating Ryan H Crosner as local counsel. (jp)
June 25, 2024 Filing 18 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Dino Moody. (Tauler, Robert)
June 25, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin W. Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37711163) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Listed Alabama State Bar admission as Active, when attorney is listed as Inactive. Other error(s) with document(s): GSC from TN SB missing. (lt)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Response in Opposition to Motion #14 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Other error(s) with document(s): Document lacks word count certification per L.R. 11-6.2. Counsel shall file a corrected document within one day of the date of this order. (jre)
June 24, 2024 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin W. Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37711163) filed by Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Crosner, Ryan)
June 24, 2024 Filing 14 (DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #16 ) - OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Dino Moody. (Tauler, Robert) Modified on 6/25/2024 (jre).
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/15/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
June 17, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Complaint) (Crosner, Ryan)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint #10 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Other error(s) with document(s): Document lacks word count certification per L.R. 11-6.2. Counsel shall file a corrected document within one day of the date of this order. (jre)
June 14, 2024 Filing 10 (DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #11 ) - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Complaint) (Attorney Ryan Hamilton Crosner added to party C2 Educational Systems Inc.(pty:dft)) (Crosner, Ryan) Modified on 6/17/2024 (jre).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
May 23, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant C2 Educational Systems Inc. (lh)
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
May 23, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 23, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dino Moody, identifying None. (Tauler, Robert)
May 22, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dino Moody. (Tauler, Robert)
May 22, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dino Moody. (Tauler, Robert)
May 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37516793 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Dino Moody. (Attorney Robert Tauler added to party Dino Moody(pty:pla))(Tauler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dino Moody v. C2 Educational Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C2 Educational Systems Inc.
Represented By: David P. Thatcher
Represented By: Benjamin W. Perry
Represented By: Ryan Hamilton Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Moody
Represented By: Matthew Jay Smith
Represented By: Camrie M Ventry
Represented By: Robert Tauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?