Valentina Catalano et al v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: NUNZIO DONATO CIARAULO and VALENTINA CATALANO
Defendant: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2024cv04871
Filed: June 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2025 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
August 1, 2024 Filing 18 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Batezel, Matthew)
August 1, 2024 Filing 17 REPLY /RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Batezel, Matthew)
August 1, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cause Of Action For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) #9 filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Batezel, Matthew)
July 17, 2024 Filing 14 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cause Of Action For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) #9 filed by Plaintiff Valentina Catalano. (rolm)
July 16, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Valentina Catalano, Nunzio Donato Ciaraulo, re Objection/Opposition #14 served on 7/10/2024. (iv)
July 10, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Valentina Catalano, Nunzio Donato Ciaraulo, (rolm)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
June 17, 2024 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cause Of Action For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) #9 served on June 17, 2024. (Batezel, Matthew)
June 17, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cause Of Action For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/15/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Batezel, Matthew)
June 11, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
June 11, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 11, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (jtil)
June 10, 2024 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Valentina Catalano, Nunzio Donato Ciaraulo, served on 5/10/2024. (jtil)
June 10, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Valentina Catalano and Nunzio Donato Ciaraulo in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/7/2024, attached to Batezel Decl as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
June 10, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, re Declaration, #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on June 10, 2024. (Batezel, Matthew)
June 10, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, identifying Plaintiffs VALENTINA CATALANO and NUNZIO DONATO CIARAULO. (Batezel, Matthew)
June 10, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Batezel, Matthew)
June 10, 2024 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Matthew F. Batezel re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service of Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certified Copy State Farm Statement of Information Corporation)(Batezel, Matthew)
June 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24VECV02138 Receipt No: ACACDC-37624005 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service of Summons) (Attorney Matthew F Batezel added to party STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft))(Batezel, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentina Catalano et al v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Balmat
Represented By: Matthew F Batezel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NUNZIO DONATO CIARAULO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALENTINA CATALANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?