Rochelle Keller v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Rochelle Keller
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. and Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2024cv05123
Filed: June 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING APPLICATION for Refund of Fees (G-124) #16 #21 . (jp)
August 9, 2024 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gordon C. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rochelle Keller (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37696354) #12 #16 - referred to Judge for ruling. (rdj)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
August 2, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., identifying Carnival Corporation. (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd..(Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2024 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rochelle Keller, upon Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. served on 7/11/2024, answer due 8/1/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Banning, William)
July 9, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gordon C. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rochelle Keller (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37696354) #12 filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Keller. (Banning, William)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gordon C. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rochelle Keller (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37696354) #12 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Other error(s) with document(s): Document STRICKEN for the reasons indicated in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #14 . (jre)
June 24, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gordon C. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rochelle Keller (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37696354) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District for the practice of law, in which the attorney is physically present on a regular basis to conduct business. (sbou)
June 21, 2024 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (rolm)
June 21, 2024 Filing 12 (DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #15 ) - APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gordon C. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rochelle Keller (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37696354) filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Keller. (Banning, William) Modified on 6/25/2024 (jre).
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
June 20, 2024 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Keller. (Banning, William)
June 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gordon C. Webb on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
June 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
June 20, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
June 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 20, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (ghap)
June 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Keller, (Banning, William)
June 18, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Keller. (Banning, William)
June 18, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Rochelle Keller. (Banning, William)
June 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37675670 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Keller. (Attorney William L. Banning added to party Rochelle Keller(pty:bkmov))(Banning, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochelle Keller v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Keller
Represented By: William L. Banning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?