Janet Alvarez-Jedkins v. Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Plaintiff: JANET ALVAREZ-JEDKINS
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2024cv05376
Filed: June 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 (Attachments: #1 2024-08-20 ALVAREZ-JEDKINS Statement of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FINAL, #2 2024-08-20 ALVAREZ-JEDKINS - CERT OF SERVICE - FINAL)(Picciurro, Andre)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 9/16/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 1, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 31, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Picciurro, Andre)
July 31, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andre M Picciurro on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Picciurro, Andre)
July 31, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by DEFENDANT Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Andre M Picciurro added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft))(Picciurro, Andre)
July 19, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
July 18, 2024 Filing 12 Notice filed by plaintiff Janet Alvarez-Jedkins. Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint (Holcomb, John)
July 2, 2024 Filing 11 Notice NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by plaintiff Janet Alvarez-Jedkins. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Signed Complaint)(Holcomb, John)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 28, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Holcomb, John)
June 27, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
June 27, 2024 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (car)
June 27, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
June 27, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 27, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
June 25, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JANET ALVAREZ-JEDKINS. (Holcomb, John)
June 25, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JANET ALVAREZ-JEDKINS. (Holcomb, John)
June 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37718732 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff JANET ALVAREZ-JEDKINS. (Attorney John Lewis Holcomb, Jr added to party JANET ALVAREZ-JEDKINS(pty:pla))(Holcomb, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janet Alvarez-Jedkins v. Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Represented By: Andre M Picciurro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET ALVAREZ-JEDKINS
Represented By: John Lewis Holcomb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?