Victoria Gharabiance v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Plaintiff: VICTORIA GHARABIANCE
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. doing business as Princess Cruise Line
Case Number: 2:2024cv05556
Filed: July 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2024 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Green, Michael)
August 5, 2024 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Victoria Gharabiance, upon Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. served on 7/19/2024, answer due 8/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Green, Michael)
August 1, 2024 Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (es)
July 3, 2024 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (et)
July 3, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
July 2, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff VICTORIA GHARABIANCE. (Green, Michael)
July 2, 2024 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff, Victoria Gharabiance NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF VICTORIA GHARABIANCE, identifying PRINCESS CRUISE LINES, LTD., DBA "PRINCESS CRUISE LINE". (Green, Michael)
July 2, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff VICTORIA GHARABIANCE. (Green, Michael)
July 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37750909 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff VICTORIA GHARABIANCE. (Attorney Michael Paul Green added to party VICTORIA GHARABIANCE(pty:pla))(Green, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victoria Gharabiance v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. doing business as Princess Cruise Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA GHARABIANCE
Represented By: Michael Paul Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?