Annette Torrente v. Martin OMalley
Plaintiff: Annette Torrente
Defendant: Martin OMalley
Case Number: 2:2024cv05919
Filed: July 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin OMalley. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Martin OMalley(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Annette Torrente. (Kalagian, Marc)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Annette Torrente, (Kalagian, Marc)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Annette Torrente. (Kalagian, Marc)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37831003 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Annette Torrente. (Attorney Marc V Kalagian added to party Annette Torrente(pty:pla))(Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Annette Torrente v. Martin OMalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Torrente
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin OMalley
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?