Linda Brazil v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.
Plaintiff: LINDA BRAZIL
Defendant: PRINCESS CRUISE LINES, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2024cv06450
Filed: July 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Barbara Elizabeth Kennedy counsel for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.. Adding Barbara E. Kennedy as counsel of record for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attorney Barbara Elizabeth Kennedy added to party Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.(pty:dft))(Kennedy, Barbara)
September 17, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD., identifying Carnival Corporation & plc. (Conner, Lisa)
September 17, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD..(Attorney Lisa M Conner added to party Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.(pty:dft))(Conner, Lisa)
September 6, 2024 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Linda Brazil, upon Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. served on 8/28/2024, answer due 9/18/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Finklehoffe, Carol)
August 27, 2024 Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (jm)
August 1, 2024 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. (lh)
August 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
July 31, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LINDA BRAZIL, identifying Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
July 31, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LINDA BRAZIL. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
July 31, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LINDA BRAZIL. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
July 31, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37933664 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff LINDA BRAZIL. (Attorney Carol Lynn Finklehoffe added to party LINDA BRAZIL(pty:pla))(Finklehoffe, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linda Brazil v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCESS CRUISE LINES, LTD.
Represented By: Barbara Elizabeth Kennedy
Represented By: Lisa M Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA BRAZIL
Represented By: Carol Lynn Finklehoffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?