Keith Feder, M.D., Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Keith Feder, M.D., Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv07416
Filed: August 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephanie S Christensen
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice (Other), #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Weddle, Lisa)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2025 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Hearing on Disputed Jury Instructions set for hearing on 7/18/2025 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/29/2025 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on November 4, 2024 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby orders this case referred to: ADR Procedure No. 3: Private mediation. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: March 3, 2025. (iv)
October 22, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Plaintiff's Proposed Statement of Decision re Notice (Other), #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
October 21, 2024 Filing 26 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Weddle, Lisa)
October 18, 2024 Filing 25 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc... (Weddle, Lisa)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-07416 JFW(SSCx). (rn)
October 11, 2024 Filing 23 STATEMENT Regarding Local Rule 7-3 Meet and Confer (Weddle, Lisa)
October 11, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Plaintiff Keith Feder, M.D., Inc.. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
October 11, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Keith Feder, M.D., Inc., identifying Keith Feder M.D.. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME NUNC PRO TUNC #19 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant's Unopposed Administrative Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Nunc Pro Tunc is hereby GRANTED, and the Court accepts as timely Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #18 . (iv)
October 9, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Dismiss Out of Time Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weddle, Lisa)
October 7, 2024 Filing 18 Notice filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc.s Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Complaint)(Weddle, Lisa)
October 7, 2024 Filing 17 STATEMENT Regarding Local Rule 7-3 Meet and Confer filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Weddle, Lisa)
October 7, 2024 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Lisa Weddle as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Weddle, Lisa)
October 7, 2024 Filing 15 Text Entry Order STRIKING MOTION to Dismiss #14 filed 10/7/24. Hearing date is untimely. Counsel shall read the Court's Standing Order #12 before refiling as this may not be the only deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 7, 2024 Filing 14 *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Weddle, Lisa) Modified on 10/7/2024 (sr).
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 4, 2024 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before October 18, 2024. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
September 30, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-CV-07416 JFW(MARx). (rn)
September 27, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. The Defendant does not consent. (Weddle, Lisa)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney Jared Killeen's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., designating Lisa R. Weddle as local counsel. (hr)
September 5, 2024 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jared Killeen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38157336) filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weddle, Lisa)
September 3, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 10/7/2024, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Weddle, Lisa)
September 3, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
August 30, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jared R Killeen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
August 30, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Keith Feder, M.D., Inc., upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 7/31/2024, answer due 8/21/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Filed in State Court on 8/12/2024 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 30, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Does 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Keith Feder, M.D., Inc. Filed in State Court on 7/2/2024 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 30, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., identifying Amazon.com, Inc.. (Weddle, Lisa)
August 30, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Weddle, Lisa)
August 30, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Weddle, Lisa)
August 30, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 24STCV16463 Receipt No: ACACDC-38131832 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, POS, etc, #2 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Lisa R. Weddle added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Weddle, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith Feder, M.D., Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Killeen
Represented By: Lisa R. Weddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Feder, M.D., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?