John Boyd et al v. SunButter, LLC
Plaintiff: John Boyd and Jana Rabinowitz
Defendant: SunButter, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv07873
Filed: September 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2024 Filing 15 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SunButter, LLC, identifying Red River Commodities. (Wagner, Willis)
November 7, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
November 6, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant SunButter, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wagner, Willis)
October 11, 2024 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SunButter, LLC answer now due 11/6/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant SunButter, LLC.(Wagner, Willis)
October 7, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SunButter, LLC answer now due 10/21/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant SunButter, LLC.(Attorney Willis M Wagner added to party SunButter, LLC(pty:dft))(Wagner, Willis)
September 17, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Boyd, Jana Rabinowitz, upon Defendant SunButter, LLC served on 9/16/2024, answer due 10/7/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Allison Wechel, Authorized to Accept Service for CT Corporation System, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Klein, Lilach)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H Wu. (lom)
September 13, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant SunButter, LLC. (et)
September 13, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
September 13, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (et)
September 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs John Boyd, Jana Rabinowitz, identifying Plaintiffs John Boyd and Jana Rabinowitz and Defendant SunButter, LLC. (Klein, Lilach)
September 13, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs John Boyd, Jana Rabinowitz. (Klein, Lilach)
September 13, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs John Boyd, Jana Rabinowitz. (Klein, Lilach)
September 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38211984 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs John Boyd, Jana Rabinowitz. (Attorney Lilach Halperin Klein added to party John Boyd (pty:pla), Attorney Lilach Halperin Klein added to party Jana Rabinowitz(pty:pla))(Klein, Lilach)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Boyd et al v. SunButter, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunButter, LLC
Represented By: Willis M Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Boyd
Represented By: Lilach Halperin Klein
Represented By: Zachary Crosner
Represented By: Michael T Houchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana Rabinowitz
Represented By: Zachary Crosner
Represented By: Michael T Houchin
Represented By: Lilach Halperin Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?