William Frederick Durst et al v. Universal Music Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Limp Bizkit, William Frederick Durst and Flawless Records, LLC
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Universal Music Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv08630
Filed: October 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: A Joel Richlin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #15 re OSC re Supplemental Jurisdiction (Veglia, Alicia)
November 27, 2024 Filing 22 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Veglia, Alicia)
November 22, 2024 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole Michelle Baade counsel for Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc.. Adding Nicole M. Baade as counsel of record for Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc.. (Attorney Nicole Michelle Baade added to party Universal Music Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Baade, Nicole)
November 22, 2024 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ransom, Rollin)
November 22, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ransom, Rollin)
November 22, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc., identifying Universal Music Group, Inc.; UMG Recordings, Inc.; Universal Music Group, N.V.; and Bollere SE. (Ransom, Rollin)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation #16 : Considering the Parties stipulation, and good cause having been shown, thisCourt Orders the following: 1. Defendants anticipated Motion to Dismiss shall be set for hearing on January 6, 2025, at 1:30 p.m., in person in Courtroom 5A, First Street Courthouse, 350 West First Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. 2. The following briefing schedule shall apply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: Defendant's motion shall be filed by November 22, 2024; Plaintiffs' opposition brief shall be filed by December 9, 2024; and Defendant's reply brief shall be filed by December 20, 2024. (bm)
November 19, 2024 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Veglia, Alicia)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. It appears that the Court possesses only supplemental jurisdiction over the state law and declaratory relief claims pursuant to the Court's supplementaljurisdiction. The Court therefore orders the parties to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law and declaratory relief claims asserted in the Complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). Plaintiffs shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than December 2, 2024. (lom)
November 18, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
October 24, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Universal Music Group, Inc. answer now due 11/22/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc..(Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Universal Music Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ransom, Rollin)
October 21, 2024 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Frederick Durst, Flawless Records, LLC, Limp Bizkit, upon Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc. served on 10/18/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System - Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Veglia, Alicia)
October 9, 2024 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc.. (rolm)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
October 8, 2024 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLC. (Veglia, Alicia)
October 8, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 8, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (lh)
October 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLC, identifying Wes Borland, John Otto, Sam Rivers, Leor Dimant aka DJ Lethal. (Veglia, Alicia)
October 8, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alicia Marie Veglia counsel for Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLC. Adding Frank Seddigh as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLC. (Veglia, Alicia)
October 8, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alicia Marie Veglia counsel for Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLC. Adding Alicia Marie Veglia as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Flawless Records, LLC, Limp Bizkit. (Veglia, Alicia)
October 8, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Limp Bizkit, Flawless Records, LLC. (Veglia, Alicia)
October 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38357016 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs William Frederick Durst, Flawless Records, LLC, Limp Bizkit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Alicia Marie Veglia added to party William Frederick Durst(pty:pla), Attorney Alicia Marie Veglia added to party Limp Bizkit(pty:pla), Attorney Alicia Marie Veglia added to party Flawless Records, LLC(pty:pla))(Veglia, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Frederick Durst et al v. Universal Music Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Rollin A Ransom
Represented By: Nicole Michelle Baade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limp Bizkit
Represented By: Frank Seddigh
Represented By: Alicia Marie Veglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Frederick Durst
Represented By: Frank Seddigh
Represented By: Alicia Marie Veglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flawless Records, LLC
Represented By: Frank Seddigh
Represented By: Alicia Marie Veglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?