Amier Joshua Funches v. Carolyn Colvin
Plaintiff: Amier Joshua Funches
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Case Number: 2:2024cv08699
Filed: October 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: A Joel Richlin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO EXTEND THE SCHEDULE IN THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #10 by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until January 8, 2025 to file and serve the Certified Administrative Record in this case, with all other deadlines extended accordingly. (es)
December 5, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amier Joshua Funches answer now due 1/8/2025, filed by Defendant Martin OMalley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tarn, Jennifer) Modified on 12/5/2024 (es).
October 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:24-cv-08699 on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
October 17, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin OMalley. (Attorney Jennifer Tarn added to party Martin OMalley(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
October 11, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Amier Joshua Funches. (Krank, Laura)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED. (bm)
October 10, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (lh)
October 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amier Joshua Funches, (Krank, Laura)
October 9, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amier Joshua Funches. (Krank, Laura)
October 9, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Amier Joshua Funches. (Krank, Laura)
October 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Amier Joshua Funches. (Attorney Laura E. Krank added to party Amier Joshua Funches(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amier Joshua Funches v. Carolyn Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amier Joshua Funches
Represented By: Laura E. Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Represented By: Jennifer Tarn
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?