Jane Roe v. Garth Brooks
Plaintiff: Jane Roe
Defendant: Garth Brooks
Case Number: 2:2024cv09462
Filed: November 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: A Joel Richlin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING WIHTOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #12 ; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW #26 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is DENIED without prejudice. The action is STAYED pending the outcome of the pending motions in Doe v. Roe, No. 3:24-cv-547-HTW-LGI (S.D. Miss.). Defendant in this action is ORDERED to inform this Court of any rulings in the Mississippi Action within ten court days. Additionally, Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Submit Documents for In Camera Review is DENIED as moot because the Court does not deem it necessary to review the documents prior to issuing its ruling. (iv)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds DEFENDANT GARTH BROOKS' MOTION TO DISMISS #12 suitable for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for December 16, 2024 is vacated and taken off calendar. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, one will be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 10, 2024 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Christensen, Jeanne)
December 2, 2024 Filing 25 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendant Garth Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
November 26, 2024 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Jeanne M. Christensen in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 AMENDING #20 filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mississippi Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dkt. No. 1, #4 Exhibit 4 - Redacted Declaration of Hayley Baker)(Christensen, Jeanne)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Hayley H. Baker APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Roe, designating Omar H. Bengali as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #21 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' request and CONTINUES the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 12) to December 16, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. In the future, proposed orders must comply with the Local Rules. See Local Rules 7-1, 7-20, and 52-4.1. (rolm)
November 23, 2024 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Dismiss from December 9, 2024 to December 16, 2024 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wigdor, Douglas)
November 22, 2024 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Jeanne M. Christensen in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mississippi Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dkt. No. 1, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Hayley Baker)(Wigdor, Douglas)
November 22, 2024 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe. (Wigdor, Douglas)
November 22, 2024 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hayley H. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Roe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38637530) filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bengali, Omar)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Jeanne M. Christensen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Roe, designating Omar H. Bengali as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Douglas H. Wigdor APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Roe, designating Omar H. Bengali as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
November 14, 2024 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeanne M. Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Roe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38580924) filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bengali, Omar)
November 13, 2024 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas H. Wigdor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Roe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38576035) filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bengali, Omar)
November 8, 2024 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Garth Brooks, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #10 served on November 8, 2024. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
November 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Garth Brooks. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Petrocelli, Daniel)
November 8, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli counsel for Defendant Garth Brooks. Adding Daniel M. Petrocelli as counsel of record for Garth Brooks for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Garth Brooks. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
November 8, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric Jordan Amdursky counsel for Defendant Garth Brooks. Adding Eric Amdursky as counsel of record for Garth Brooks for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Garth Brooks. (Amdursky, Eric)
November 8, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-09462 MWF(AJRx). (rn)
November 7, 2024 Filing 8 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Garth Brooks. (Smith, Megan)
November 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
November 1, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jane Roe in Los Angeles Superior Court on 10/3/2024, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
November 1, 2024 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Garth Brooks, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice (Other) #5 served on November 1, 2024. (Smith, Megan)
November 1, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Pendency of Other Action filed by Defendant Garth Brooks. (Smith, Megan)
November 1, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Garth Brooks, identifying Jane Roe and Garth Brooks. (Smith, Megan)
November 1, 2024 Filing 3 STATEMENT / FRCP Rule 7.1(a)(2) Diversity Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Garth Brooks (Smith, Megan)
November 1, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Garth Brooks. (Smith, Megan)
November 1, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV25693 Receipt No: ACACDC-38510061 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Garth Brooks. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint) (Attorney Megan Keller Smith added to party Garth Brooks(pty:dft))(Smith, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Roe v. Garth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe
Represented By: Robert J Girard, II
Represented By: Jeanne M Christensen
Represented By: Hayley Baker
Represented By: Douglas H. Wigdor
Represented By: Omar H. Bengali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth Brooks
Represented By: Eric Jordan Amdursky
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Represented By: Megan Keller Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?