Perrin Davidson v. Selene Financing L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Perrin Davidson
Defendant: Selene Financing L.P. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2024cv09774
Filed: November 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING SECOND JOINT STIPULATION #9 TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the Parties' SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, and good cause appearing therein, Defendant Selene Finance, LP's time to respond to the Complaint is extended up and through January 13, 2025. (aco)
December 13, 2024 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 13, 2025 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Selene Financing L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristapor Vartanian, #2 Proposed Order)(Vartanian, Kristapor)
November 18, 2024 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Selene Financing L.P. answer now due 12/13/2024, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Selene Financing L.P..(Vartanian, Kristapor)
November 15, 2024 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
November 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
November 13, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Selene Financing L.P., identifying Selene Ventures GP, LLC; Selene Ventures, LLC; Selene Holdings, LLC; Mortgage Solutions Holdings, LLC. (Vartanian, Kristapor)
November 13, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Selene Financing L.P.. (Vartanian, Kristapor)
November 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24VECV04853 Receipt No: ACACDC-38571964 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Selene Financing L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Remaining State Court Documents) (Attorney Kristapor Vartanian added to party Selene Financing L.P.(pty:dft))(Vartanian, Kristapor)
November 13, 2024 CONFORMED E-FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants Selene Financing L.P., Does 1 through 25, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Perrin Davidson. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/04/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrin Davidson v. Selene Financing L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Financing L.P.
Represented By: Kristapor Vartanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perrin Davidson
Represented By: Perrin Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?