Jose Martinez v. Sunnova Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez
Defendant: Sunnova Energy Corp. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2024cv09960
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration of Christopher J.Defendant Sunnova Energy Corp.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #16 filed by Defendant Sunnova Energy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Rillo In Support of Defendant Sunnova Energy Corp.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher J. Rillo In Support of Defendant Sunnova Energy Corp.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Christopher J. Rillo In Support of Defendant Sunnova Energy Corp.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Christopher J. Rillo In Support of Defendant Sunnova Energy Corp.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Christopher J. Rillo In Support of Defendant Sunnova Energy Corp.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action)(Rillo, Christopher)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Jose Martinez. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action, #2 Declaration Declaration of Devin Rauchwerger in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand PAGA Action) (Rauchwerger, Devin)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2025 at 01:30 PM. Counsel must email the text-fillable Worksheet to Chambers at MRA_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov along with the Joint Rule 26(f) Report. *See Order for further details.* (gga)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. The Initial Status Conference set for 1/27/2025 is hereby vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:24-cv-06346 MRA(MARx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-09960 MRA(MARx). Signed by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani (rn)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER re DEFICIENCY IN ATTORNEY'S BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The contact information for attorney Alison Karol Sigurdsson is deficient in that no email address is listed on the Court's docket. If you are counsel of record in a case currently pending in this district and you need to update your business or contact information, you must file and serve Form G-06 ("Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information") in each of your pending cases. Doing so will satisfy your notice obligation under Local Rule 83-2.4. In addition, if you are a registered CM/ECF User, you must log in to your CM/ECF account and update your information directly in the CM/ECF System. See Local Rule 5-4.8.1. (aco)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 1/27/2025 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Counsel are granted leave to appear by Zoom to this one proceeding. The Zoom link can be accessed from the Judges Procedures and Schedules page at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. (pc)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The courtesy copy requirement is suspended until further notice. All proceedings are held in person. Requests for remote appearances must be filed a week prior to the proceeding. Requests are made in a pleading format, with a declaration stating the good cause why the attorney cannot appear in-person. (pc)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) Answer to Representative Action Complaint filed by Defendant's Sunnova Energy Corp..(Rillo, Christopher)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Sunnova Energy Corp., identifying Parent Company Sunnova Energy International Inc. (Rillo, Christopher)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Sunnova Energy Corp. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jose Martinez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/25/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner Sunnova Energy Corp.. Related Case(s): 24-cv-06346-MRA-MAR (Rillo, Christopher)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Sunnova Energy Corp.. (Rillo, Christopher)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV28059 Receipt No: ACACDC-38603651 - Fee: $405, filed by Petitioner Sunnova Energy Corp.. (Attorney Christopher J Rillo added to party Sunnova Energy Corp.(pty:bkmov))(Rillo, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Martinez v. Sunnova Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey P Jackson
Represented By: Devin E Rauchwerger
Represented By: Zack I Domb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnova Energy Corp.
Represented By: Raerani Reddy
Represented By: Kevin Marshall Sadler
Represented By: Catherine Annette Scott
Represented By: Alison Karol Sigurdsson
Represented By: Christopher J Rillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?