Clifford Harris v. Sabrina D. Peterson
Plaintiff: Clifford Joseph Harris, Jr.
Defendant: Sabrina D Peterson
Case Number: 2:2024cv10781
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2025 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Sabrina D Peterson. (iv)
January 16, 2025 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Clifford Joseph Harris, Jr. (Cameron-Banks, Indira)
January 16, 2025 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 13, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-10781-FMO (RAOx). (et)
December 19, 2024 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Clifford Joseph Harris, Jr. (Cameron-Banks, Indira)
December 16, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
December 16, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 16, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
December 13, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Clifford Joseph Harris, Jr, (Cameron-Banks, Indira)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Clifford Joseph Harris, Jr. (Cameron-Banks, Indira)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38754710 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Clifford Joseph Harris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits A & B) (Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Clifford Joseph Harris, Jr(pty:pla))(Cameron-Banks, Indira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford Harris v. Sabrina D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Joseph Harris, Jr.
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina D Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?