Amanda Mancera v. Eliseo Ricolcol
Petitioner: Amanda Mancera
Respondent: Warden Eliseo Ricolcol
Case Number: 2:2025cv00425
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: A Joel Richlin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR REMAND by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, re Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111), #2 The Court sent a warning letter to Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) advising that failure to correct this deficiency within THIRTY DAYS from the date of the warning letter would result in dismissal or remand of this case. More than THIRTY DAYS have now passed, and the deficiency has not been corrected. Accordingly, this case is HEREBY ORDERED DISMISSED without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 FOR IMMEDIATE RELEASE AS PRESIDENT BIDEN AND MERRICK B. GARLAND SIGNED INTO LAW AMENDED FEDERAL FIRST OFFENDER'S ACT #1 filed by Petitioner Amanda Mancera. (san)
January 21, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 (car)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) for Immediate Release. Case assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin.(Filing fee $ 5 DUE), filed by Petitioner Amanda Mancera. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amanda Mancera v. Eliseo Ricolcol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amanda Mancera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Eliseo Ricolcol
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?