John Doe v. Saige Star Rowley
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Saige Star Rowley
Counter-Claimant: Saige Star Rowley
Counter-Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 2:2025cv01387
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, plaintiff's Motion #20 is taken off the 4/24/2025 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 4/24/2025. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 14, 2025 Filing 23 ANSWER to Counterclaim with JURY DEMAND filed by Counter-Defendant John Doe.(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION #14 PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79- 5.2.2(a) FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
March 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
March 25, 2025 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by Plaintiff John Doe. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Rosenfeld, #2 Declaration of John Doe) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STRIKING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: APPLICATION to Seal #13 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): counsel confirmed to the CRD that this item is duplicative of Dkt. 14 and incomplete. (vdr)
March 24, 2025 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant John Doe filed by Counterclaimant Saige Star Rowley. (Counterclaim is filed together with ANSWER, see docket entry no. #17 ) (lom)
March 24, 2025 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Saige Star Rowley, re Answer #17 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #18 served on 3/24/2025. (iv)
March 24, 2025 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Saige Star Rowley. (iv)
March 24, 2025 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Saige Star Rowley.(iv)
March 24, 2025 Filing 15 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document John Doe Declaration and Exhibits under seal #14 filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to John Doe Declaration, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B to John Doe Declaration, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit C to John Doe Declaration, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit D to John Doe Declaration)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2025 Filing 14 APPLICATION to file document John Doe Declaration and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Rosenfeld, #2 Declaration of John Doe, #3 Exhibit A to John Doe Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to John Doe Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to John Doe Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to John Doe Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2025 Filing 13 *STRICKEN* APPLICATION to file document Declaration of John Doe and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Rosenfeld, #2 Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/25/2025 (vdr).
March 12, 2025 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff John Doe, upon Defendant Saige Star Rowley served on 2/22/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2025 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Saige Star Rowley answer now due 3/31/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John Doe.(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2025 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 24, 2025 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Doe, upon Defendant Saige Star Rowley served on 2/23/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Saige Star Rowley - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2025 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Saige Star Rowley. (sh)
February 20, 2025 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
February 20, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
February 20, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Doe, identifying Saige Star Rowley. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39131825 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attorney Jeffrey Rosenfeld added to party John Doe(pty:pla))(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe v. Saige Star Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saige Star Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Saige Star Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?