Shipeng Zhai v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shipeng Zhai and Zhai Shipeng
Defendant: Mercedes Benz USA LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2025cv01578
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Scheduling Conference set April 11, 2025, is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2025 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 court days, filed by Plaintiff Shipeng Zhai.. (Yu, Susan)
March 27, 2025 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC, served on 3/21/25. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - MBUSA Notice to State Court re Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - MBUSA Email to Adverse Party)(Narain, Sabrina)
March 20, 2025 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLCto Order to Show Cause,,, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sabrina C. Narain)(Narain, Sabrina)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the amount in controversy does not exceed the jurisdictional threshold. The parties are encouraged to submit evidence and/or judicially noticeable facts in response to the courts Order. Responses shall be limited to ten (10) pages in length. The parties should consider this Order to be a two-pronged inquiry into the facial and factual sufficiency of Defendants demonstration of jurisdiction. As Defendant is the party asserting federal jurisdiction, Defendants failure to respond timely and adequately to this Order shall result in remand of the action without further notice. (lc)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2025 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
February 25, 2025 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
February 25, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
February 25, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh)
February 24, 2025 CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Mercedes Benz USA LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Shipeng Zhai. [FILED IN STATE COURT 01/16/2025 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
February 24, 2025 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery)iled by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC. [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, (Narain, Sabrina)
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Narain, Sabrina)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25PSCV00194 Receipt No: ACACDC-39167649 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Re Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Pleadings and Orders) (Attorney Sabrina Celia Narain added to party Mercedes-Benz USA LLC(pty:dft))(Narain, Sabrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipeng Zhai v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shipeng Zhai
Represented By: Susan Lee Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhai Shipeng
Represented By: Susan Lee Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Benz USA LLC
Represented By: Jacky P. Wang
Represented By: Cynthia Yi-San Sun
Represented By: Sabrina Celia Narain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?