Warren Fred Nelson v. Santa Monica Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Warren Fred Nelson
Defendant: Santa Monica Police Department, City of Santa Monica, California, Police Chief Ramon Batista, Officer Olson, Officer Prosser, Lead Detective Stephanie Davis, Lead Detectives Stephanie Davis and Det. Lawrence Kayondo
Case Number: 2:2025cv03192
Filed: April 8, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: A Joel Richlin
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-03192-SVW (AJR). (et)
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE A MAILING ADDRESS by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by April 28, 2025 why the Court should not recommend that this action be dismissed either with or without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 41-6 due to Plaintiffs failure to provide a mailing address. [See document for further details.] (san)
April 13, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (et)
April 8, 2025 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS to Douglas T. Sloan filed by Plaintiff Warren Fred Nelson. (et)
April 8, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER SERVICE OF SUMMONS filed by Plaintiff Warren Fred Nelson. (et)
April 8, 2025 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Warren Fred Nelson. (et)
April 8, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES filed against Defendants Ramon Batista (sued individually), Ramon Batista (in his official capacity), City of Santa Monica, California, Stephanie Davis (in his official capacity), Stephanie Davis (sued individually), Lawrence Kayondo (sued individually), Lawrence Kayondo (in his official capacity), Olson (No. 4149, sued individually), Olson (in his official capacity), Prosser (in his official capacity), Prosser (sued individually), Santa Monica Police Department. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin., filed by Plaintiff Warren Fred Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 to Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren Fred Nelson v. Santa Monica Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Fred Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Monica Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Monica, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Chief Ramon Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lead Detective Stephanie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lead Detectives Stephanie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Lawrence Kayondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?