Angeles Chemical Company Inc et al v. Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Locke, Angeles Chemical Company Inc and Greve Financial Services Inc
Defendant: George Industries, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Universal City Studios Inc, PolyOne Corporation, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Rathon Corp, Vopak Distribution Americas Corporation, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Luxfer Gas Cylinders, International Rectifier Corporation, NCR Corporation, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Vertex Microwave Products Inc, Yort Inc, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Arlon Adhesives & Film, BP America Inc, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Avery Dennison Corporation, United Dominion Industries, Loma Linda University, Canon Business Machines Inc, Resinart Corp, Western Metal Decorating Co LP, Donna Berg, BHP Coated Steel Corp, Weber Aircraft LP, Universal City Studios LLC, Deutsch Engineered Connecting Devices/Deutsch Gav, AlliedSignal Inc, K C Photo Engraving Co, Texaco Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Mico Inc, Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Alcoa Inc, Richhold Inc, Bourns Inc, HexAm, Forenco Inc, Van Waters & Rogers Inc, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Lonza Inc, Pearl Rosenthal, Broadway Stores Inc, Quality Fabrication Inc, Dow Chemical Company, Great Western Chemical Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Univar Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Pacific Bell Telephone Company doing business as AT&T California, Ohline Corp, AT&T, Waste Management Inc, Air Products and Chemicals Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, Hexfet America, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, Burr-Brown Corporation, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Firmenich Incorporated, Del Mar Avionics Inc, Harsco Corporation, Signet Armorlite Inc, Shell Oil Company, Celltech Manufacturing CA Inc, Macy's West, Montgomery Tank Lines Inc, McKesson Corporation, Diversey Corp, GSF Energy LLC, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, W&B Marketing Inc, NI Industries, Safety-Kleen Corp, The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal, Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Kester Solder Division, Seymour Moslin, Disneyland Central Plant, Borden Inc, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Bonanza Aluminum Corp, Mattel Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, National Broadcasting Company (NBC), Treasure Chest, Luxfer USA Limited, Robert Berg, Sierracin Corporation, -, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, The Geon Company, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Reed & Graham Inc, Union Oil Company of California, Bio Science Enterprises, United Parcel Service Inc, Johns Manville International Inc, Crosby & Overton Inc, -, Havery Sorkin, Ratheon Company, Hubbel Inc, FHL Group, Todd Pacific Shipyards, Abex Aerospace Division, General Dynamics Corporation, Gambro Inc, Datatronics Romoland Inc, The Estate of Paul Maslin, Sigma Casting Corporation, Gaiser Tool Company, Hexcel Corporation, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Ojai Manufacturing Technology Inc, Burtin Urethane Corporation, NMB Technologies Corp, BASF Corporation, Remet Corporation, Nellcor Puritan-Bennett LLC, Maxwell Technologies Inc, Southern California Edison Co, Pioneer Video Manufacturing Inc, Titan Corporation, Teledyne Industries Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, MD Pharmaceutical Inc, Boeing North American Inc, Rogers Corporation, Troy Lighting Inc - Tiffany Division, Gamma-F Corp, Printed Circuits Unlimited, International Paper Company, Valmont Coatings Inc, British Alcan Aluminum P L C, Pneumo-Abex Corporation, Robinson Prezioso Inc, Golden West Refining Company, Appropriate Technologies II Inc, Huck Manufacturing Company, Armor All Products Corporation, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, Specific Plating Company Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Litton Systems Inc, The May Department Stores Company LLC, Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Honeywell International Inc and Yellow Freight Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2007cv01471
Filed: November 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 1203 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Semaan counsel for Defendant Firmenich Incorporated. Adding Amanda Semaan as counsel of record for Firmenich, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Firmenich, Inc.. (Attorney Amanda Semaan added to party Firmenich Incorporated(pty:dft))(Semaan, Amanda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1202 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Judith Maria Praitis counsel for Defendant Firmenich Incorporated. Changing Firm Name to Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. Changing email to judith.praitis@faegredrinker.com. Filed by Defendant Firmenich Incorporated. (Praitis, Judith)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1201 NOTICE of Change of address by Nancy Sher Cohen attorney for Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Arlon Adhesives & Film, BP America Inc, British Alcan Aluminum P L C, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Luxfer Gas Cylinders, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Sigma Casting Corporation, Signet Armorlite Inc, Texaco Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Universal City Studios Inc, Weber Aircraft LP, Yort Inc. Changing attorneys address to 2049 Century Park East, Suite 3500S, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Arlon Adhesives & Film, BP America Inc, British Alcan Aluminum P L C, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Luxfer Gas Cylinders, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Sigma Casting Corporation, Signet Armorlite Inc, Texaco Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Universal City Studios Inc, Weber Aircraft LP, Yort Inc. (Cohen, Nancy)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1200 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report,, #1197 . (Redford, Jonathan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1199 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Arlon Adhesives & Film, BP America Inc, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Luxfer Gas Cylinders, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Sigma Casting Corporation, Signet Armorlite Inc, Texaco Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Universal City Studios Inc, Weber Aircraft LP, Yort Inc. correcting Status Report,, #1197 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Nancy)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1198 JOINDER filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, Eaton Corporation, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Loma Linda University, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation joining in Status Report,, #1197 . (Millhouse, Keith)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1197 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Alcoa Inc, AlliedSignal Inc, Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, BASF Corporation, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Boeing North American Inc, FHL Group, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, International Paper Company, Mattel Inc, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Ratheon Company, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Shell Oil Company, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. (Cohen, Nancy)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1196 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Oberst, Brett)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1195 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1194 STATUS REPORT of Defendants Firmenich, Inc. and Hexion Inc. (sued as Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.) filed by Defendants Firmenich Incorporated, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Grever, Thomas)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1193 Notice of Electronic Filing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #1192 e-mailed to Kelly M. Morrison bounced due to 5.7.129 RESOLVER.RST.RestrictedToRecipients. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed to this action no later than FEBRUARY 18, 2020. (shb)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1190 Request to Substitute Attorney, Ernest John Hahn in place and instead of attorney Gene A. Lucero. (shb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1190 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Gene A. Lucero as counsel of record filed by Defendant Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lucero, Gene)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1189 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gene A. Lucero counsel for Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc. Gene A. Lucero is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation; Safety-Kleen Systems Inc. (Lucero, Gene)
May 31, 2019 Filing 1188 Mail Returned addressed to Diane R. Smith re Order on Request to Substitute Attorney #1186 (twdb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #1180 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of John J Lormon and Gabriels Rios for Defendant Signet Armorlite Inc. (shb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #1179 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of Mark Erik Elliott for Defendant Texaco Inc. (shb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #1178 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of Mark Erik Elliott for Union Oil Company of California. (shb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1183 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael R Leslie counsel for Defendant Shell Oil Company. Alison Mackenzie is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Leslie, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1182 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael R Leslie counsel for Defendant Shell Oil Company. Sandra Tholen is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Leslie, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #1177 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of John Frank Cermak, Jr., and Sonja Ann Inglin for Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (shb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1181 Notice of Electronic Filing re REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Mark Erik Elliott as counsel of record #1179 , REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY John J Lorman as counsel of record #1180 , REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Mark Erik Elliott as counsel of record #1178 e-mailed to Sandra Tholen, tholen@caldwell-leslie.com bounced due to The following addresses had permanent fatal errors ----- tholen@caldwell-leslie.com. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 15, 2019 Filing 1180 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY John J Lorman as counsel of record filed by Defendant Signet Armorlite Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Signet Armorlite Inc(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1179 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Mark Erik Elliott as counsel of record filed by Defendant Texaco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Texaco Inc(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1178 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Mark Erik Elliott as counsel of record filed by Defendant Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Union Oil Company of California(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1177 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY John Frank Cermak, Jr. as counsel of record filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Sigma Casting Corporation(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1176 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report, #1170 . (Redford, Jonathan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1174 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Caufield, Jeffery)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1173 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Oberst, Brett)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1172 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Brett H Oberst counsel for Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. Changing address to 725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3275, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Changing fax number to (213) 542-3381. Filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company f/k/a Southern Pacific Transportation Company. (Oberst, Brett)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1171 JOINDER filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, Eaton Corporation, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Loma Linda University, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation joining in Status Report, #1170 . (Millhouse, Keith)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1170 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Arlon Adhesives & Film, BP America Inc, British Alcan Aluminum P L C, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Universal City Studios Inc, Weber Aircraft LP, Yort Inc. (Cohen, Nancy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1169 STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANTS FIRMENICH, INC. AND HEXION INC. (SUED AS HEXION SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC.) filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Grever, Thomas)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1168 NOTICE of Change of address by Wendy L Feng attorney for Defendants AlliedSignal Inc, Boeing North American Inc, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Ratheon Company. Changing attorneys address to 415 Mission Street Suite 5400 San Francisco, CA 94105. Filed by Defendants AlliedSignal Inc, Boeing North American Inc, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Ratheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Section I)(Feng, Wendy)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1175 Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: changing address to 2778 Dove Tail Dr., San Marcos CA 92078-0931, changing email to douglas.ditonto@gmail.com for attorney Douglas P. Ditonto. (yl)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1167 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa A Delorme counsel for Defendant Southern California Edison Co. Douglas Ditonto is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Southern California Edison Company. (Delorme, Lisa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1166 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sandra L Gryder counsel for Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. Beverlee E. Silva is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Gryder, Sandra)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1165 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice (Other) #1164 e-mailed to Beverlee E Silva of beverlee.silva@alston.com bounced due to 550 5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.Recipient NotFound. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 8, 2019 Filing 1164 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF PENDENCY OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Hexion, Inc. Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Grever, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1163 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #1162 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel G-001. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect form used. Please use the search feature and search for form name or number: Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel G-001. Please go to the court's website and search under form for the above form. Please attach the [Prop] Order as the second attachment to the Request. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1162 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Frank Cermak, Jr counsel for Defendants Eaton Corporation, International Paper Company. Loura L. Alaverdi is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants International Paper and Eaton Corporation. (Cermak, John)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1161 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Peter Hsiao counsel for Defendant Mattel Inc. Changing address and firm name to King & Spalding LLP, 633 W. 5th Street, Suite 1700, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing e-mail and fax number to PHsiao@kslaw.com; 213.443.4310. Filed by Defendant Mattel Inc.. (Hsiao, Peter)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: The Court has reviewed the joint status reports filed by the parties and hereby notifies counsel that the next joint status report must be filed by May 1, 2019. (shb)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1159 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report, #1155 . (Redford, Jonathan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1158 Mail Returned addressed to Diane R Smith re Substitution of Attorney - Granted #1151 (shb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1157 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Oberst, Brett)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1156 JOINDER filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, Eaton Corporation, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Loma Linda University, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation joining in Status Report, #1155 . (Millhouse, Keith)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1155 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Arlon Adhesives & Film, BP America Inc, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Luxfer Gas Cylinders, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Universal City Studios Inc, Weber Aircraft LP, Yort Inc. (Cohen, Nancy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1154 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Firmenich Incorporated, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Praitis, Judith)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1153 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Sonja Ann Inglin counsel for Defendants Eaton Corporation, International Paper Company, Sigma Casting Corporation. Changing address to 12121 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 322, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Changing telephone & fax numbers to T: 424-465-1532; F: 424-371-5032. Filed by defendant Eaton Corporation, International Paper Company, and Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1152 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney John Frank Cermak, Jr counsel for Defendants Eaton Corporation, International Paper Company, Sigma Casting Corporation. Changing address to 12121 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 322, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Changing telephone & fax numbers to T: 424-465-1531; F: 424-371-5032. Filed by defendant Eaton Corporation, International Paper Company, and Sigma Casting Corporation. (Cermak, John)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY NANCY SHER COHEN IN PLACE AND INSTEAD OF ADAM P WILEY FOR UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS, INC. #1150 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (lc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1150 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Errata #1149 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Nancy)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1149 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Universal City Studios Inc. correcting REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Donald C. Nanney #1094 (Cohen, Nancy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1148 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Donald C Nanney counsel for Defendant Walt Disney Pictures and Television. Changing firm name to Cozen O'Connor. Changing email to dnanney@cozen.com. Filed by Defendant Walt Disney Pictures, erroneously sued as Walt Disney Pictures and Television. (Nanney, Donald)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed to this action no later than November 2, 2018. (shb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1146 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sandra L Gryder counsel for Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. Kevin D. Jamison is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc.. (Gryder, Sandra)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1145 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Sonja Ann Inglin counsel for Defendants Eaton Corporation, International Paper Company, Sigma Casting Corporation. Changing Email to singlin@cermaklegal.com. Filed by defendants Eaton Corporation, International Paper Company, and Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1143 Defendant, Arlon Adhesives and Film Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of Stephen J O'Neil. (shb)
July 25, 2018 Filing 1143 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Stephen J. O'Neil filed by Defendant Arlon Adhesives & Film. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Arlon Adhesives & Film(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr., GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of attorney Keith F Millhouse for Defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company in place and stead of Gregg W Brugger #1139 . The clerk is hereby ordered to terminate Notices of Electronic Filing for the withdrawing attorney(s) in this case. (jp)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1141 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, re REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Gregg W. Brugger as counsel of record #1139 served on July 19, 2018. (Brugger, Gregg)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1140 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation, re Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #1138 Diana F Biason and Diane R Smith served on July 19, 2018. (Cermak, John)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1139 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Gregg W. Brugger as counsel of record filed by Defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brugger, Gregg)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1138 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney John Frank Cermak, Jr counsel for Defendant Eaton Corporation. Changing Firm Name & Address to Cermak & Inglin, LLP, 11755 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1250, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Changing Email and fax number to jcermak@cermaklegal.com and 310-575-2571. Filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Cermak, John)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1136 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen for defendant Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation as attorney of record instead of attorney Jeffrey D Wexler. (lom)
May 14, 2018 Filing 1136 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Jeffrey D. Wexler as counsel of record filed by Defendant Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Nancy)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1132 Request to Substitute Attorney for Defendant Johns Manville. Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen is substituted to represent defendant Johns Manville in place and instead of Attorney Jeffrey D Wexler. (shb)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1131 Request to Substitute Attorney. To substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of Christopher E Prince. (shb)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1130 Request to Substitute Attorney. Nancy Sher Cohen added in place and instead of Donald E. Chomiak. (shb)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1132 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Jeffrey D. Wexler filed by Defendant Johns Manville International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Nancy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1131 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Christopher E Prince as counsel of record filed by Defendant Yort Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Nancy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1130 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Donald E Chomiak as counsel of record filed by Defendant Yort Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Nancy)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1126 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in stead and in place of Laura Jean Carroll for Defendant Johns Manville erroneously sued as Johns Manville International. (shb)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1125 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen instead of Laura Jean Carroll for Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals LLC, erroneously sued as GATX Terminals. (shb)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1124 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and of Laura Jean Carroll for Defendant Texus Instruments Tucson Corporation. (shb)
April 30, 2018 Filing 1126 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Laura Jean Carroll filed by Defendant Johns Manville International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Johns Manville International Inc(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
April 30, 2018 Filing 1125 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Laura Jean Carroll filed by Defendant Gatx Terminals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Gatx Terminals Corporation(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
April 30, 2018 Filing 1124 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Laura Jean Carroll filed by Defendant Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1122 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Donald C. Nanney #1094 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Nancy)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #1121 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: The Court hereby orders that the request of Johns Manville, erroneously sued as Johns Manville International Inc., Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC, erroneously sued as Gatx Terminals Corp., and Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation to substitute Laura J. Carroll who is retained counsel as attorney of record instead of Laura J. Carroll of Law Office of Laura J Carroll is hereby GRANTED. (yl)
April 16, 2018 Filing 1121 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Laura J. Carroll of Zuber Lawler & Del Duca LLP in place of attorney Laura J. Carroll of Law Office of Laura J Carroll filed by Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Carroll, Laura)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1114 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of Sonja Ann Inglin; John Frank Cermak, Jr.; Loura L Alaverdi. Added attorney Nancy Sher Cohen for British Alcan Aluminum P L C. (shb)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1105 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of James D Fraser. (shb)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1104 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of Attorney Alexis Sean Gutierrez. (shb)
April 6, 2018 Filing 1116 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Firmenich Incorporated, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Praitis, Judith)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1117 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Address, #1115 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1115 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Laura Jean Carroll attorney for Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. Changing firm name to Zuber Lawler & Del Duca LLP and address to 350 S. Grand Avenue, 32nd Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. (Carroll, Laura)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1114 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Sonja Ann Inglin filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Luxfer Gas Cylinders(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1113 JOINDER filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc joining in Status Report, #1108 . (Taylor, Brett)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1112 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Oberst, Brett)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1111 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report, #1108 . (Redford, Jonathan)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1110 JOINDER filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, Eaton Corporation, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Loma Linda University, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation joining in Status Report, #1108 . (Millhouse, Keith)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1109 NOTICE Joinder in Status Report of Omega PRP Group filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, Eaton Corporation, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Loma Linda University, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Millhouse, Keith)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1108 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, BP America Inc, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Universal City Studios Inc. (Cohen, Nancy)
April 3, 2018 Filing 1107 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order on Request to Substitute Attorney #1106 , REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney James D Fraser #1105 e-mailed to drsmith@smithtrager.com bounced due to 5.1.2 - Bad destination host 'DNS Hard Error looking up smithtrager.com (MX): NXDomain' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1101 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen. Attorney Gary M Roberts terminated (shb)
April 2, 2018 Filing 1105 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney James D Fraser filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party The Sherwin-Willimas Company(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 29, 2018 Filing 1104 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Alexis Sean Gutierrez filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Weber Aircraft LP(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 29, 2018 Filing 1103 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1102 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1102 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sandra L Gryder counsel for Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. Adding Sandra L. Gryder as counsel of record for UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Attorney Sandra L Gryder added to party United Parcel Service Inc(pty:dft))(Gryder, Sandra)
March 21, 2018 Filing 1101 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Gary M. Roberts filed by Defendant Yort Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Yort Inc(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1094 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen as attorney of record instead of Donald C. Nanney for defendant Universal Studios LLC, erroneously sued as Universal City Studios, Inc. (lom)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1093 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen as attorney of record instead Stephen T Holzer for Defendant BP Amoco Chemical Company erroneously sued as BP America, Inc. (lom)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #1092 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen as attorney of record instead Wendy L Feng for Defendant Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation. (lom)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #1090 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen as attorney of record instead of Peter Hsiao for Defendant Scripto-Tokai Corporation. (lom)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #1088 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1088 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen as attorney of record instead of Patricia M O'Toole for Defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (lom)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1089 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen in place and instead of Attorney Stephen T Holzer for defendant Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. Attorney Stephen T Holzer terminated (shb)
March 15, 2018 Filing 1094 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Donald C. Nanney filed by Defendant Universal City Studios Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Universal City Studios Inc(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 12, 2018 Filing 1093 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Stephen T Holzer filed by Defendant BP America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party BP America Inc(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 8, 2018 Filing 1092 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Wendy L Feng filed by Defendant Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 8, 2018 Filing 1091 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael R Leslie counsel for Defendant Shell Oil Company. SANDRA L. THOLEN is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Leslie, Michael)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1090 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Peter Hsiao filed by Defendant Scripto-Tokai Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Scripto-Tokai Corporation(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1089 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Stephen T Holzer filed by Defendant Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1088 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Patricia M O'Toole filed by Defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Pacific Bell Telephone Company(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1087 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy Sher Cohen counsel for Defendant Alpha Therapeutic Corporation. Adding Nancy Sher Cohen as counsel of record for Alpha Therapeutic Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alpha Therapeutic Corporation. (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Alpha Therapeutic Corporation(pty:dft))(Cohen, Nancy)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1086 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis D Pond counsel for Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. Adding FRANCIS D. POND as counsel of record for UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party United Parcel Service Inc(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
February 27, 2018 Filing 1085 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order on Motion to Continue #1084 , REQUEST to Continue March 5, 2018 Deadline to Submit Status Report from March 5, 2018 to April 5, 2018 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #1081 #1083 e-mailed to leslie.schenck@univarusa.com bounced due to 550 5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipientNotFound; Recipient leslie.schenck@univarusa.com not found by SMTP address lookup. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #1083 REQUEST to Continue Status Report deadline. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The March 1, 2018 deadline to submit a status report in this action is continued to April 5, 2018. (shb)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1083 REQUEST to Continue March 5, 2018 Deadline to Submit Status Report from March 5, 2018 to April 5, 2018 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #1081 filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Nancy)
February 22, 2018 Filing 1082 STATUS REPORT of Defendants Firmenich, Inc. and Hexion Inc. (Sued as Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.) filed by Defendants Firmenich Incorporated, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Praitis, Judith)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS L PARTIES ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALby Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr:Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed to this action no later than MARCH 5, 2018. (shb)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed to this action no later than MARCH 5, 2018. (shb)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1076 Request to Substitute Attorney Jeffrey L Caufield in place and instead of Bret A Stone and John R Till for plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Co, Inc and John Locke. (shb)
October 11, 2017 Filing 1076 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Jeffery L. Caufield in place of attorney Bret A. Stone filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caufield, Jeffery)
October 2, 2017 Filing 1075 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Nancy Sher Cohen counsel for Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. Changing Firm Name to Lathrop Gage LLP. Changing e-mail to ncohen@lathropgage.com. Filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. (Cohen, Nancy)
June 27, 2017 Filing 1074 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John D Edgcomb counsel for Defendants McKesson Corporation, Seymour Moslin, Havery Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin. Mary E. Wilke will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Edgcomb, John)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1072 Non-Resident Attorney Keith P. McManus APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of BASF Corporation, designating Joshua G Simon as local counsel. (shb)
June 21, 2017 Filing 1072 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith P. McManus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant BASF Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20054615) filed by defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Simon, Joshua)
May 22, 2017 Filing 1071 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John D Edgcomb counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Mary E. Wilke will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Mary E. Wilke is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Edgcomb, John)
May 22, 2017 Filing 1070 Notice of Electronic Filing re Status Report #1069 e-mailed to bsb2@pge.com bounced due to 5.3.0 - Other mail system problem 550-'5.1.1 User Unknown' (delivery attempts: 0). Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to bbenson212@gmail.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 19, 2017 Filing 1069 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. (Taylor, Brett)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1068 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Firmenich Incorporated, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Praitis, Judith)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1067 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report #1063 . (Redford, Jonathan)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1066 STATUS REPORT on Behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company F/K/A Southern Pacific Transportation Company filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Oberst, Brett)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1065 JOINDER filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, Eaton Corporation, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Loma Linda University, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation joining in Status Report #1063 . (Millhouse, Keith)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1064 JOINDER filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC joining in Status Report #1063 . (Millhouse, Keith)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1063 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Of Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company, Inc. And John Locke And Defendant Omega Chemical Prp Group filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. (Cohen, Nancy)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1059 Request to Substitute Attorney Joshua G. Simon in place and instead of Kristina Starr Azlin on behalf of Defendant BASF Corporation. (shb)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1060 Request to Substitute Attorney Michael R. Leslie in place and instead of Michael R Leslie and Alison Margaret MacKenzie. Attorney Michael R Leslie and Alison Margaret Mackenzie terminated (shb)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1060 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY MICHAEL R. LESLIE in place of attorney MICHAEL R. LESLIE filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney) (Leslie, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 1059 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Joshua G. Simon in place of attorney Kristina Starr Azlin filed by defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Joshua G Simon added to party BASF Corporation(pty:dft)) (Simon, Joshua)
March 22, 2017 Filing 1057 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam P. Wiley counsel for Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. Adding Adam P. Wiley as counsel of record for Walt Disney Pictures and Universal City Studios LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Walt Disney Pictures and Universal City Studios LLC. (Attorney Adam P. Wiley added to party Universal City Studios Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Adam P. Wiley added to party Walt Disney Pictures and Television(pty:dft))(Wiley, Adam)
March 22, 2017 Filing 1056 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donald C Nanney counsel for Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. Yen N. Hope is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Walt Disney Pictures and Universal City Studios LLC. (Nanney, Donald)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, JR. Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed to this action no later than May 19, 2017. (shb)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, re Errata, #1051 . The Court hereby orders that the request for an order from the Court to correct the record to reflect that: 1. Keith F. Millhouse of Millhouse Law Group is the sole counsel for Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC in this matter, and 2. Nancy Sher Cohen of Proskauer Rose LLP is the sole counsel for Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group (OPOG) in this matter and does not represent Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen terminated. (shb)
September 9, 2016 Filing 1053 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Errata, #1051 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Nancy)
September 8, 2016 Filing 1052 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Errata, #1051 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment.: Other Filings - Please submit a Notice of Lodging and Attach the Proposed Order as the withdraw is to both defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group ("OPOG"). The docketing event is: Civil Events - select - Notices - select - Notice of Lodging and attach the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
September 7, 2016 Filing 1051 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. correcting REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Edward S. Renwick, Larry G. Gutterridge, Scott A. Lehecka #1035 (Cohen, Nancy)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1036 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen for Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. Attorney Keith F Millhouse terminated (shb)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1035 Request to Substitute Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen. Added attorney Nancy Sher Cohen for Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. Attorney Larry G Gutterridge and Scott A Lehecka terminated (shb)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1048 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. Amendment to Status Report #1037 Amended List of Parties Joining Status Report (Millhouse, Keith)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1047 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report #1037 . (Redford, Jonathan)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1046 STATUS REPORT of NCR Corporation, et al filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Sierracin Corporation, Yellow Freight Systems Inc. (McGaw, Peter)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1045 JOINDER filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Loma Linda University, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation joining in Status Report #1037 . (Millhouse, Keith)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1044 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Stone, Bret)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1043 JOINDER filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc joining in Status Report #1037 . (Jamison, Kevin)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1042 JOINDER filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP joining in Status Report #1037 . (Gutierrez, Alexis)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1041 JOINDER filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc joining in Status Report #1037 . (Taylor, Brett)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1040 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Firmenich Incorporated, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (La Scala, Paul)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1039 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Oberst, Brett)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1038 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report #1037 . (Inglin, Sonja)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1037 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1036 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Keith F. Millhouse filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Nancy)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1035 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Nancy Sher Cohen in place of attorney Edward S. Renwick, Larry G. Gutterridge, Scott A. Lehecka filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nancy Sher Cohen added to party Omega Chemical PRP Group(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Nancy)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: Counsel are hereby notified that a Joint Status Report must be filed to this action no later than 8/24/2016. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Rick R. Rothman for Defendant Hexcel Corporation in place of Attorneys Nicole Skolout and Joanne Lichtman #1032 . (gk)
June 28, 2016 Filing 1032 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Rick R. Rothman in place of attorney Nicole A. Skolout filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Skolout, Nicole)
May 10, 2016 Filing 1031 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #1029 , #1030 . The following error(s) was found: There is no text information identifying the attached document. The text provided should reflect the attached document. Text example: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel. It is important that you use the correct event, as this document is viewed by Attorney Admissions. Use the Search feature for doc title or form number. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
May 9, 2016 Filing 1030 (Davis, Kevin)
May 6, 2016 Filing 1029 (Attorney Gabriela Rios added to party Applied Micro Circuits Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Gabriela Rios added to party Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Gabriela Rios added to party Signet Armorlite Inc(pty:dft))(Rios, Gabriela)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1024 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Geoffrey C. Rathgeber on behalf of Defendant United Parcel Service, designating Kevin D. Jamison as local counsel. (lt)
April 5, 2016 Filing 1027 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Scott A Lehecka counsel for Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. Changing e-mail to slehecka@hanmor.com. Filed by Attorney for Defendants, Scott Lehecka. (Lehecka, Scott)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1025 Request to Substitute Attorney James D Fraser in place and stead of Gregory Evans. Added attorney James D Fraser for The Sherwin-Willimas Company. Attorney Gregory Evans terminated (shb)
March 24, 2016 Filing 1025 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY James D. Fraser in place of attorney Gregory Evans filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Evans, Gregory)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1024 APPLICATION for attorney GEOFFREY C. RATHGEBER to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17505855 paid.) filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Jamison, Kevin)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1023 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah T Babcock counsel for Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. Sarah Babcock is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sarah Babcock. (Babcock, Sarah)
March 8, 2016 Filing 1022 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. correcting Status Report #1020 (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1021 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report #1013 . (Evans, Gregory)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1020 STATUS REPORT (missing attachment included) filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1019 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant NCR Corporation. (McGaw, Peter)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1018 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report #1013 . (Inglin, Sonja)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1017 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. (Taylor, Brett)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1016 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report #1013 . (Redford, Jonathan)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1015 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Firmenich Incorporated, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Grever, Thomas)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1014 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Oberst, Brett)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1013 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1012 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Stone, Bret)
February 3, 2016 Filing 1011 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy P Lally counsel for Defendant Firmenich Incorporated. Amy P. Lally is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Firmenich Incorporated. (Lally, Amy)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1010 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda R Farfel on behalf of Defendant Firmenich Incorporated (Attorney Amanda R Farfel added to party Firmenich Incorporated(pty:dft))(Farfel, Amanda)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1009 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Judith Maria Praitis on behalf of Defendant Firmenich Incorporated (Attorney Judith Maria Praitis added to party Firmenich Incorporated(pty:dft))(Praitis, Judith)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1008 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John D Edgcomb counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Michael A. G. Einhorn is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Edgcomb, John)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed to this action no later than February 29, 2016. Counsel are hereby reminded that if the parties seek to lift the stay a proper notice motion must be filed. (shb)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1006 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brett Nicole Taylor counsel for Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. Michael J. Partos is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Reed & Graham, Inc.. (Taylor, Brett)
November 20, 2015 Filing 1005 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brett Nicole Taylor counsel for Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. Adding Brett N. Taylor as counsel of record for Reed & Graham, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Reed & Graham, Inc.. (Attorney Brett Nicole Taylor added to party Reed & Graham Inc(pty:dft))(Taylor, Brett)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1001 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David B. Farer on behalf of Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co, designating Brett H. Oberst as local counsel. (lt)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #1002 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Luke J. Kealy on behalf of Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co, designating Brett H. Oberst as local counsel. (lt)
August 12, 2015 Filing 1002 APPLICATION for attorney Luke J. Kealy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16250995 paid.) filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Oberst, Brett)
August 12, 2015 Filing 1001 APPLICATION for attorney David B. Farer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16250788 paid.) filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Oberst, Brett)
August 12, 2015 Filing 1000 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #998 e-mailed to Michael J. Partos bounced due to user unknown. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2015 Filing 999 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donald C Nanney counsel for Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. Adding Yen N. Hope as counsel of record for Walt Disney Pictures and Universal City Studios LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Walt Disney Pictures and Universal City Studios LLC. (Nanney, Donald)
August 10, 2015 Filing 998 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donald C Nanney counsel for Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. Kevin M. Yopp is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Walt Disney Pictures and Universal City Studios LLC. (Nanney, Donald)
July 22, 2015 Filing 995 Notice of Electronic Filing re Status Report #984 , First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Larry G. Gutteridge as counsel of record #985 , First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Keith F. Millhouse as counsel of record #986 , Status Report #987 , Notice of Lodging #988 , Notice of Lodging #989 , Joinder (non-motion) #990 , Status Report #991 , Joinder (non-motion) #992 , Joinder (non-motion) #993 , Status Report #994 e-mailed to Attorney Diana F Biason at dbiason@millerbarondess.com bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #985 Request to Substitute Attorney. Substituting attorney Brett H. Oberst for Southern Pacific Transportion Company in place and stead of attorney Larry G. Gutteridge. Attorney Larry G Gutterridge terminated (lt)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 996 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #986 Request to Substitute Attorney. Substituting attorney Brett H. Oberst for Southern Pacific Transportion Company in place and stead of attorney Keith F. Millhouse. Attorney Keith F Millhouse terminated (lt)
July 20, 2015 Filing 994 STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Grever, Thomas)
July 20, 2015 Filing 993 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report #987 . (Redford, Jonathan)
July 17, 2015 Filing 992 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report #987 . (Evans, Gregory)
July 17, 2015 Filing 991 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Oberst, Brett)
July 17, 2015 Filing 990 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report #987 . (Inglin, Sonja)
July 17, 2015 Filing 989 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Keith F. Millhouse as counsel of record #986 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gutterridge, Larry)
July 17, 2015 Filing 988 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Larry G. Gutteridge as counsel of record #985 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gutterridge, Larry)
July 17, 2015 Filing 987 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. (Gutterridge, Larry)
July 17, 2015 Filing 986 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Keith F. Millhouse as counsel of record filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Gutterridge, Larry)
July 17, 2015 Filing 985 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Larry G. Gutteridge as counsel of record filed by Defendant Southern Pacific Transportation Co. (Gutterridge, Larry)
July 17, 2015 Filing 984 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Stone, Bret)
June 22, 2015 Filing 983 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul R Smith counsel for Defendant Mico Inc. Gregory E. Korstad is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant MICO, Inc.. (Smith, Paul)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 982 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #981 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul R. Smith on behalf of Defendant MICRO, Inc., designating Gilbert S. Lee as local counsel. (lt)
June 4, 2015 Filing 981 APPLICATION for to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15843744 paid.) filed by Defendant Mico Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Lee, Gilbert)
May 18, 2015 Filing 980 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gilbert Lee counsel for Defendant Mico Inc. Christopher B. Leonard is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Gilbert S. Lee Mico Inc.. (Lee, Gilbert)
May 18, 2015 Filing 979 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gilbert Lee counsel for Defendant Mico Inc. Adding Gilbert S. Lee as counsel of record for Mico, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Gilbert S. Lee Mico, Inc.. (Attorney Gilbert Lee added to party Mico Inc(pty:dft))(Lee, Gilbert)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 978 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed to this action no later than 7/17/2015. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
April 13, 2015 Filing 977 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #976 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Change of Attorney Information. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 2, 2015 Filing 976 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Evans, Gregory)
February 18, 2015 Filing 975 STATUS REPORT and Joinder in Avery Dennison Corporation's Status Report (Docket No. 971) filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. (Partos, Michael)
February 17, 2015 Filing 974 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report,, #971 . (Evans, Gregory)
February 17, 2015 Filing 973 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report,, #971 . (Inglin, Sonja)
February 17, 2015 Filing 972 JOINDER filed by Defendant NCR Corporation joining in Status Report,, #971 . (McGaw, Peter)
February 17, 2015 Filing 971 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Union Oil Company of California, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Gutterridge, Larry)
February 17, 2015 Filing 970 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report #968 . (Redford, Jonathan)
February 17, 2015 Filing 969 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret)
February 17, 2015 Filing 968 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Firmenich Incorporated, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Praitis, Judith)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Robin M Hulshizer for Gambro Inc., in place and stead of Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Richard A Horsch #966 . (jp)
January 20, 2015 Filing 966 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Robin M. Hulshizer in place of attorney Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Richard A. Horsch filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 965 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed to this action no later than FEBRUARY 17, 2015. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
November 14, 2014 Filing 964 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice (Other) #963 e-mailed to Attorney Scott A Lehecka at slehecka@hanmor.com bounced due to invalid email. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 14, 2014 Filing 963 NOTICE Applied Micro Circuits Corporation. Notice of Consent to E-Service of Documents (Lormon, John)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 962 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: The Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system is the case management system for the District Court. CM/ECF allows the Court to accept filings and provide access to filed documents over the Internet. CM/ECF keeps out-of-pocket expenses low, gives concurrent access to case files by multiple parties,and offers expanded search and reporting capabilities. The Court has been advised that attorney John J. Lormon has not consented to e-service of documentsfiled with the Courts CM/ECF filing system. John J. Lormon is requested to file a response within 10 days hereof indicating whether he/she willconsent to e-service of filed documents. Attached hereto are the instructions for communicating consent. If needed, assistance is available at the website provided in the instructions. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv)
October 17, 2014 Filing 961 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND NOTICE OF STAY Under Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Defendant Reichhold, Inc. as to Reichhold, Inc., Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, Case Number 14-12238 (MFW). (gk)
May 27, 2014 Filing 960 NOTICE of Change of address by Robin Melissa Hulshizer attorney for Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Gambro Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc. Changing attorneys address to 330 North Wabash, Suite 2800, Chicago, IL 60611. Filed by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Gambro Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc. (Hulshizer, Robin)
May 12, 2014 Filing 959 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peter Hsiao on behalf of Defendant Mattel Inc (Hsiao, Peter)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 958 AMENDED MINUTES OF IN CHAMBER - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES #957 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: Counsel are hereby notified that the minutes filed on 4/30/2014 #954 in the above case were issued in error. No Order to show cause has been issued in this case. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 957 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that the minutes filed on April 30, 2014 #943 in the above case were issued in error. No Order to show cause has been issued in this case. (im)
May 1, 2014 Filing 956 Notice of Electronic Filing re Status Report #947 ,Joinder (non-motion) #948 , Joinder (non-motion) #949 , Joinder (non-motion) #950 ,Joinder (non-motion) #951 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #952 , Joinder (non-motion) #953 e-mailed to attorney Gene Lucero bounced due to invalid email. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to genelucero213@gmail.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 1, 2014 Filing 955 JOINDER filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP joining in Status Report,, #945 . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gutierrez, Alexis)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 954 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - Notice and Order to all parties by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: On 4/14/2014, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution #943 . On 4/30/2014, Plaintiff filed a Response to the Order to Show Cause. The Court having considered the Plaintiff's response deems the response satisfactory and adequately addresses the Court's concerns. Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause is hereby vacated and discharged. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) ** CIVIL MINUTES ISSUED IN ERROR, NO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HAS BEEN ISSUED, SEE AMENDED CIVIL MINUTES OF 5/7/2014 #958 ** Modified on 5/7/2014 (gk).
April 30, 2014 Filing 953 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report,, #945 . (Fischbach, Ryan)
April 30, 2014 Filing 952 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc, re Joinder (non-motion) #951 served on April 30, 2014. (Partos, Michael)
April 30, 2014 Filing 951 JOINDER filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc joining in Status Report,, #945 . (Partos, Michael)
April 30, 2014 Filing 950 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report,, #945 . (Evans, Gregory)
April 30, 2014 Filing 949 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report,, #945 . (Redford, Jonathan)
April 30, 2014 Filing 948 JOINDER filed by Defendant NCR Corporation joining in Status Report,, #945 . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McGaw, Peter)
April 30, 2014 Filing 947 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret)
April 29, 2014 Filing 946 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Status Report,, #945 served on April 29, 2014. (Gutterridge, Larry)
April 29, 2014 Filing 945 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry)
April 21, 2014 Filing 944 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robin Melissa Hulshizer counsel for Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Gambro Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc. Adding Robin M. Hulshizer as attorney as counsel of record for Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., Gambro, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Robin M. Hulshizer. (Attorney Robin Melissa Hulshizer added to party Baxter Healthcare Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Robin Melissa Hulshizer added to party Gambro Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Robin Melissa Hulshizer added to party Safety-Kleen Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Hulshizer, Robin)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 943 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: Counsel are hereby notified that a joint status report must be filed no later than 4/30/2014. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 23, 2013 Filing 942 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sonja Ann Inglin counsel for Defendant Eaton Corporation. Alysa M. Keller is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Inglin, Sonja)
December 23, 2013 Filing 941 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sonja Ann Inglin counsel for Defendant Eaton Corporation. Alysa M. Keller is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
December 19, 2013 Filing 940 NOTICE of Change of address by Bret A Stone attorney for Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. Changing attorneys address to 3 W. Carrillo St., Suite 212, Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret)
December 13, 2013 Filing 939 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin M Davis counsel for Defendants Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, Signet Armorlite Inc. Adding Kevin Davis as attorney as counsel of record for Applied Micro Circuits Corporation; Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc.; Signet Armorlite Inc for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation; Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc.; Signet Armorlite Inc. (Attorney Kevin M Davis added to party Applied Micro Circuits Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Davis added to party Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Davis added to party Signet Armorlite Inc(pty:dft))(Davis, Kevin)
December 13, 2013 Filing 938 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin M Davis counsel for Defendants Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, Signet Armorlite Inc. Evelyn F. Heidelberg is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation; Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc.; Signet Armorlite Inc. (Davis, Kevin)
November 8, 2013 Filing 937 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Reed & Graham Inc, re Status Report #936 served on November 8, 2013. (Partos, Michael)
November 8, 2013 Filing 936 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. (Partos, Michael)
October 31, 2013 Filing 935 JOINDER filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Sierracin Corporation, Yellow Freight Systems Inc joining in Status Report #932 . (McGaw, Peter)
October 30, 2013 Filing 934 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report #932 . (Evans, Gregory)
October 30, 2013 Filing 933 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report #932 . (Inglin, Sonja)
October 30, 2013 Filing 932 STATUS REPORT 10-30-13 filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. (Gutterridge, Larry)
October 30, 2013 Filing 931 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Ohline Corp. (Redford, Jonathan)
October 29, 2013 Filing 930 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret)
October 25, 2013 Filing 929 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah T Babcock counsel for Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. Adding Sarah T Babcock as attorney as counsel of record for United Parcel Service Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc.. (Babcock, Sarah)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 928 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #927 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah Babcock on behalf of defendant, designating Kevin Jamison as local counsel. (ak)
October 16, 2013 Filing 927 APPLICATION for attorney Sarah T. Babcock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Jamison, Kevin)
October 9, 2013 Filing 926 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alysa Michelle Dale Keller on behalf of Defendants Luxfer Gas Cylinders, Sigma Casting Corporation (Keller, Alysa)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 925 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS )by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that a status report must be filed by each party to this action no later than 10/30/2013. (ys)
June 14, 2013 Filing 924 NOTICE NOEs issued by Angeles Chemical Company filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. and John Locke (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Stone, Bret)
June 11, 2013 Filing 923 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Barbara S. Benson on behalf of Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co. Filed by Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co (Benson, Barbara)
June 4, 2013 Filing 922 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Scott D Mroz counsel for Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co. Filed by Defendant Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Mroz, Scott)
May 17, 2013 Filing 921 JOINDER filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Sierracin Corporation, Yellow Freight Systems Inc joining in Status Report #911 . (McGaw, Peter)
May 17, 2013 Filing 920 JOINDER filed by Defendants International Rectifier Corporation, NMB Technologies Corp joining in Status Report #911 . (Cohen, Albert)
May 16, 2013 Filing 919 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report #911 . (Evans, Gregory)
May 16, 2013 Filing 918 NOTICE of Change of address by Gregory Lawrence Evans attorney for Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. Changing attorneys address to 633 West Fifth Street, Floor Sixty Seven, Los Angeles, California 90071. Filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Evans, Gregory)
May 16, 2013 Filing 917 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report #911 . (Redford, Jonathan)
May 16, 2013 Filing 916 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret)
May 16, 2013 Filing 915 JOINDER filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders joining in Status Report #911 . (Inglin, Sonja)
May 16, 2013 Filing 914 JOINDER filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation joining in Status Report #911 . (Inglin, Sonja)
May 16, 2013 Filing 913 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report #911 . (Inglin, Sonja)
May 16, 2013 Filing 912 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, re Status Report #911 served on 05/16/13. (Gutterridge, Larry)
May 15, 2013 Filing 911 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. (Gutterridge, Larry)
April 16, 2013 Filing 910 Notice of Electronic Filing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #909 , Notice (Other) #907 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112), #908 e-mailed to ernie.hahn@lw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'#5.1.0 Address rejected.. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 909 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.Counsel are hereby notified that a status report must be filed by each party to this action no later than MAY 16, 2013. (ys)
April 16, 2013 Filing 908 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #907 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Address. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
April 16, 2013 Filing 907 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS filed by Defendants Mattel Inc, Scripto-Tokai Corporation. (Hsiao, Peter)
January 31, 2013 Filing 906 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret)
January 31, 2013 Filing 905 JOINDER filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Sierracin Corporation, Yellow Freight Systems Inc joining in Status Report #897 . (McGaw, Peter)
January 31, 2013 Filing 904 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report #897 . (Inglin, Sonja)
January 31, 2013 Filing 903 JOINDER filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders joining in Status Report #897 . (Inglin, Sonja)
January 31, 2013 Filing 902 JOINDER filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation joining in Status Report #897 . (Inglin, Sonja)
January 30, 2013 Filing 901 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report #897 . (Redford, Jonathan)
January 30, 2013 Filing 900 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report #897 . (Evans, Gregory)
January 30, 2013 Filing 899 JOINDER filed by Defendant International Rectifier Corporation joining in Status Report #897 . (Cohen, Albert)
January 30, 2013 Filing 898 OF SERVICE filed by defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Status Report served on 01/29/2013. (Gutterridge, Larry)
January 29, 2013 Filing 897 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. (Gutterridge, Larry)
January 24, 2013 Filing 896 DECLARATION of Joan Marie Wildman (Declaration of Service by Mail) re Notice of Appearance #895 filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc. (Barreno, Colin)
January 24, 2013 Filing 895 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Colin J Barreno on behalf of Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc (Barreno, Colin)
January 18, 2013 Filing 894 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney John D Edgcomb counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Firm Name to Edgcomb Law Group, LLP. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Edgcomb, John)
January 18, 2013 Filing 893 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael A.G. Einhorn counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Firm Name to Edgcomb Law Group, LLP. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Einhorn, Michael)
January 18, 2013 Filing 892 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary E Wilke counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Firm Name to Edgcomb Law Group, LLP. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wilke, Mary)
December 31, 2012 Filing 891 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael Raymond Jeffrey Mergens counsel for Defendant Mico Inc. Michael Raymond Jeffrey Mergens will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Michael Raymond Jeffrey Mergens is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Mico Inc. (Mergens, Michael)
December 7, 2012 Filing 890 NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that a status report must be filed by each party to this action no later than JANUARY 31, 2013. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ys) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2012 Filing 889 NOTICE of Change of address by Laura Jean Carroll attorney for Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. Changing attorneys address to 1100 Glendon Avenue, Suite 1400, Los Angles, CA 90024-3503. Filed by Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. (Carroll, Laura)
October 18, 2012 Filing 888 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Peter Hsiao counsel for Defendant Mattel Inc. Andrea L. Tozer will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Peter Hsiao (Hsiao, Peter)
October 4, 2012 Filing 887 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #885 , Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #884 , Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #886 served on 10/04/2012. (Wilke, Mary)
October 4, 2012 Filing 886 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary E Wilke counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing firm name to Edgcomb Law Group, P.C.. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Wilke, Mary)
October 4, 2012 Filing 885 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael A.G. Einhorn counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Address to One Post Street, Suite 2100, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Einhorn, Michael)
October 4, 2012 Filing 884 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary E Wilke counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Address to One Post Street, Suite 2100, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Wilke, Mary)
September 27, 2012 Filing 883 NOTICE of Change of address by Sandra L Tholen attorney for Defendant Shell Oil Company. Changing attorneys address to 725 South Figueroa Street, 31st Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017-5524. Filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Tholen, Sandra)
July 19, 2012 Filing 882 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Bonni Fine Kaufman counsel for Defendant BASF Corporation. Filed by attorney BASF (Kaufman, Bonni)
May 30, 2012 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #881 e-mailed to slehecka@comcast.net and matthew.dudley@sdma.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 < Account not available and matthew.dudley@sdma.com 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'No such user - psmtp' (delivery attempts: 0). Mr. Lehecka's notification was fowarded to slehecka@hanmor.com since his profile had previously been updated. Request sent that he file a G-06 form to remove himself from the case if he's no longer an attorney of record. matthew.dudley@sdma.com deleted as he's no longer with the firm. No fowarding information found. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 30, 2012 Filing 881 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary El Wilke counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Courtney M. LeBoeuf will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Courtney M. LeBoeuf is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Wilke, Mary)
May 4, 2012 Filing 880 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc, re Notice (Other) #879 served on 5-4-12. (Partos, Michael)
May 4, 2012 Filing 879 NOTICE NOTICE OF JOINDER OF REED & GRAHAM INC. AND CERTAIN OTHER DEFENDANTS STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. (Partos, Michael)
May 1, 2012 Filing 878 JOINDER filed by Defendants International Rectifier Corporation, NMB Technologies Corp joining in Status Report,, #862 . (Cohen, Albert)
April 30, 2012 Filing 877 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Nicole A Skolout counsel for Defendant Hexcel Corporation. Adding Nicole A. Skolout as attorney as counsel of record for Hexcel Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation (Skolout, Nicole)
April 30, 2012 Filing 876 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joanne Lichtman counsel for Defendant Hexcel Corporation. Changing firm name and address to Baker & Hostetler LLP, 555 South Flower St., Suite 4200, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing e-mail and fax number to jlichtman@bakerlaw.com; fax 310.442.8887. Filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation (Lichtman, Joanne)
April 30, 2012 Filing 875 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
April 30, 2012 Filing 874 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Inglin, Sonja)
April 30, 2012 Filing 873 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report,, #862 . (Evans, Gregory)
April 30, 2012 Filing 872 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke, re Status Report #871 served on 04/30/12. (Caufield, Jeffery)
April 30, 2012 Filing 871 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Caufield, Jeffery)
April 30, 2012 Filing 870 STATUS REPORT Joinder in PRP Group Status Report filed by Defendants Del Mar Avionics Inc, NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc. (McGaw, Peter)
April 30, 2012 Filing 869 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret)
April 30, 2012 Filing 868 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report,, #862 . (Redford, Jonathan)
April 30, 2012 Filing 867 STATUS REPORT w/Proof of Service filed by Defendants BP America Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Gurnick, David)
April 27, 2012 Filing 866 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion) #865 Status Report Exhibit A Addtl Parties served on April 27, 2012. (Gutterridge, Larry)
April 27, 2012 Filing 865 SUPPLEMENT to Status Report,, #862 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry)
April 27, 2012 Filing 864 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
April 26, 2012 Notice of Electronic Filing re Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #863 , Status Report,, #862 e-mailed to slehecka@comcast.net bounced due to 550 5.1.1 < Account not available. Primary e-mail address was already correct. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to slehecka@hanmor.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 26, 2012 Filing 863 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Status Report,, #862 4-26-12 served on April 26, 2012. (Gutterridge, Larry)
April 26, 2012 Filing 862 STATUS REPORT 4-26-12 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #859 Request to Substitute Attorney Bret Stone as attorney of record in place and stead of Attorneys Santino Michael Tropea, Jeffery Laun Caufield and Kenneth E James of Caufield and James, LLP for Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Co., Inc. & John Locke. (lom)
April 3, 2012 Filing 860 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Bret Stone, Paladin Law Group LLP in place of attorney Jeffery Caufield, Caufield & James, LLP #859 served on 04/03/12. (Caufield, Jeffery)
April 3, 2012 Filing 859 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Bret Stone, Paladin Law Group LLP in place of attorney Jeffery Caufield, Caufield & James, LLP filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caufield, Jeffery)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #856 Request to Substitute Attorney Melvin Teitelbaum, Esq. as attorney of record in place and stead of Attorneys Santino Michael Tropea, Jeffery Laun Caufield and Kenneth E James of Caufield and James LLP for Plaintiff Greave Financial Services Inc. (lom)
March 26, 2012 Filing 857 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Greve Financial Services Inc, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Melvin Teitelbaum in place of attorney Jeffery Caufield Caufield & James, LLP #856 served on 03/26/12. (Caufield, Jeffery)
March 26, 2012 Filing 856 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Melvin Teitelbaum in place of attorney Jeffery Caufield Caufield & James, LLP filed by Plaintiff Greve Financial Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caufield, Jeffery)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #854 Request to Substitute Attorney Edward P. Sangster as attorney of record in place and stead of Attorney Belynda B Reck for Defendant Alcoa Inc. (lom)
March 16, 2012 Filing 854 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Edward P. Sangster in place of attorney Belynda Reck filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Reck, Belynda)
March 15, 2012 NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr., Counsel are hereby notified that a status report must be filed by each party to this action no later than APRIL 30, 2012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ys) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 6, 2012 Filing 853 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffrey D Wexler counsel for Defendants Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. Changing address & firm name to McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP, 300 S. Grand Ave., 14th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing e-mail to jwexler@mckennalong.com. Filed by defendant Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.) and Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation (Wexler, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2012 Filing 852 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Laura Jean Carroll counsel for Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. Changing firm name to Law Office of Laura J. Carroll. Changing e-mail to lauracarroll@ljcfirm.com. Filed by defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation), and Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation (Carroll, Laura)
March 1, 2012 Filing 851 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jocelyn R Cuttino counsel for Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc. Jocelyn R Cuttino will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Jocelyn R Cuttino is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc. (Cuttino, Jocelyn)
February 29, 2012 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #850 , Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #851 e-mailed to atozer@mofo.com bounced due to delivery to recipient failed and vmartinez@milbank.com bounced due to unknown address error; invalid recipient. Primary e-mail address corrected for Andrea Tover and Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to andrea.tozer@sce.com. vmartinez@milbank.com deleted, atty no longer with firm. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 29, 2012 Filing 850 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffrey D Wexler counsel for Defendant Gatx Terminals Corporation.Jeffrey David Wexler is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued as GATX Terminals Corporation) (Wexler, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2011 Filing 849 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jill Cooper Teraoka counsel for Defendants McKesson Corporation, Seymour Moslin, Havery Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin. Jill C. Teraoka will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Jill C. Teraoka is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants McKesson Corporation, Harvey Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, and the Estate of Paul Maslin (Teraoka, Jill)
June 9, 2011 Filing 848 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: Attorney Patricia G. Stringel will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Patricia G. Stringel is no longer attorney of record in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Baxter Healthcare Corporation. (lom)
May 26, 2011 Filing 847 NOTICE Disassociation of Counsel filed by defendent Appropriate Technologies II Inc. for Matthew J. Sanders (Hoffman, Robert)
May 26, 2011 Filing 846 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Paul Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc (Hoffman, Robert)
May 26, 2011 Filing 845 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Ernest John Hahn counsel for Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc.Patricia G. Stringel is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Latham & Watkins LLP (Hahn, Ernest)
May 12, 2011 Filing 844 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents, RE: Notice (Other) #843 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Attorney Information (G-06). See our court's website for form. To efile this document, see category: Other Filings: Notices; for event: Change of Attorney Information (G-06). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
May 12, 2011 Filing 843 NOTICE Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co. (Dudley, Matthew)
April 6, 2011 Filing 842 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Amber S Finch counsel for Defendant Hexcel Corporation. Changing firm name and address to Reed Smith LLP, 355 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2900, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing email and fax number to Email: afinch@reedsmith.com; facsimile: (213) 457-8080. Amber S. Finch will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Amber S. Finch is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation (Finch, Amber)
March 31, 2011 Filing 841 STATUS REPORT and Joinder in Status Report of Omega Defendants [Doc. No. 826] filed in response to Court Order dated March 15, 2011 [Doc. No. 821] filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. (Dooley, Nathan)
March 31, 2011 Filing 840 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Inglin, Sonja)
March 31, 2011 Filing 839 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
March 31, 2011 Filing 838 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
March 31, 2011 Filing 837 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report,,, #826 . (Evans, Gregory)
March 31, 2011 Filing 836 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion) #835 re Status Report served on March 31, 2011. (Gutterridge, Larry)
March 31, 2011 Filing 835 SUPPLEMENT to Status Report,,, #826 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry)
March 31, 2011 Filing 834 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. (Yopp, Kevin)
March 31, 2011 Filing 833 STATUS REPORT PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Greve Financial Services Inc, John Locke. (Caufield, Jeffery)
March 31, 2011 Filing 832 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Greve Financial Services Inc, John Locke. (Caufield, Jeffery)
March 31, 2011 Filing 831 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report,,, #826 . (Redford, Jonathan)
March 30, 2011 Filing 830 JOINDER filed by Defendant Datatronics Romoland Inc joining in Status Report,,, #826 . (Lewis, Robert)
March 30, 2011 Filing 829 JOINDER (McGaw, Peter)
March 30, 2011 Filing 828 JOINDER filed by Defendant International Rectifier Corporation joining in Status Report,,, #826 . (Cohen, Albert)
March 30, 2011 Filing 827 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Status Report,,, #826 3-29-11 served on March 30, 2011. (Gutterridge, Larry)
March 29, 2011 Filing 826 STATUS REPORT 3-29-11 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gutterridge, Larry)
March 18, 2011 Filing 824 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Evelyn F Heidelberg counsel for Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation. Filed by Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation; Hitchi Home Electronics (America), Inc.; Signet Armorlite, Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
March 18, 2011 Filing 823 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #822 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Attorney Information (G-06). To efile this document, see category: Other Filings: Notices; for event: Change of Attorney Information (G-06). If you are unsure of the events, use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF menu bar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
March 16, 2011 Filing 822 Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation ; Hitchi Home Electronics (America), Inc.; Signet Armorlite, Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 821 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that a status report must be filed by each party to this action no later than March 31, 2011. (lom)
March 3, 2011 Filing 820 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Amy P Lally counsel for Defendant Firmenich Incorporated.Brian Kelley Washington is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Firmenich Incorporated (Lally, Amy)
February 25, 2011 Filing 819 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Amy P Lally counsel for Defendant Firmenich Incorporated. Adding Amy P. Lally as attorney as counsel of record for Firmenich Incorporated for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Firmenich Incorporated (Lally, Amy)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Gregory Evans, Integer Law Corporation, for Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company in place of Attorneys Aluyah Imoisili, Gregory Evans and Vannesa C. Martinez, Milbank Tweed Hadley & McCloy LLP #817 . (gk)
July 21, 2010 Filing 817 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Integer Law Corporation in place of attorney Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. Request set for hearing on 9/7/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Evans, Gregory)
June 15, 2010 Filing 816 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. (Heck, Christopher)
April 21, 2010 Filing 813 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Denise G Fellers counsel for Defendants Air Products and Chemicals Inc, GSF Energy LLC, Teledyne Industries Inc, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. Adding Denise G. Fellers as attorney as counsel of record for Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., GSF Energy LLC, TDY Industries, Inc., Teledyne Technologies Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., GSF Energy LLC, TDY Industries, Inc., Teledyne Technologies, Inc. (Fellers, Denise)
April 21, 2010 Filing 812 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Denise G Fellers counsel for Defendants Air Products and Chemicals Inc, GSF Energy LLC, Teledyne Industries Inc, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. Kavita Patel will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Kavita Patel is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., GSF Energy LLC, TDY Industries, Inc. and Teledyne Technologies Inc. (Fellers, Denise)
April 7, 2010 Filing 811 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Donna Berg, Robert Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #810 served on 04/07/2010. (Byrne, Dennis)
April 7, 2010 Filing 810 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Dennis J Byrne counsel for Defendants Donna Berg, Robert Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal. Adding Dennis J. Byrne as attorney as counsel of record for Robert Berg, Donna Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, and The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Robert Berg, Donna Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, and The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal (Byrne, Dennis)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER granting Stipulation Re: Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against defendants Sorkin Parties, Joseph Sorkin and his Estate, With Prejudice #807 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter to enforce the terms of the written settlement agreement between the Parties and, also, Janyce Locke, with an effective date of January 5, 2010. (lom)
April 1, 2010 Filing 808 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Greve Financial Services Inc, John Locke, re Stipulation for Order, #807 served on 04/01/10. (James, Kenneth)
April 1, 2010 Filing 807 STIPULATION for Order RE: PLAINTIFFS' VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST MCKESSON, SORKIN PARTIES, JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE WITH PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Greve Financial Services Inc, John Locke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Kenneth)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #778 Defendants McKesson Corporation, Seymour Moslin, Harvey Sorkin, and the Estate of Paul Maslin's Motion for Approval of Good Faith of Settlement, Bar of Contribution and/or Indemnity Claims against settling Defendants, and applying the Uniform Comparative Fault Act, and Lifting of Stay Solely to Allow Permit the Filing of Claims of Dismissal for Settlement. The court further lifts the stay in this Action for the limited purpose of permitting Plaintiffs to file a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims against the Settling Defendants and Joseph Sorkin and his Estate within 10 days of the entry of this Order. (lom)
March 12, 2010 Filing 805 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Chris C Chapman counsel for Defendants Robert Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal. Chris C. Chapman will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Chris C. Chapman is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Robert Berg, Donna Berg, (Chapman, Chris)
March 11, 2010 Filing 804 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, re Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #802 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, #803 served on March 11, 2010. (Einhorn, Michael)
March 11, 2010 Filing 803 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SETTLING DEFENDANTS' REPLY RE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE UNIFORM COMPARATIVE FAULT ACT, AND LIFTING STAY SOLELY TO PERMIT CLAIMS DISMISSAL filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Einhorn, Michael)
March 11, 2010 Filing 802 REPLY in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Einhorn, Michael)
March 10, 2010 Filing 801 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando)
March 10, 2010 Filing 800 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant Ohline Corp. (Redford, Jonathan)
March 9, 2010 Filing 799 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Reck, Belynda)
March 9, 2010 Filing 798 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant Crosby & Overton Inc. (Prayongratana, Marissa)
March 9, 2010 Filing 797 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendants Del Mar Avionics Inc, NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc. (McGaw, Peter)
March 9, 2010 Filing 796 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Boeing North American Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Harsco Corporation, Hexcel Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hubbel Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Ratheon Company, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Titan Corporation, Universal City Studios Inc, Van Waters & Rogers Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Non-Opposition to Motion,,,,,, #788 Written Statement Under L.R. 7-9b in Response... served on 3-09-10. (Gutterridge, Larry)
March 9, 2010 Filing 795 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristen M Agnew counsel for Defendant Yort Inc. Kristen Michelle Agnew will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Kristen Michelle Agnew is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Yort Inc. (Agnew, Kristen)
March 8, 2010 Filing 794 Disclosure and Certification of Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation Pursuant to Rule 7.1 and LR 7.1-1 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation, (Inglin, Sonja)
March 8, 2010 Filing 793 Disclosure and Certificate of Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders Pursuant to Rule 7.1 and LR 7.1-1 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders, (Inglin, Sonja)
March 8, 2010 Filing 792 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
March 8, 2010 Filing 791 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Inglin, Sonja)
March 8, 2010 Filing 790 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant International Paper Company. (Inglin, Sonja)
March 8, 2010 Filing 789 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja)
March 8, 2010 Filing 788 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 WRITTEN STATEMENT UNDER L.R. 7-9(B) IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Boeing North American Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Harsco Corporation, Hexcel Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hubbel Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Ratheon Company, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Titan Corporation, Universal City Studios Inc, Van Waters & Rogers Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry)
March 8, 2010 Filing 787 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 WRITTEN STATEMENT UNDER L.R. 7-9(b) IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant NMB Technologies Corp. (Cohen, Albert)
March 8, 2010 Filing 786 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 WRITTEN STATEMENT UNDER L.R. 7-9(b) IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant International Rectifier Corporation. (Cohen, Albert)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 785 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time #783 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. IT IS ORDERED that all interested parties are hereby given an additional one week to file responsive pleadings re #778 . FURTHER ORDERED, that the moving DEFENDANTS reply pleadings are and shall be due on March 15, 2010. (lom)
March 2, 2010 Filing 784 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, #783 served on 03-02-2010. (Gutterridge, Larry)
March 1, 2010 Filing 783 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time for Response to GF Motion)(Gutterridge, Larry)
February 19, 2010 Filing 782 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, re Motion Related Document,, #781 , Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #779 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #780 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 served on 2/19/2010. (Einhorn, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 781 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF re MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 780 DECLARATION of John D. Edgcomb In Support Of MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 779 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE #778 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement LEXIS case, #2 Supplement LEXIS case, #3 Supplement LEXIS case, #4 Supplement LEXIS case, #5 Supplement LEXIS case, #6 Supplement LEXIS case)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 778 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE UNIFORM COMPARATIVE FAULT ACT, AND LIFTING THE STAY SOLELY TO PERMIT FILING CLAIMS DISMISSAL filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: The Court has considered the ex parte application by Defendant McKesson Corporation to shorten time to consider a motion to lift the stay for the limited purpose of allowing a motion to determine good faith settlement and related issues and its motion to lift the stay for the limited purpose of allowing a motion to determine good faith settlement and related issues. It is Ordered that the ex parte application and the motions be, and hereby are Granted #769 , #770 , #772 . (lom)
February 3, 2010 Filing 776 Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application to Lift Stay on Case #768 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Einhorn, Michael)
February 2, 2010 Filing 775 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation, re MOTION to Lift Stay re LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #772 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, #773 , MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 #770 , Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #771 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #774 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 served on 2/2/2010. (Einhorn, Michael)
February 2, 2010 Filing 774 DECLARATION of JOHN D. EDGCOMB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Lift Stay re LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #772 , MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 #770 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 2, 2010 Filing 773 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Lift Stay re LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #772 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 2, 2010 Filing 772 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 2, 2010 Filing 771 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 #770 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 2, 2010 Filing 770 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES #769 filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Einhorn, Michael)
February 2, 2010 Filing 769 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation.(Einhorn, Michael)
February 2, 2010 Filing 768 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Lift Stay re: LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation.(Einhorn, Michael)
August 10, 2009 Filing 767 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha counsel for Defendant Gambro Inc.Kelly M. Morrison is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gambro, Inc. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alexis Gutierrez in place of attorney Charles W. Reese #763 . Substituting attorney Alexis Sean Gutierrez for Weber Aircraft LP in place and stead of attorney Mark Alexander Stump; Emmeline Thompson; Timothy A Colvig and Charles W Reese of Wulfsberg Reese Colvig & Firstman. (lom)
March 9, 2009 Filing 765 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristen M Agnew counsel for Defendant Yort Inc. Adding Kristen M. Agnew as attorney as counsel of record for Yort, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Yort, Inc. (Agnew, Kristen)
February 23, 2009 Filing 764 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Weber Aircraft LP, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alexis Gutierrez in place of attorney Charles W. Reese #763 served on 2/23/09. (Reese, Charles)
February 23, 2009 Filing 763 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alexis Gutierrez in place of attorney Charles W. Reese filed by defendent Weber Aircraft LP. (Attachments: #1 Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Reese, Charles)
February 6, 2009 Filing 762 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joseph M Parker counsel for Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc. Filed by Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc. (Parker, Joseph)
September 16, 2008 Filing 761 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristina Starr Azlin counsel for Defendant BASF Corporation.Alex R. Bagdassarian is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant BASF Corporation (Azlin, Kristina)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, denying Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company, Inc's Motion to Lift Stay of case and leave to file first amended complaint #668 , #693 . (lom)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Michael J. Partos in place of attorney Huey P. Cotton #758 . Substituting attorney Michael J Partos for Reed & Graham Inc in place and stead of Huey P. cotton. (lom)
September 5, 2008 Filing 758 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Michael J. Partos in place of attorney Huey P. Cotton filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. Request set for hearing on 9/29/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Partos, Michael)
September 3, 2008 Filing 757 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Proof of Service (subsequent document) RE: Motion Related Document #749 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
September 3, 2008 Filing 756 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder (Motion related) RE: Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #735 . For correct event, see Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
August 29, 2008 Filing 754 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Christopher J McNevin counsel for Defendants Texaco Inc, Union Oil Company of California. Christopher J. McNevin will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Christopher J. McNevin is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Texaco Inc. and Union Oil Company of California (McNevin, Christopher)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr Granting Amended APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID #752 on 8/18/08 by Richard A. Horsch to appear on behalf of Defendant Gambro Inc. Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha is designated as local counsel. (lom)
August 26, 2008 Filing 753 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Gambro Inc, re Amended APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. #752 served on 08/26/2008. (Morrison, Kelly)
August 26, 2008 Filing 752 Amended APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by defendant Gambro Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Kelly)
August 14, 2008 Filing 751 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Gambro Inc, re APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. #750 served on 08/14/08. (Morrison, Kelly)
August 14, 2008 Filing 750 APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by defendant Gambro Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Kelly)
August 12, 2008 Filing 749 PROOF OF SERVICE re MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION filed by Defendants BP America Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Holzer, Stephen)
August 11, 2008 Filing 748 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: The caption of your docket entry and the document filed should be worded the same, RE: MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition #723 ; MOTION for Joinder #724 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
August 11, 2008 Filing 747 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder (Motion Related) RE: Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #721 . Please do not use response. For correct event, see Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related). Your document should read the same as your docket entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
August 11, 2008 Filing 746 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re Reply (Motion related) #744 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #745 served on August 11, 2008. (Caufield, Jeffery)
August 11, 2008 Filing 745 DECLARATION of SANTINO M. TROPEA in SUPPORT of MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8-9, #2 Exhibit 10-14)(Caufield, Jeffery)
August 11, 2008 Filing 744 REPLY in SUPPORT of MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
August 11, 2008 Filing 743 JOINDER in MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 Notice of Joinder of Defendants Applied Micro Circuits Corporation's and Hitachi Home Electronics (America)'s in Omega Group Parties' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
August 8, 2008 Filing 742 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Joinder RE: Request for Joinder, #719 , #718 . Your filed document caption read as "Notice of Joinder" and the docket entry is a "Request." The Document caption and the the docket entry should almost read the same. The event selected should also be the same or related. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
August 8, 2008 Filing 741 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Joinder RE: Joinder (non-motion), #715 . There is a specific event for this document. This is a Motion related document, please use the "Notice of Joinder (Motion Related)" event found under Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related). Please do not use the Joinder (non-Motion) found in Other filings. Also, your docket entry should be similar or the same as the document caption. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
August 8, 2008 Filing 740 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Joinder RE: #704 , #699 , #695 , #690 , #691 , #698 . Please do not use the joinder found under Other Filings: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion). There is a specific event for this document. This is a Motion related document, please use the "Notice of Joinder (Motion Related)" event found under Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
August 8, 2008 Filing 739 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #677 Proof of Service of Notice of Joinder of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation), and Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation in Omege Group Parties' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay [Docket 677] served on 8/8/08. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2008 Filing 738 JOINDER filed by Defendant Crosby & Overton Inc joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 . (Prayongratana, Marissa)
August 7, 2008 Filing 737 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Joinder. RE: Joinder (non-motion) #684 , #687 , #685 , 686], #682 , #680 , #689 , #688 , #681 . There is a specific event for this document. This is a Motion related document, please use the "Notice of Joinder (Motion Related)" event found under Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
August 7, 2008 Filing 736 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Change of Attorney Information (G-06) RE: Notice (Other) #673 . Please do not use Notice (Other). There is a specific event for this document. For correct event, see Other Filings: Notices for Change of Attorney Information (G-06). Also, document text image is unreadable. This document has to be refiled. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom)
August 7, 2008 Filing 735 REQUEST FOR JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO LIFT STAY OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant FHL Group. (Smith, Diane)
August 5, 2008 Filing 734 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, re Joinder (non-motion), Joinder (non-motion) #689 served on 08/05/2008. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
August 5, 2008 Filing 733 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Siemens Medical Systems Inc, re Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, #726 served on 08/05/08. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 5, 2008 Filing 732 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Siemens Medical Systems Inc, re Notice of Appearance #725 served on 08/05/08. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 5, 2008 Filing 731 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Pacific Gas & Electric Co, re Notice of Appearance #692 served on 08/05/08. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 5, 2008 Filing 730 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Richhold Inc, re Declaration (Motion related) #696 served on 08/08/05. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 5, 2008 Filing 729 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Richhold Inc, re Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, #694 served on 08/08/05. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 5, 2008 Filing 728 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP, re Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, #720 served on 8/5/2008. (Reese, Charles)
August 5, 2008 Filing 727 REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 filed by Defendant Arlon Adhesives & Film. Request set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (O'Neil, Stephen)
August 5, 2008 Filing 726 REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc. Request set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 5, 2008 Filing 725 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Keith F Millhouse on behalf of Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc (Millhouse, Keith)
August 4, 2008 Filing 724 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders' Notice of Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Alaverdi, Loura)
August 4, 2008 Filing 723 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 Defendant International Paper Company's Notice of Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant International Paper Company. (Alaverdi, Loura)
August 4, 2008 Filing 722 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 Defendant Eaton Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Alaverdi, Loura)
August 4, 2008 Filing 721 REQUEST FOR JOINDER OPPOSITION re: Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, #720 filed by Defendant Arlon Adhesives & Film. (O'Neil, Stephen)
August 4, 2008 Filing 720 REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP. (Reese, Charles)
August 4, 2008 Filing 719 REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 Joinder in OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP's Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Biason, Diana)
August 4, 2008 Filing 718 REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 filed by Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. (Yopp, Kevin)
August 4, 2008 Filing 717 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Van Waters & Rogers Inc, re Response in Opposition to Motion, #710 , Declaration (Motion related) #714 served on 08-04-2008. (Schenck, Leslie)
August 4, 2008 Filing 716 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 and Decl. of Nicholas Kanter filed by Defendant Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Holzer, Stephen)
August 4, 2008 Filing 715 JOINDER filed by Defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 . (Brugger, Gregg)
August 4, 2008 Filing 714 DECLARATION of Leslie Schenck In Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant Van Waters & Rogers Inc. (Schenck, Leslie)
August 4, 2008 Filing 713 JOINDER in MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< #683 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Southern California Edison Co. (Delorme, Lisa)
August 4, 2008 Filing 712 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 and Decl. of Nicholas Kanter filed by Defendant BP America Inc. (Holzer, Stephen)
August 4, 2008 Filing 711 REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Omega Group Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Teledyne Industries Inc, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, Air Products and Chemicals Inc, GSF Energy LLC. Request set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Patel, Kavita)
August 4, 2008 Filing 710 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant Van Waters & Rogers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Schenck, Leslie)
August 4, 2008 Filing 709 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #704 PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY'S JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY served on August 4, 2008. (Tholen, Sandra)
August 4, 2008 Filing 708 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 Joinder in Opposition of Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC [Docket Nos. 675-676] filed by Defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (O'Toole, Patricia)
August 4, 2008 Filing 707 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #705 served on 8-04-08. (Gutterridge, Larry)
August 4, 2008 Filing 706 JOINDER in MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< #683 filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Evans, Gregory)
August 4, 2008 Filing 705 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant Alpha Therapeutic Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry)
August 4, 2008 Filing 704 OPPOSITION Opposition re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY'S JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Tholen, Sandra)
August 4, 2008 Filing 703 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related) #701 filed by defendant Firmenich Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Washington, Brian)
August 4, 2008 Filing 702 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Lonza Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 served on 8-04-08. (Gutterridge, Larry)
August 4, 2008 Filing 701 JOINDER in MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< #683 Notice of Joinder in Defendant Omega Chemical's Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Loma Linda University. (Lender, John)
August 4, 2008 Filing 700 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #699 served on 08/04/2008. (Silva, Beverlee)
August 4, 2008 Filing 699 opposition Joinder in Opposition by Omega Group Defendants re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. (Silva, Beverlee)
August 4, 2008 Filing 698 JOINDER filed by Defendants NMB Technologies Corp, International Rectifier Corporation joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 . (Cohen, Albert)
August 4, 2008 Filing 697 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Appropriate Technologies II Inc, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #687 served on AUGUST 4, 2008. (Sanders, Matthew)
August 4, 2008 Filing 696 DECLARATION of Keith F Millhouse In Support of Joinder in Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendants Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Richhold Inc. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 4, 2008 Filing 695 JOINDER filed by Defendants Ratheon Company, AlliedSignal Inc, Boeing North American Inc, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, McDonnell Douglas Corporation joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 . (Feng, Wendy)
August 4, 2008 Filing 694 REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #676 filed by Defendants Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Richhold Inc. Request set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Millhouse, Keith)
August 4, 2008 Filing 693 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 08:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando)
August 4, 2008 Filing 692 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Keith F Millhouse on behalf of Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co (Millhouse, Keith)
August 4, 2008 Filing 691 DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANYS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO LIFT STAY re MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant Dow Chemical Company. (Landis, Ryan)
August 4, 2008 Filing 690 DEFENDANTS UNION OIL OF CALIFORNIA AND TEXACO INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP LLC, ET AL.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY IN OPPOSITION TO re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 FILED BY PLAINTIFFS ON 07/25/2008 - OPPOSITION #675 AND DECLARATION OF LARRY G. GUTTERRIDGE #676 FILED ON 08/03/2008 - NOTICE OF JOINDER IN OPPOSITION filed by Defendants Texaco Inc, Union Oil Company of California. (Elliott, Mark)
August 4, 2008 Filing 689 JOINDER filed by Defendants Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 . (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
August 4, 2008 Filing 688 JOINDER in MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< #683 Joinder in the Omega Group Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendants Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Baxter Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service (U.S. Mail))(Stringel, Patricia)
August 4, 2008 Filing 687 JOINDER IN OMEGA PRP GROUP'S OPPOSITION #675 TO re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc. (Sanders, Matthew)
August 4, 2008 Filing 686 JOINDER to OPPOSITION Opposition re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 Notice of Joinder to Omega PRP Group's Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Crosby & Overton Inc. (Prayongratana, Marissa)
August 4, 2008 Filing 685 Notice of Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Omega Chemical PRP Group, et al. #675 re MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant Yort Inc. (Chomiak, Donald)
August 4, 2008 Filing 684 JOINDER filed by Defendant BASF Corporation joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 . (Azlin, Kristina)
August 4, 2008 Filing 683 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc, Del Mar Avionics Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (McGaw, Peter)
August 4, 2008 Filing 682 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 Notice of Joinder to Omega Group Parties' Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 POS re Joinder)(Parker, Joseph)
August 4, 2008 Filing 681 OPPOSITION opposition re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 Notice of Joinder to Omega Group Parties Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay etc. filed by Defendant Hexcel Corporation. (Lichtman, Joanne)
August 4, 2008 Filing 680 NOTICE of Joinder filed by Defendants Mattel Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Mtn to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Hsiao, Peter)
August 4, 2008 Filing 679 JOINDER in MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 Joinder to Opposition of Defendant Omega Chemical Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (La Scala, Paul)
August 4, 2008 Filing 678 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lifty Stay and For Leave to file First Amended Complaint Declaration In Support of Opposition re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendant Ohline Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan D. Reford in Support of Defendant Ohline Corp.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Redford, Jonathan)
August 4, 2008 Filing 677 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 Notice of Joinder of Defendants Johns Manville (Erroneously Sued Herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (Erroneously Sued Herein as GATX Terminals Corporation), and Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation in Omega Group Parties' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendants Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2008 Filing 676 DECLARATION of LARRY G. GUTTERRIDGE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
August 3, 2008 Filing 675 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
July 30, 2008 Filing 674 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Huey Cotton counsel for Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. Huey P. Cotton will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Huey P. Cotton is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Reed & Graham, Inc. (Cotton, Huey)
July 30, 2008 Filing 673 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION filed by Defendant Macy's West. (Bhimani, Arti)
July 25, 2008 Filing 672 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #670 , MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #669 , Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief, #671 served on 07/25/08. (James, Kenneth)
July 25, 2008 Filing 671 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-E)(James, Kenneth)
July 25, 2008 Filing 670 DECLARATION of Santino M. Tropea in support of MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-7)(James, Kenneth)
July 25, 2008 Filing 669 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #668 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (James, Kenneth)
July 25, 2008 Filing 668 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Kenneth)
July 17, 2008 Filing 667 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney William L Troutman, V counsel for Defendant Gambro Inc.William L. Troutman is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gambro, Inc. (Troutman, William)
July 17, 2008 Filing 666 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney William L Troutman, V counsel for Defendant Gambro Inc. Adding Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha as attorney as counsel of record for Gambro, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gambro, Inc. (Troutman, William)
June 26, 2008 Filing 665 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: account information was not updated in the ECF system RE: Notice of Change of Address, #664 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
June 26, 2008 Filing 664 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gene A. Lucero attorney for Defendants Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, changing address to 355 South Grand Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560. Filed by defendants Baxter; Quest; Safety-Kleen (Lucero, Gene)
June 2, 2008 Filing 663 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kavita Paul Lesser counsel for Defendant Macy's West. Kavita P. Lesser will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Macy's West (Lesser, Kavita)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey W. Johnson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07 and General Order 07-02. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Jeffrey W. Johnson to Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge EDCV 07-1471 TJH (Ex). (rn)
April 3, 2008 Filing 661 NOTICE of Appearance (Inglin, Sonja)
March 31, 2008 Filing 659 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to technical error, the attached documents were not properly served on the parties. This notice constitutes service as required by Rule 5. (Attachments: #1 PROOF OF SERVICE) (vh)
March 31, 2008 Filing 658 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, #657 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #656 served on 03/31/08. (Caufield, Jeffery)
March 31, 2008 Filing 657 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #638 IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Caufield, Jeffery)
March 31, 2008 Filing 656 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #638 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
March 28, 2008 Filing 654 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Locke, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, upon British Alcan Aluminum P L C served on 3/17/2008, answer due 4/6/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by federal statute, upon Marcia Sorensen, Deputy Secretary of State. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (James, Kenneth)
March 28, 2008 Filing 653 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Locke, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, upon Huck Manufacturing Company served on 3/17/2008, answer due 4/6/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by federal statute, upon Marcia Sorensen, Deputy Secretary of State. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (James, Kenneth)
March 28, 2008 Filing 652 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Locke, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, upon General Dynamics Corporation served on 3/17/2008, answer due 4/6/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by federal statute, upon Marcia Sorensen, Deputy Secretary of State. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (James, Kenneth)
March 28, 2008 Filing 651 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Locke, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, upon Forenco Inc served on 3/17/2008, answer due 4/6/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by federal statute, upon Marcia Sorensen, Deputy Secretary of State. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (James, Kenneth)
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 655 It is Ordered by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr that the (various) motions to dismiss be, and hereby is, Denied. It is further Ordered that the (various) motions to stay be, and hereby is, Granted. It is further Ordered that this action be, and hereby is, Stayed. It is further Ordered that the (various) motions for a more definite statement be, and hereby is, Denied. (lom)
March 27, 2008 Filing 650 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice: RE Miscellaneous Document, #641 . See Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties. (lom)
March 27, 2008 Filing 649 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Document did not have a description: RE MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #638 . When filing more than one document in a docket entry, please give the document a description re attached [Prop] order. (lom)
March 27, 2008 Filing 648 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is See Motions and Related Filings: RE Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), #640 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion), #639 . All motion related documents must use motion related events. See Motion and related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents. (lom)
March 25, 2008 Filing 647 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant FHL Group, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #646 and affirmative defenses served on March 25, 2008. (Smith, Diane)
March 25, 2008 Filing 646 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 and affirmative defenses filed by defendant FHL Group.(Smith, Diane)
March 24, 2008 Filing 645 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant FHL Group, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #644 served on March 24, 2008. (Smith, Diane)
March 24, 2008 Filing 644 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Diane R Smith counsel for Defendant FHL Group. Adding Diane R. Smith as attorney as counsel of record for FHL Group for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant FHL Group (Smith, Diane)
March 21, 2008 Filing 643 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, re Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) #640 , Miscellaneous Document,, #641 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, #642 , MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #638 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion), Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion) #639 served on 3/21/2008. (Teraoka, Jill)
March 21, 2008 Filing 642 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #638 filed by Defendant Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9#10 Exhibit 10#11 Exhibit 11#12 Exhibit 12)(Teraoka, Jill)
March 21, 2008 Filing 641 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin re: Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) #640 , MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #638 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion), Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion) #639 (Teraoka, Jill)
March 21, 2008 Filing 640 DECLARATION re MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #638 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion), Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion) #639 filed by Defendants Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin. (Teraoka, Jill)
March 21, 2008 Filing 639 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Defendant Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin. Re: MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #638 (Teraoka, Jill)
March 21, 2008 Filing 638 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against Harvey Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin, and the Estate of Seymour Moslin Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin.Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1)(Teraoka, Jill)
March 17, 2008 Filing 637 DECLARATION of Jonathan D. Redford in support of Defendant Ohline Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT #626 filed by Defendant Ohline Corp. (Redford, Jonathan)
March 17, 2008 Filing 636 REPLY Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ohline Corp. (Redford, Jonathan)
March 13, 2008 Filing 660 Marea M. Suozzi to be removed from case. (lt)
March 10, 2008 Filing 635 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief, #634 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #632 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #633 served on 03/10/08. (James, Kenneth)
March 10, 2008 Filing 634 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT #626 IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO OHLINE CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNTIAVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(James, Kenneth)
March 10, 2008 Filing 633 DECLARATION of Santino M. Tropea in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT #626 against Ohline Corporation or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(James, Kenneth)
March 10, 2008 Filing 632 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT #626 against Ohline Corporation or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (James, Kenneth)
March 10, 2008 Filing 631 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder: RE Reply (Motion related) #615 . Please see Motion and Related Filings: Response/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents. (lom)
March 6, 2008 FAX number for Attorney(s) Timothy A Colvig, Charles W Reese, Mark Alexander Stump, Emmeline Thompson is 510-451-2170. (lom)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Charles W. Reese in place of attorneys from Higgs Fletcher & Mack LLP #627 . Substituting attorney Charles W Reese for Weber Aircraft LP in place and stead of attorney Rahil Khosroabadi; Michael R Gibson and Alexis Sean Gutierrez. (lom)
March 5, 2008 Filing 628 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP, re First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Charles W. Reese in place of attorney Alexis S. Gutierrez #627 served on March 4, 2008. (Reese, Charles)
March 4, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Huey Cotton, Michael J Partos is 213-892-7999. (lom)
March 4, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Michael J Partos is (213) 892-7999. (kbr)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting Substituting attorney Michael J Partos for Reed & Graham Inc in place and stead of attorney Peter W McGaw. (kbr)
March 4, 2008 Filing 627 First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Charles W. Reese in place of attorney Alexis S. Gutierrez filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Reese, Charles)
March 3, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Jonathan D Redford, Steven J Rothans is 213-228-0401. (lom)
March 3, 2008 Filing 626 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT filed by Defendant OHLINE CORPORATION Ohline Corp.Motion set for hearing on 3/24/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration #2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES#3 Proposed Order RE Dismissing Complaint without Prejudice#4 Proposed Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Provide a More Definite Statement#5 Defendant OHLINE CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT)(Redford, Jonathan)
March 3, 2008 Filing 625 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Name of the filer, Defendant International Paper Company (on the document), does not match the docket entry. Docket entry is by Defendant Eaton Corporation.: RE Joinder (non-motion) #609 . (lom)
March 3, 2008 Filing 624 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder (Motion Related). Please use the Joinder (Motion Related) and not the Joinder in Misc. To find event, please see Motion & Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder #608 & #609 . (lom)
March 3, 2008 Filing 623 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. There is a form to use when Substituting Attorney, form (G-01). Also, there is a fee to substitute in as an attorney. Please make payable to US District Court and payment is made to our Fiscal Dept. Please enter your form under Request for substitute Attorney (G-01). The [Prop] order can be attached as the second document, RE Notice (Other) #581 . (lom)
March 3, 2008 Filing 622 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Request. There is a specific event to docket this form. Please see Motion & Related Filings: Requests for Substitute Attorney (G-01). Also, you can attach the [Prop] Order as a 2nd document: RE Notice of Appearance #572 . (lom)
March 3, 2008 Filing 621 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Change of Attorney. There is a specific event to docket this form. Please see Other Filings: Notices for Change of Attorney Information (G-06): RE Notice (Other) #569 . (lom)
March 3, 2008 Filing 620 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Change of Attorney. There is a specific event to docket this form. Please see Other Filings: Notices for Change of Attorney Information (G-06): RE Notice (Other) #568 . (lom)
February 29, 2008 Filing 619 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Request: RE Miscellaneous Document #516 . See Motions & Related Filings: Requests for Substitute Attorney (G-01). (lom)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting Requests to Substitute Attorney #563 #564 #565 . PLEASE NOTE: These Orders were docketed on 2/28/08 #616 #617 #618 . This is a duplicate entry to administratively terminate pending Requests to Substitute Attorney. (kpa)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Hancock & Estabrook (Eric Nordby); Best, Best & Krieger (Daniel Roberts) #563 . (ps)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group, in place of attorney Holland & Knight, LLP (Alex Baghdassarian) #565 . (ps)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP (Thomas Corless, Howard Halm, Ruby Ramos Fernandez) #564 . (ps)
February 28, 2008 Filing 615 REPLY in support of motion to dismiss and Joinder to Omega Chemical PRP Group's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Crosby & Overton Inc. (Prayongratana, Marissa)
February 27, 2008 Filing 614 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder: RE #515 . See Motion and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents. All motion related documents are found under the Motion and Related Filings. (lom)
February 27, 2008 Filing 613 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found : Notice of Lodging is filed and the [Prop] Order is attached separately under the Notice of Lodging: RE Notice of Lodging #512 . (lom)
February 27, 2008 Filing 612 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Proof of Service. There is no Motion to Dismiss attached to your entry except for the Proof of Service. See Service Documents: RE MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #480 . (lom)
February 27, 2008 Filing 611 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #592 . (Alaverdi, Loura)
February 26, 2008 Filing 609 JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #592 . (Alaverdi, Loura)
February 26, 2008 Filing 608 JOINDER filed by Defendant International Paper Company joining in Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #592 . (Alaverdi, Loura)
February 26, 2008 Filing 607 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Ratheon Company, AlliedSignal Inc, Boeing North American Inc, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, re Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #586 served on 2-25-2008. (Feng, Wendy)
February 26, 2008 Filing 606 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, re Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #587 served on February 26, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2008 Filing 605 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #591 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #589 served on February 25, 2008. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 26, 2008 Filing 604 REPLY in support MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 by Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC's and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Mtion to Dismiss; Declaration of Larry Gutterridge filed by Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Parker, Joseph)
February 26, 2008 Filing 603 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc, re Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #602 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #601 served on February 26, 2008. (Sanders, Matthew)
February 26, 2008 Filing 602 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 #566 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 and JOINDER IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY CASE #589 , IN DECLARATION OF LARRY GUTTERRIDGE #590 , AND IN DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER W. LICHENS #591 , filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc. (Sanders, Matthew)
February 26, 2008 Filing 601 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #355 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 and JOINDER IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS CASE #592 AND IN DECLARATION OF LARRY GUTTERRIDGE #593 filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc. (Sanders, Matthew)
February 26, 2008 Filing 600 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL RECTIFIER CORP., AND NMB, INC. filed by Defendants NMB Technologies Corp, International Rectifier Corporation. (Cohen, Albert)
February 26, 2008 Filing 599 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant United Parcel Service Inc, re MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 served on 2/26/08. (Jamison, Kevin)
February 26, 2008 Filing 598 Revised WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by defendant Havery Sorkin. Waiver of Service signed by John D. Edgcomb. (LeBoeuf, Courtney)
February 26, 2008 Filing 597 Revised WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by defendant Seymour Moslin. Waiver of Service signed by John D. Edgcomb. (LeBoeuf, Courtney)
February 25, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Stephen T Holzer is 818-981-4764. (lom)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting Substituting attorney Stephen T Holzer for BP America Inc in place and stead of attorney Larry G Gutterridge and Keith F Millhouse. (lom)
February 25, 2008 Filing 594 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #593 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #592 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #591 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #589 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #590 served on February 25, 2008. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 25, 2008 Filing 593 DECLARATION of Larry G. Gutterridge in support of Reply to Pltf's Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 25, 2008 Filing 592 REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendants Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 25, 2008 Filing 591 DECLARATION of Christopher W. Lichens in support of Reply to Pltf's Opposition to MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 25, 2008 Filing 590 DECLARATION of Larry G. Gutterridge in support of Reply to Pltf's Opposition to MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 25, 2008 Filing 589 REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 25, 2008 Filing 588 REPLY support of a motion MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 or in the alternative, for more definitive statement filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. (Jamison, Kevin)
February 25, 2008 Filing 587 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) #268 filed by Defendants Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2008 Filing 586 REPLY Support of motion MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by McDonnell Douglas Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of The Boeing Company; The Boeing Company, as successor in interest to Boeing North American, Inc.; Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., as successor in interest to #279 , Request for Joinder,,,,,, Request for Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #495 McDonnell Douglas Corp., a wholly owned subsidiary of the Boeing Company; The Boeing Company, as successor in Interest to Boeing North American, Inc.; Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., as Successor in Interest to Hughes Space and Communications Company; Gulfstream Aerospace Corp.; Honeywell International Inc., for Itself as Successor in Interest to AlliedSignal Inc.; and Raytheon Company filed by Defendants Ratheon Company, AlliedSignal Inc, Boeing North American Inc, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, McDonnell Douglas Corporation. (Feng, Wendy)
February 25, 2008 Filing 585 REPLY in Support Request for Joinder,,,,,, Request for Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #495 in Support of Motion to Stay filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A & B)(Biason, Diana)
February 25, 2008 Filing 584 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss Case #351 Southern California Edison Company's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B) filed by Defendant Southern California Edison Co. (Delorme, Lisa)
February 25, 2008 Filing 583 REPLY in support MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authoritiees Thereon #316 filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Biason, Diana)
February 25, 2008 Filing 582 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Case #366 filed by Defendant Hexcel Corporation. (Finch, Amber)
February 25, 2008 Filing 581 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. (Jamison, Kevin)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER re Stipulation extending time to respond to Complaint by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr: re #324 : Maxwell's responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be filed on or before 1/23/08. (lom)
February 22, 2008 Filing 580 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, re Certificate of Interested Parties #578 served on 2/22/08. (Brugger, Gregg)
February 22, 2008 Filing 579 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT BP America Inc, re Notice of Appearance #572 , Notice of Lodging #573 served on 02/20/2008. (Holzer, Stephen)
February 22, 2008 Filing 578 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company. (Brugger, Gregg)
February 22, 2008 Filing 577 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffery Laun Caufield counsel for Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Jeffery L. Caufield (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 22, 2008 Filing 576 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kenneth E James counsel for Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth E. James (James, Kenneth)
February 21, 2008 Filing 575 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, #488 filed by Defendant Crosby & Overton Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Prayongratana, Marissa)
February 20, 2008 Filing 573 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holzer, Stephen)
February 20, 2008 Filing 572 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen T Holzer on behalf of Defendant BP America Inc (Holzer, Stephen)
February 20, 2008 Filing 571 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Remet Corporation, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Hancock & Estabrook (Eric Nordby); Best, Best & Krieger (Daniel Roberts) REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Hancock & Estabrook (Eric Nordby); Best, Best & Krieger (Daniel Roberts) #563 , REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP (Thomas Corless, Howard Halm, Ruby Ramos Fernandez) REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP (Thomas Corless, Howard Halm, Ruby Ramos Fernandez) #564 , REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Holland & Knight, LLP (Alex Baghdassarian) REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Holland & Knight, LLP (Alex Baghdassarian) #565 served on 2/15/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 20, 2008 Filing 570 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Mattel Inc, re Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief, #538 , Notice of Lodging #539 served on 2/15/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 20, 2008 Filing 569 NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION filed by DEFENDANTS The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Steffin, William)
February 20, 2008 Filing 568 NOTICE Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by defendants The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Owens, Joseph)
February 19, 2008 Filing 567 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc, re MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 #566 served on 2/19/08. (Sanders, Matthew)
February 19, 2008 Filing 566 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sanders, Matthew)
February 15, 2008 Filing 565 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Holland & Knight, LLP (Alex Baghdassarian) filed by Defendant Quality Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 15, 2008 Filing 564 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP (Thomas Corless, Howard Halm, Ruby Ramos Fernandez) filed by Defendant Kolmar Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 15, 2008 Filing 563 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Larry G. Gutterridge, Hanna and Morton, LLP; Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Hancock & Estabrook (Eric Nordby); Best, Best & Krieger (Daniel Roberts) filed by Defendant Remet Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 15, 2008 Filing 562 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Pacific Precision Metals Inc, re Joinder (Motion Related) #463 served on 2/5/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 15, 2008 Filing 561 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Pacific Precision Metals Inc, re Certificate of Interested Parties #464 served on 2/5/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 15, 2008 Filing 560 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #543 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #545 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #557 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #556 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #553 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,, #552 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #555 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #544 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #551 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #550 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #546 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #549 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #558 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #547 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #548 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #559 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #554 served on 02/15/08. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 559 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #348 against The Dow Chemical Co. filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 558 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #480 against Loma Linda University filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 557 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint #407 against Reichhold Inc. filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 556 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #355 against Appropriate Technologies II, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 555 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #332 against International Paper Company filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 554 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #305 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 553 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by McDonnell Douglas Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of The Boeing Company; The Boeing Company, as successor in interest to Boeing North American, Inc.; Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., as successor in interest to #279 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 552 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) #268 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 551 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #303 against Pacific Bell Telephone Co. filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 550 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #342 against Hexion Specialty Chemicals Inc. filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 549 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #351 against Southern California Edison filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 548 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereon #300 against Applied Micro Circuits Corp, Hitachi Home Electronics (America), Inc. and Signet Armolite, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 547 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #265 against Alpha Therapeutic Corporation filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 546 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authoritiees Thereon #316 of Alcoa Inc. filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 545 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Claims Filed Against Firmenich Incorporated #258 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 544 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #366 of Hexcel Corporation filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 543 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #284 of Kimberly-Clark Worlwide, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 542 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, #540 , Request for Judicial Notice,,,,,,,, Request for Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #541 served on 02/15/08. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 541 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo #517 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #521 , MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo #490 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief, #538 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 #522 , Request for Joinder,,,,,, Request for Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #495 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 and Proof of Service #491 IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D#2 Exhibit E-G)(Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 540 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo #517 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #521 , MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo #490 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief, #538 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 #522 , Request for Joinder,,,,,, Request for Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #495 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 and Proof of Service #491 OPPOSITION TO THE OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP LLC'S, ET AL MOTION TO STAY filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 539 NOTICE OF LODGING filed By Defendants Huntington Park Rubber Stamp, Scripto Tokai Corp. and Mattel, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Staying Case)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 15, 2008 Filing 538 REQUEST for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 filed by Defendants Scripto-Tokai Corporation, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Mattel Inc.Request set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 15, 2008 Filing 537 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #535 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief, #536 served on 02/15/08. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 536 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case #303 , MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #480 , MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authoritiees Thereon #316 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #265 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint #407 , Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, #482 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #366 , MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al.; and Notice of Joinder in Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al. #321 , MOTION for Order for Dismissing Complaint Against Hexion Speciality Chemicals Proposed Order #345 , MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #288 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #311 , MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al.; and Notice of Joinder in Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al. #317 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #332 , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #355 , MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #342 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 #361 , MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by McDonnell Douglas Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of The Boeing Company; The Boeing Company, as successor in interest to Boeing North American, Inc.; Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., as successor in interest to #279 , MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Joinder in Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #263 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) #268 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #351 , MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder in Omega Motion #421 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #404 , Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief, #308 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #287 , MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #305 , MOTION to Dismiss Claims Filed Against Firmenich Incorporated #258 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP LLC'S AND OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP'S MOTION TO DISMISS #313 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #284 , MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #304 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #281 , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereon #300 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #275 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #348 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 #367 IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' 12(B)(6) MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D#2 Exhibit E-G)(Caufield, Jeffery)
February 15, 2008 Filing 535 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, #482 , MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al.; and Notice of Joinder in Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al. #321 , MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #288 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #311 , MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al.; and Notice of Joinder in Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al. #317 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 #361 , MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Joinder in Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #263 , MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder in Omega Motion #421 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #287 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP LLC'S AND OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP'S MOTION TO DISMISS #313 , MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #304 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #281 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #275 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 #367 OPPOSITION TO OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP LLC'S ET AL 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 14, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Bonni F Kaufman is 202-955-5564. (lom)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Bonni F. Kaufman for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re #485 , on behalf of Defendant BASF Corporation. Alex R. Baghdassarian is designated as local counsel. FEE PAID ON 2/11/08. (lom)
February 14, 2008 Filing 534 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief, #533 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #531 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #532 served on 02/14/08. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 14, 2008 Filing 533 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B - part 1#3 Exhibit B - part 2#4 Exhibit B - part 3)(Caufield, Jeffery)
February 14, 2008 Filing 532 DECLARATION of Santino M. Tropea IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 or in the Alternative For a More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Caufield, Jeffery)
February 14, 2008 Filing 531 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery)
February 14, 2008 Filing 530 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, re MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request fo #517 served on February 14, 2008. (Tholen, Sandra)
February 14, 2008 Filing 529 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Please do not use Misc. There is a specific event for this document. Please see Motions and Related filings: Requests for Judicial Notice #488 . (lom)
February 14, 2008 Filing 527 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc, Del Mar Avionics Inc. (McGaw, Peter)
February 13, 2008 Filing 525 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Judicial Notice is under Motions & Related Filings: Requests, and not under Misc. Please see Request for Judicial Notice: RE #406 . (lom)
February 13, 2008 Filing 524 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc, re MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #521 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 #522 , Certificate of Interested Parties #523 served on February 13, 2008. (Cuttino, Jocelyn)
February 13, 2008 Filing 523 Amended Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc. (Cuttino, Jocelyn)
February 13, 2008 Filing 522 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cuttino, Jocelyn)
February 13, 2008 Filing 521 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cuttino, Jocelyn)
February 13, 2008 Filing 520 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. There is a specific event for this type of document. This event is found under Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties: RE Notice (Other) #400 . (lom)
February 13, 2008 Filing 519 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Please do not use misc. There is a specific event. This event is found under Motions & Related Filings: Request for Judicial Notice: RE Request for Judicial Notice, #396 . (lom)
February 13, 2008 Filing 518 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found: Proof of Service should be on a separate sheet of paper. Proof of Service is found under your signature line. See page 11 of your document: RE Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #390 . (lom)
February 12, 2008 Filing 517 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, #488 filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Tholen, Sandra)
February 12, 2008 Filing 516 Defendant filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc Request for Substitution of Attorney (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGaw, Peter)
February 12, 2008 Filing 515 NOTICE of Joinder re Motion to Stay filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc, Del Mar Avionics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGaw, Peter)
February 12, 2008 Filing 512 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (La Scala, Paul)
February 12, 2008 Filing 511 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Rathon Corp, Ratheon Company, Richhold Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Signet Armorlite Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Universal City Studios Inc, Van Waters & Rogers Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, Weber Aircraft LP, Alcoa Inc, AlliedSignal Inc, Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Arlon Adhesives & Film, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Boeing North American Inc, Crosby & Overton Inc, Dow Chemical Company, Firmenich Incorporated, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Hexcel Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, Johns Manville International Inc, K C Photo Engraving Co, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, re Request for Joinder,,,,,, Request for Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #495 Notice of Joinder In an Motion to Stay; Proposed Order served on 02/11/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 12, 2008 Filing 510 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael E Delehunt counsel for Defendant Gambro Inc. Filed by Defendant Gambro, Inc. (Delehunt, Michael)
February 12, 2008 Filing 509 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Texaco Inc, Union Oil Company of California, re Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related) #507 - AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL served on 02/12/2008. (Elliott, Mark)
February 12, 2008 Filing 507 JOINDER in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , DECLARATION OF LARRY GUTTERRIDGE #487 , REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE #488 IN SUPPORT THEREOF - JOINDER filed by Defendants Texaco Inc, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER STAYING CASE AS TO ALL CLAIMS#2 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL)(Elliott, Mark)
February 12, 2008 Filing 506 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. This document is not a miscellaneous document. It has a specific event. Please see Request, found under Motions and Related Filings. It is listed as FOR Judicial Notice: RE Request for Judicial Notice #368 . (lom)
February 12, 2008 Filing 505 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Marie Scheibert counsel for Defendant Gambro Inc. Filed by Defendant Gambro, Inc. (Scheibert, Marie)
February 12, 2008 Filing 504 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Christopher John Heck counsel for Defendant Gambro Inc. Filed by Defendant Gambro, Inc. (Heck, Christopher)
February 12, 2008 Filing 503 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. there is a specific event for this type of document, see Other Filings: Notices Certificate of Interested Parties: RE Miscellaneous Document #364 . (lom)
February 12, 2008 Filing 502 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. See Other Filings: Notices for Change of Attorney Information (G-06): RE Miscellaneous Document #358 . (lom)
February 12, 2008 Filing 501 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. There is a specific event, see Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties: RE Miscellaneous Document #357 . (lom)
February 12, 2008 Filing 500 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. See Other Filings: Notices for Notice of Lodging: RE Motion Related Document #353 . (lom)
February 12, 2008 Filing 499 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Declaration & Request for Judicial Notice are all attached to your Notice of Motion. Your Filed Notice of Motion and docket entry does not indicate so. Also, please file Judicial Notice and Declaration under separate attachments: RE MOTION to Dismiss Case #351 . (lom)
February 12, 2008 Filing 498 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found re documents attached. If you have previously filed the attached documents, please do not attach it to the Proof of Service. If not previously filed, the main document should be the Notice of Lodging: RE Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #347 . (lom)
February 12, 2008 Filing 497 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. There is no Notice of Motion attached. Please use Notice of Lodging for the Prop Order. See Other Filings: Notices for Lotice of Lodging: RE MOTION for Order for Dismissing Complaint Against Hexion Speciality Chemicals #345 . (lom)
February 11, 2008 Filing 496 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found The Proof of Service does not need the documents attached that have been previously filed: RE Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #341 . (lom)
February 11, 2008 Filing 495 REQUEST for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, #488 filed by Defendats Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Rathon Corp, Ratheon Company, Richhold Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Signet Armorlite Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Universal City Studios Inc, Van Waters & Rogers Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, Weber Aircraft LP, Alcoa Inc, AlliedSignal Inc, Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Arlon Adhesives & Film, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Boeing North American Inc, Crosby & Overton Inc, Dow Chemical Company, Firmenich Incorporated, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Hexcel Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, Johns Manville International Inc, K C Photo Engraving Co, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, McDonnell Douglas Corporation.Request set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Staying Case)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 11, 2008 Filing 494 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment: RE MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 . (lom)
February 11, 2008 Filing 493 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. See Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties: RE Notice (Other) #331 . There is a specific event for this type of document. (lom)
February 11, 2008 Filing 492 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Incorrect event selected. There is a specific event. See Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties: RE Disclosure #323 . (lom)
February 11, 2008 Filing 491 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 and Proof of Service filed by Defendant Yort Inc. (Chomiak, Donald)
February 11, 2008 Filing 490 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #487 , MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, #488 filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc..Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (La Scala, Paul)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Time of Defendants' Robert Berg, Donna Berg, Pearl Rosenthal and the Estate of Arnold Rosenthal to respond to Complaint #465 by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr: the Bergs' & Rosenthals' shall have until 3/5/08 to respond to the Complaint. (lom)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Keith F Millhouse; Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Doemnico Perella; Nixon Peabody, LLP #467 . Substituting attorney Keith F Millhouse for Harsco Corporation in place and stead of Domenico Perella. (lom)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Keith F Millhouse; Larry G. Gutterridge in place of attorney Greg Gibbons #466 . Substituting attorneys Keith F Millhouse and Larry G Gutterridge for Bourns Inc in place and stead of attorney Gregg M Gibbons. (lom)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting First Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #465 , by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (kbr)
February 8, 2008 Filing 489 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc, re MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 w/Proposed order; Declaration of LGG; and Request for Judicial Notice served on 02/08/08. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 8, 2008 Filing 488 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 filed by Defendant Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 8, 2008 Filing 487 DECLARATION of Larry G. Gutterridge in support of MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision #486 filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc. (Gutterridge, Larry)
February 8, 2008 Filing 486 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings re EPA Issuance of Record of Decision filed by Defendants Lonza Inc, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, BP America Inc, Hubbel Inc, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion to Stay)(Gutterridge, Larry)
February 8, 2008 Filing 485 APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Bonni F. Kaufman for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE NOT PAID. filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In a Specific Case)(Baghdassarian, Alex)
February 8, 2008 Filing 484 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Loma Linda University, re MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #480 served on February 8, 2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Lender, John)
February 8, 2008 Filing 483 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rathon Corp. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 8, 2008 Filing 482 REQUEST for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 filed by Defendant Rathon Corp.Request set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 6, 2008 Filing 528 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. There is no Motion to Dismiss document attached, but a Proof of Service. Please do not docket the entry as a Motion. For filing a Proof of Service, see Service Documents: Service of Subsequent Document Filings for Proof of Service: RE MOTION #480 . (lom)
February 6, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Keith F Millhouse is 805-230-2281. (lom)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Keith F. Millhouse in place of attorney Kenneth Mennemeir; Mennemeier, Glassman & Stroud #415 . Substituting attorney Keith F Millhouse for George Industries in place and stead of attorney Kenneth C Mennemeier. (lom)
February 6, 2008 Filing 480 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Loma Linda University. (Lender, John)
February 5, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Chris Chapman, Timothy C Cronin, Alan R Johnston is 714-505-3792. (lom)
February 5, 2008 Filing 479 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. upon Rathon Corp waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/25/2008, answer due 3/25/2008. Waiver of Service signed by Cynthia L. Goldman. (James, Kenneth)
February 5, 2008 Filing 478 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. upon FHL Group waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/25/2008, answer due 3/25/2008. Waiver of Service signed by Diane R. Smith. (James, Kenneth)
February 5, 2008 Filing 477 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. upon Seymour Moslin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/22/2008, answer due 3/22/2008. Waiver of Service signed by John Edgcomb. (James, Kenneth)
February 5, 2008 Filing 476 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. upon Havery Sorkin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/22/2008, answer due 3/22/2008. Waiver of Service signed by John Edgcomb. (James, Kenneth)
February 5, 2008 Filing 475 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. upon The Estate of Paul Maslin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/22/2008, answer due 3/22/2008. Waiver of Service signed by John Edgcomb. (James, Kenneth)
February 5, 2008 Filing 474 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, upon Scripto-Tokai Corporation served on 1/14/2008, answer due 2/3/2008. Notice of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Civil Cover Sheet; Certificate of Interested Parties; Standing Order; Notice of Related Cases; Declaration of Jeffery Caufield In Support of Notice of Related Cases; Request for Judicial Notice The Summons and Complaint were served by substitute service, by federal statute, upon Felix Hon, agent for service. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (James, Kenneth)
February 5, 2008 Filing 471 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Signet Armorlite Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
February 5, 2008 Filing 470 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
February 5, 2008 Filing 469 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
February 5, 2008 Filing 468 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Vannesa C Martinez counsel for Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. Changing e-mail to vmartinez@milbank.com. Filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company (Martinez, Vannesa)
February 5, 2008 Filing 467 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Keith F Millhouse; Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Doemnico Perella; Nixon Peabody, LLP filed by Defendant Harsco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 5, 2008 Filing 466 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Keith F Millhouse; Larry G. Gutterridge in place of attorney Greg Gibbons filed by Defendant Bourns Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 5, 2008 Filing 465 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robert Berg answer now due 3/5/2008; Donna Berg answer now due 3/5/2008; The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal answer now due 3/5/2008; Pearl Rosenthal answer now due 3/5/2008, filed by Defendants Robert Berg; Donna Berg; The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal; Pearl Rosenthal.(Chapman, Chris)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting Defendant Gambro Inc's REQUEST to Substitute attorney William L. Troutman in place of attorney(s) Christopher J. Heck, Marie Scheibert; Michael E Delehunt and Christopher John Heck #339 . (lom)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Gregory E. Korstad for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID #384 by Gregory E. Korstad to appear on behalf of Defendant Mico Inc.Christopher B. Leonard is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid. (lom)
February 4, 2008 Filing 464 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pacific Precision Metals Inc. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 4, 2008 Filing 463 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendant Pacific Precision Metals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Complaint)(Millhouse, Keith)
February 4, 2008 Filing 462 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, re Response in Support of Motion #460 , Request for Judicial Notice #459 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #461 served on 02/04/08. (Teraoka, Jill)
February 4, 2008 Filing 461 DECLARATION of Jill C. Teraoka In Support of McKesson Corporation's Motion to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against McKesson Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant McKesson Corporation OF ALL CLAIMS FILED AGAINST McKESSON #244 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Teraoka, Jill)
February 4, 2008 Filing 460 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss Defendant McKesson Corporation OF ALL CLAIMS FILED AGAINST McKESSON #244 Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Teraoka, Jill)
February 4, 2008 Filing 459 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss All Claims Filed Against McKesson Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Teraoka, Jill)
February 4, 2008 Filing 458 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company, re Certificate of Interested Parties #425 served on 02/01/08. (Evans, Gregory)
February 3, 2008 Filing 457 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Notice of Joinder in Defendants Omega, et al's Motion to Dismiss, see Motions and Related Filings: Motions for Joinder: RE MOTION to Dismiss Case #313 . (lom)
February 3, 2008 Filing 456 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. There is no Notice of Lodging attached as the main document, only the [Prop] Order: RE Notice of Lodging #298 . (lom)
February 3, 2008 Filing 455 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notices. See Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties: RE Corporate Disclosure Statement #310 , Statement #312 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #309 . (lom)
February 3, 2008 Filing 454 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder. See Motion and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Document for Joinder. This will link you the document you want to be a Joinder in: RE Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief, #308 . (lom)
February 2, 2008 Filing 453 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found in your Document: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder. Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry: Certification as to Interested Parties is filed separately and not with any other documents. See Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties: RE MOTION to Dismiss Case 288]. (lom)
February 1, 2008 Filing 452 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant George Industries, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Keith F. Millhouse in place of attorney Kenneth Mennemeir; Mennemeier, Glassman & Stroud #415 Proposed Order on Request of Approval of Substitution served on 1/30/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 1, 2008 Filing 451 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Richhold Inc, re Certificate of Interested Parties #408 served on 1/30/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 1, 2008 Filing 450 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Richhold Inc, re MOTION to Dismiss Case Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint #407 Proposed Order served on 1/30/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 1, 2008 Filing 449 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Richhold Inc, re Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief #406 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss served on 1/30/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 1, 2008 Filing 448 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Richhold Inc, re Declaration (Motion related) #405 of Keith F Millhouse in Support of Motion to Dismiss served on 01/30/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 1, 2008 Filing 447 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Richhold Inc, re MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #404 served on 01/30/2008. (Millhouse, Keith)
February 1, 2008 Filing 446 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company, re MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #304 served on 01/23/08. (Evans, Gregory)
February 1, 2008 Filing 444 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Donald C. Nanney & Kevin M. Yopp of Gilchrist & Rutter in place of attorney Marea M. Suozzi, Esq. #246 served on January 18, 2008. (Yopp, Kevin)
February 1, 2008 Filing 443 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, re MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 #311 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #309 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #310 served on January 31, 2008. (Yopp, Kevin)
February 1, 2008 Filing 439 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found See Motion and Related Filings: Requests for Judicial Notice: RE Request for Judicial Notice #283 . (lom)
February 1, 2008 Filing 438 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found See Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties.: RE Miscellaneous Document #273 , #272 , #277 . (lom)
February 1, 2008 Filing 437 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found See Motion & Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related): RE MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Joinder in Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #263 . (lom)
February 1, 2008 Filing 436 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found See Other Filings: Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties: RE Corporate Disclosure Statement, #256 , #255 , #257 . (lom)
January 31, 2008 Filing 435 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc, Del Mar Avionics Inc, re Notice (Other), Notice (Other) #401 , Notice (Other) #400 served on January 29, 2008. (McGaw, Peter)
January 31, 2008 Filing 434 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc, Del Mar Avionics Inc, re Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related) #349 served on January 24, 2008. (McGaw, Peter)
January 31, 2008 Filing 432 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found See Motions and Related Filings: Requests for Judicial Notice: RE Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief, #248 . (lom)
January 31, 2008 Filing 431 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney William L Troutman, V counsel for Defendant Gambro Inc. Adding William L. Troutman as attorney as counsel of record for Gambro, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gambro, Inc. (Troutman, William)
January 31, 2008 Filing 430 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found See Other Filings: Notice for Certificate of Interested Parties: RE Corporate Disclosure Statement #235 . (lom)
January 31, 2008 Filing 429 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Texaco Inc, Union Oil Company of Califronia, re Joinder (Motion Related) #270 in Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereon; Declaration of Larry G. Gutterridge; Request for Judicial Notice; [Proposed] Order of Dismissal filed on 01/18/08 - Joinder was filed and served on 01/22/08. (McNevin, Christopher)
January 31, 2008 Filing 428 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found See Other Filings: Notice for Change of Attorney Information (G-06): RE Notice (Other) #205 . (lom)
January 30, 2008 Filing 526 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Lodging. Please see Other Filings: Notice for Notice of Lodging: RE #407 . (lom)
January 30, 2008 Filing 427 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Scripto-Tokai Corporation. (Hsiao, Peter)
January 30, 2008 Filing 426 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant International Paper Company, re MOTION to Dismiss Case #332 served on 01/23/08. (Alaverdi, Loura)
January 30, 2008 Filing 425 CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Evans, Gregory)
January 30, 2008 Filing 424 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Mico Inc, re Declaration (Motion related) #423 , MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder in Omega Motion #421 served on January 30, 2008. (Mergens, Michael)
January 30, 2008 Filing 423 DECLARATION of Michael J. Mergens in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder in Omega Motion #421 filed by Defendant Mico Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mergens, Michael)
January 30, 2008 Filing 422 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Docket text is incomplete. See: "Proof" Of Service : RE Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #195 . (lom)
January 30, 2008 Filing 421 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder in Omega Motion filed by Defendant Mico Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mergens, Michael)
January 30, 2008 Filing 415 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Keith F. Millhouse in place of attorney Kenneth Mennemeir; Mennemeier, Glassman & Stroud filed by Defendant George Industries. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Request for Approval of Substitution)(Millhouse, Keith)
January 30, 2008 Filing 412 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Declaration should be linked to the Ex Parte Application: RE Declaration (Motion related) #189 . (lom)
January 30, 2008 Filing 411 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Opposition should be linked to the Ex Parte Application: RE MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #188 . (lom)
January 30, 2008 Filing 410 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Attorney Information is missing from Title Page. Also, Judge Hatter's initial should be next to the case number: RE Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 days), #192 , #190 , #191 . (lom)
January 30, 2008 Filing 409 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Attorney Information is missing from Title Page. Also, Judge Hatter's initial should be next to the case number: RE Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 days), #178 , #179 , #183 , #185 , #182 , #180 , #187 , #186 , #184 , #181 . (lom)
January 30, 2008 Filing 408 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Richhold Inc. (Millhouse, Keith)
January 30, 2008 Filing 407 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint filed by Defendant Richhold Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Millhouse, Keith)
January 30, 2008 Filing 406 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #404 filed by Defendant Richhold Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit General Notice Letter)(Millhouse, Keith)
January 30, 2008 Filing 405 DECLARATION of Keith F Millhouse In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #404 filed by Defendant Richhold Inc. (Millhouse, Keith)
January 30, 2008 Filing 404 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Richhold Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Millhouse, Keith)
January 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: re Notice of appearance of counsel; answer of defendant, the document is not to be filed, but instead rejected, and ordered returned to counsel, pursuant to GO-08. Counsel shall immediately notify, in writing, all parties previously served with the attached documents that said documents have not bee filed with the court by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (lom)
January 29, 2008 Filing 402 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendant Scripto-Tokai Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hsiao, Peter)
January 29, 2008 Filing 401 NOTICE of Change of Corporate Name by Defendant Yellow Freight Systems, Inc. filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc, Del Mar Avionics Inc. (McGaw, Peter)
January 29, 2008 Filing 400 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc, Del Mar Avionics Inc. (McGaw, Peter)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, granting Request to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney Lauren S. McAndrews #295 . (lom)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, granting Request for Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney Todd E. Solodar #293 . (lom)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Laura J. Carroll & Jeffrey D. Wexler in place of attorney Larry G. Gutterridge & Keith F. Millhouse #267 . (lom)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, granting Request to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney John T. Kuelbs #296 . (lom)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney #232 . The request of Defendant The Sherwin-williams Company to substitute Gregory Evans, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP in place and stead of Joseph C. Owens, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (lom)
January 28, 2008 Filing 399 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, re MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Joinder in Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss #263 served on 01/28/2008. (Lucero, Gene)
January 28, 2008 Filing 398 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, re Certificate of Interested Parties #292 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief #289 , Declaration (Motion related) #291 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #284 , Notice of Lodging #298 revised proof of service served on 01/28/08. (Holzer, Stephen)
January 28, 2008 Filing 397 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief, #396 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #395 to Dismiss filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation and the Sorkin Parties served on 01/28/2008. (James, Kenneth)
January 28, 2008 Filing 396 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Defendant McKesson Corporation OF ALL CLAIMS FILED AGAINST McKESSON #244 In Support of Opposition to Defendant McKesson' Corporation and the Sorkin Parties' FRCP 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - K)(James, Kenneth)
January 28, 2008 Filing 395 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Defendant McKesson Corporation OF ALL CLAIMS FILED AGAINST McKESSON #244 and The Sorkin Parties' FRCP 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (James, Kenneth)
January 28, 2008 Filing 394 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Attorney information is missing from the document. Also, Judge Hatter's initials should be next to the case number: RE Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 days) #160 . (lom)
January 28, 2008 Filing 393 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found, Attorney information is missing on the face page of the document: RE Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) #157 . (lom)
January 28, 2008 Filing 392 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Attorney information is missing. Also, Judge Hatter's initials should be next to the case no: RE Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 days) #154 . (lom)
January 28, 2008 Filing 391 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John C. Lender on behalf of Defendant Loma Linda University (Lender, John)
January 28, 2008 Filing 390 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 and affirmative defenses filed by defendant Loma Linda University.(Lender, John)
January 28, 2008 Filing 389 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kavita Paul Lesser counsel for Defendant Macy's West. Adding Kavita Lesser as attorney as counsel of record for Macy's West for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Macy's West (Lesser, Kavita)
January 28, 2008 Filing 388 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kavita Paul Lesser counsel for Defendant Macy's West. Catherine Mitchell will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Catherine Mitchell is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Macy's West (Lesser, Kavita)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Donald C. Nanney & Kevin M. Yopp of Gilchrist & Rutter for Defendant Walt Disney Pictures and Television in place of attorney Marea M. Suozzi, Esq. #246 . (lom)
January 25, 2008 Filing 387 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, re Certificate of Interested Parties #292 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief #289 , Declaration (Motion related) #291 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #284 , Notice of Lodging #298 served on 01/25/2008. (Holzer, Stephen)
January 25, 2008 Filing 386 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Brian Kelley Washington counsel for Defendant Firmenich Incorporated. Christine K. Son is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Firmenich Incorporated (Washington, Brian)
January 25, 2008 Filing 380 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Vopak Distribution Americas Corporation. correcting MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #305 by attaching Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schenck, Leslie)
January 25, 2008 Filing 378 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Vopak Distribution Americas Corporation, re MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #305 served on 1/23/08. (Schenck, Leslie)
January 25, 2008 Filing 377 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, re Miscellaneous Document #364 Proof of Service Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company's Certification as to Interested Parties served on 1/25/08. (Brugger, Gregg)
January 25, 2008 Filing 376 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, re MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 #361 Proof of Service of [Proposed] Order Granting Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company's Motion to Dismiss served on 1/25/08. (Brugger, Gregg)
January 25, 2008 Filing 375 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, re MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 #361 served on 1/25/08. (Brugger, Gregg)
January 25, 2008 Filing 374 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, re MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 #361 served on 1/25/08. (Brugger, Gregg)
January 25, 2008 Filing 373 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected, See Motion and Related Filings: Requests for Substitute Attorney (G-01): RE MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney John T. Kuelbs #296 . (lom)
January 25, 2008 Filing 372 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected, See Motion and Related Filings: Requests for Substitute Attorney (G-01): RE MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney Lauren S. McAndrews #295 . (lom)
January 25, 2008 Filing 371 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Hexcel Corporation, served on 01/25/2008. (Finch, Amber)
January 25, 2008 Filing 370 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected, See Motion and Related Filings: Requests for Substitute Attorney (G-01): RE MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney Todd E. Solodar #293 . (lom)
January 25, 2008 Filing 369 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hexcel Corporation. (Finch, Amber)
January 25, 2008 Filing 368 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation. (Finch, Amber)
January 25, 2008 Filing 367 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 filed by Defendant Crosby & Overton Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Prayongratana, Marissa)
January 25, 2008 Filing 366 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amber Finch#2 Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint)(Finch, Amber)
January 25, 2008 Filing 365 NOTICE Declaration of Paul La Scala filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. Pursuant to General Order No. 07-08 (La Scala, Paul)
January 24, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Ryan S Landis, Christian Volz is 213-243-6330. (lom)
January 24, 2008 FAX number for Attorney John L Kortum, Peter W McGaw is 925-930-6620. (lom)
January 24, 2008 Filing 445 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: Adding Nancy M Wilms for McKesson Corporation as attorney as counsel of record for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant McKesson Corporation (cbr)
January 24, 2008 Filing 442 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: Adding Mary El Wilke for McKesson Corporation and Havery Sorkin as attorney as counsel of record for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants McKesson Corporation, Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin (cbr)
January 24, 2008 Filing 441 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: Adding John D Edgcomb for McKesson Corporation and Havery Sorkin as attorney as counsel of record for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants McKesson Corporation, Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin (cbr)
January 24, 2008 Filing 440 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: Adding Courtney M LeBoeuf for McKesson Corporation and Havery Sorkin as attorney as counsel of record for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants McKesson Corporation, Havery Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, The Estate of Paul Maslin (cbr)
January 24, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Donald C Nanney, Kevin M Yopp is (310) 394-4700. (lom)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Patricia M. O'Toole in place of attorney William E. Matsumura #233 . Substituting attorney Patricia M O'Toole for Pacific Bell Telephone Company in place and stead of attorney William E Matsumura. (ps)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Keith F. Millhouse, Millhouse Law Group in place of attorney Burke, Williams & Sorensen #241 . Substituting attorney Keith F Millhouse for Hilton Hotels Corporation in place and stead of attorneys Daphne M Anneet and Ellen J Shadur. (ps)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER that Defendant Shell Oil Company shall file its response to the complaint on or before 1/23/08 by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr: re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #204 . (lom)
January 24, 2008 Filing 364 Certification as to Interested Parties filed by Defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company (Brugger, Gregg)
January 24, 2008 Filing 363 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants NMB Technologies Corp, International Rectifier Corporation. (Cohen, Albert)
January 24, 2008 Filing 362 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc, re MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #355 , Certificate of Interested Parties #360 served on January 24, 2008. (Sanders, Matthew)
January 24, 2008 Filing 361 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 filed by defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Declaration Declaration of Gregg W. Brugger)(Brugger, Gregg)
January 24, 2008 Filing 360 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc. (Sanders, Matthew)
January 24, 2008 Filing 359 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Laura J. Carroll & Jeffrey D. Wexler in place of attorney Larry G. Gutterridge & Keith F. Millhouse #267 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, #256 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation) #268 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, #257 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, #255 served on January 24, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2008 Filing 358 Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP (Khosroabadi, Rahil)
January 24, 2008 Filing 357 Certificate as to Interested Parties filed by Defendant Southern California Edison Co re: MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #355 (Delorme, Lisa)
January 24, 2008 Filing 356 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 / Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants NMB Technologies Corp, International Rectifier Corporation. (Cohen, Albert)
January 24, 2008 Filing 355 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration #2 Proposed Order)(Sanders, Matthew)
January 24, 2008 Filing 354 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dow Chemical Company, re Certificate of Interested Parties #352 , Declaration (Motion related) #350 , Motion Related Document #353 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #348 served on 01/24/08. (Landis, Ryan)
January 24, 2008 Filing 353 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS re MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #348 filed by Defendant Dow Chemical Company. (Landis, Ryan)
January 24, 2008 Filing 352 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dow Chemical Company. (Landis, Ryan)
January 24, 2008 Filing 351 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Attorney for Defendant Southern California Edison Co. (Delorme, Lisa)
January 24, 2008 Filing 350 DECLARATION of Ryan S. Landis In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #348 filed by Defendant Dow Chemical Company. (Landis, Ryan)
January 24, 2008 Filing 349 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc, Del Mar Avionics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGaw, Peter)
January 24, 2008 Filing 348 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Dow Chemical Dow Chemical Company. (Landis, Ryan)
January 24, 2008 Filing 347 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc, re Notice of Lodging #340 served on 1/24/08. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodging#2 Proposed Order Re Dismissal)(Biason, Diana)
January 24, 2008 Filing 345 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Dismissing Complaint Against Hexion Speciality Chemicals Proposed Order filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc..Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (La Scala, Paul)
January 24, 2008 Filing 344 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (La Scala, Paul)
January 24, 2008 Filing 343 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #342 filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(La Scala, Paul)
January 24, 2008 Filing 342 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc..Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (La Scala, Paul)
January 23, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Loura L Alaverdi, John F Cermak, Sonja A Inglin is 310-820-8859. (lom)
January 23, 2008 FAX number for Attorney(s) Alex R Baghdassarian, Daniel Casey Flaherty is 213-896-2450. (lom)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, re Stipulation Extending Time of Defendant Huntington Park Stamp Co to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, in not to be filed, but instead rejected, and is ordered returned to counsel; per GO 07-08, case is designated for electronic filing. (lom)
January 23, 2008 Filing 341 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc, re MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authoritiees Thereon #316 , Certificate of Interested Parties #330 , Declaration (Motion related) #318 , Notice of Lodging #340 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief #334 served on 01/23/08. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss#2 Declaration of Belynda Reck In Support of Notice of Mot. and Mot. to Dismiss#3 Proposed Order Re Motion to Dismiss#4 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Mot. to Dismiss#5 Certification of Interested Parties#6 Notice of Lodging)(Biason, Diana)
January 23, 2008 Filing 340 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint Without Prejudice as to All Claims Against Defendant Alcoa Inc.)(Biason, Diana)
January 23, 2008 Filing 339 REQUEST to Substitute attorney William L. Troutman in place of attorney Christopher J. Heck filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando)
January 23, 2008 Filing 338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc, re Memorandum in Support of Motion #336 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 served on 01/23/2008. (Silva, Beverlee)
January 23, 2008 Filing 337 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando)
January 23, 2008 Filing 336 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case #333 filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. (Silva, Beverlee)
January 23, 2008 Filing 335 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando)
January 23, 2008 Filing 334 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authoritiees Thereon #316 filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Biason, Diana)
January 23, 2008 Filing 333 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Silva, Beverlee)
January 23, 2008 Filing 332 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant International Paper Company.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Loura L. Alaverdi In Support Of Defendant International Paper Co's Motion To Dismiss#2 Certification As To Interested Parties Of Defendant International Paper Company)(Inglin, Sonja)
January 23, 2008 Filing 331 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 pos re Interested Parties)(Parker, Joseph)
January 23, 2008 Filing 330 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Biason, Diana)
January 23, 2008 Filing 329 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #320 , Certificate of Interested Parties #325 served on 01/23/2008. (Cuttino, Jocelyn)
January 23, 2008 Filing 328 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Maxwell's Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC's and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Request for Judicial Notice#2 POS re Joinder of Motion; Joinder of Request Judicial Notice)(Parker, Joseph)
January 23, 2008 Filing 327 DECLARATION of Michael R. Leslie in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al.; and Notice of Joinder in Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al. #321 filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Tholen, Sandra)
January 23, 2008 Filing 326 NOTICE of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss of Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Flaherty, Daniel)
January 23, 2008 Filing 325 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc. (Cuttino, Jocelyn)
January 23, 2008 Filing 324 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maxwell Technologies Inc answer now due 1/23/2008, filed by Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc.(Parker, Joseph)
January 23, 2008 Filing 323 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties Certification of Interested Parties Pursuant to L.R. 7.1-1 filed by Defendant BASF Corporation (Flaherty, Daniel)
January 23, 2008 Filing 322 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to NMB Technologies Corp answer now due 1/24/2007; International Rectifier Corporation answer now due 1/24/2007, filed by Defendants NMB Technologies Corp; International Rectifier Corporation.(Cohen, Albert)
January 23, 2008 Filing 321 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al.; and Notice of Joinder in Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al. filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order (1) Granting Shell Oil Company's Request for Joinder and (2) Granting Shell Oil Company's Motion to Dismiss)(Tholen, Sandra)
January 23, 2008 Filing 320 ANSWER filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc.(Cuttino, Jocelyn)
January 23, 2008 Filing 319 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Signet Armorlite Inc, Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, re Miscellaneous Document #273 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #302 , Miscellaneous Document #277 , Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief, #301 , Miscellaneous Document #272 , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereon #300 served on 1/23/2008. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
January 23, 2008 Filing 318 DECLARATION of Belynda Reck In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authoritiees Thereon #316 filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Biason, Diana)
January 23, 2008 Filing 317 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al.; and Notice of Joinder in Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al. filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Tholen, Sandra)
January 23, 2008 Filing 316 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authoritiees Thereon filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Biason, Diana)
January 23, 2008 Filing 315 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Tholen, Sandra)
January 23, 2008 Filing 314 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Yort Inc. (Prince, Christopher)
January 23, 2008 Filing 313 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP LLC'S AND OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by attorney for defendant Yort Inc. (Prince, Christopher)
January 23, 2008 Filing 312 STATEMENT Defendant Univar USA INC's Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Vopak Distribution Americas Corporation (Schenck, Leslie)
January 23, 2008 Filing 311 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #261 filed by Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Yopp, Kevin)
January 23, 2008 Filing 310 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Certification Regarding Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walt Disney Pictures and Television (Yopp, Kevin)
January 23, 2008 Filing 309 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Certification Regarding Interested Parties filed by Defendant Universal City Studios Inc (Yopp, Kevin)
January 23, 2008 Filing 308 REQUEST for Joinder in Request for Judicial Notice,, #262 filed by Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, et al. filed by defendant Vopak Distribution Americas Corporation.Request set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Schenck, Leslie)
January 23, 2008 Filing 307 DECLARATION of Leslie Schenck In Support of Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #305 filed by Defendant Vopak Distribution Americas Corporation. (Schenck, Leslie)
January 23, 2008 Filing 306 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, re First Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #276 served on 1/23/08. (Brugger, Gregg)
January 23, 2008 Filing 305 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by defendant Vopak Distribution Americas Corporation.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Schenck, Leslie)
January 23, 2008 Filing 304 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Evans, Gregory)
January 22, 2008 Filing 303 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company.Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia M. O'Toole in Support of Motion to Dismiss#2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Patricia M. O'Toole#3 Proposed Order #4 Proof of Service (by U.S. mail))(O'Toole, Patricia)
January 22, 2008 Filing 302 DECLARATION of Evelyn F. Heidelberg In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereon #300 filed by Defendants Signet Armorlite Inc, Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
January 22, 2008 Filing 301 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereon #300 filed by Defendants Signet Armorlite Inc, Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heidelberg, Evelyn)
January 22, 2008 Filing 300 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereon filed by Defendants Signet Armorlite Inc, Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn)
January 22, 2008 Filing 299 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Ratheon Company, AlliedSignal Inc, Boeing North American Inc, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, re Request for Judicial Notice,,,, Request for Relief,,, #283 , Certificate of Interested Parties #271 , MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by McDonnell Douglas Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of The Boeing Company; The Boeing Company, as successor in interest to Boeing North American, Inc.; Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., as successor in interest to #279 , Certificate of Interested Parties #274 served on 1/22/2008. (Feng, Wendy)
January 22, 2008 Filing 298 NOTICE OF LODGING filed proposed order granting motion to dismiss (Holzer, Stephen)
January 22, 2008 Filing 297 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Teledyne Industries Inc, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, Air Products and Chemicals Inc, re MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney John T. Kuelbs #296 , MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney Lauren S. McAndrews #295 , MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney Todd E. Solodar #293 served on 01/22/2008. (Patel, Kavita)
January 22, 2008 Filing 296 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney John T. Kuelbs filed by Defendant Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. (Patel, Kavita)
January 22, 2008 Filing 295 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney Lauren S. McAndrews filed by Defendant Teledyne Industries Inc. (Patel, Kavita)
January 22, 2008 Filing 294 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Macy's West. (Lesser, Kavita)
January 22, 2008 Filing 293 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute attorney James J. Dragna and Kavita M. Patel in place of attorney Todd E. Solodar filed by Defendant Air Products and Chemicals Inc. (Patel, Kavita)
January 22, 2008 Filing 292 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Holzer, Stephen)
January 22, 2008 Filing 291 DECLARATION of STEPHEN T. HOLZER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Case #284 filed by Defendant Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Holzer, Stephen)
January 22, 2008 Filing 290 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Teledyne Industries Inc, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, Air Products and Chemicals Inc, GSF Energy LLC, re Notice of Appearance #282 , Certificate of Interested Parties #286 served on 01/22/2008. (Patel, Kavita)
January 22, 2008 Filing 289 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case #284 filed by Defendant Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Holzer, Stephen)