MGA Entertainment Inc et al v. The Hartford Insurance Group
Plaintiff: MGA Entertainment Inc and Isaac Larian
Defendant: The Hartford Insurance Group
Case Number: 5:2008cv00457
Filed: April 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Oswald Parada
Presiding Judge: Virginia A. Phillips
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge David O. Carter, re Notice of Settlement 781 (mt)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: RULING ON MOTIONS: The Court: (1) GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Evanston Defendants' Motion for Relief from Judgment (Dkt. 636); (2) DENIES the Evanston Defendants' Motion of Leave to File Amended An swer and Cross-Claims (Dkt. 633); and (3) GRANTS the Lexington Defendants' Motion to Clarify and Amend Order (Dkt. 590) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company (National), Chartis Specialty Insurance Company (Chartis) (collectively, Umbrella Insurers), and Lexington Insurance Company (Lexington). Because the parties are familiar with the facts of the case, the Court does not recount them here. (See document for further details.) (rla)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting 323 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See document for details.) Court GRANTS the Excess Insurers' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court finds that the Excess Insurers owed no duty to defend and that the bad faith counterclaim fails as a matter of law. Thus, the counterclaim is dismissed with prejudice. (rla)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: (1) Granting in part and Denying in part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment No. 1 regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Certain Costs 357 ; and (2) Denying Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment No. 3 for Offset 364 . (mt)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING MOTION TO AMEND ORDER re: Response (non-motion) 508 . See minute order for more information. (twdb)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 485 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE, RESCHEDULE HEARINGS, AND SET TRIAL DATES by Judge David O. Carter: If any party plans to raise an issue at trial and that issue has not been designated by this Order as appropriate for a bench or jury trial, that party shall file a proposed amendment to this Order on or before February 6, 2012. I. Hearings on Remaining Summary Judgment Motions: (Dkts. 320, 323, 333, 342). The Court RESCHEDULES the hearings for these motions to February 21, 2012, at 1:30 p.m. Accordingly, the hearing set for February 13, 2012, is removed from the calendar. The FIRST BENCH TRIAL (Phase 1) will commence on March 13, 2012, regarding whether: (1) the AIG Defendants owed the MGA Plaintiffs a duty to defend under the FAAC; (2)D efendant Crum & Forster owed the MGA Plaintiffs a duty to defend under the FAAC; and (3) theEvanston Defendants have an alter ego relationship. If the Evanston Defendants stipulate to a benchtrial on the duty to defend, the trial of the Evanston Defe ndants' duty to defend will also commence on March 13, 2012. All direct testimony in Phase 1 shall be conducted by written declarations filed with this Court on or before March 8, 2012. A JURY TRIAL (Phase 2) will commence on April 3, 2012, reg arding whether: (See document for further details.) The Court believes that the MGA Plaintiffs' claims against the two groups of insurers is appropriately tried together. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the AIG Defendants to SHOW CAUSE why they sh ould be severed from the Evanston Defendants for the April 3, 2012, jury trial on whether either group of insurers committed a tortious breach of the covenant of good faith. The AIG Defendants shall file a Response to this OSC on or before February 6 , 2012. The MGA Plaintiffs and/or the Evanston Defendants shall file an Opposition, if at all, on or before February 10, 2012. The AIG Defendants shall file a Reply on or before February 14, 2012. The Court SCHEDULES the hearing for this OSC on February 21, 2012 at 12:30 p.m. (rla)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge David O. Carter: SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Court issues an Order to Show Cause as to why the BelAir action (CV 10-2355) should not be transferred to the Southern District of New York.The Court requests simultaneous briefing on this issue, limited to five-pages, to be due no later than Monday, July 25, 2011 at noon. (rla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MGA Entertainment Inc et al v. The Hartford Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MGA Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Larian
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?