Cecil Shaw v. Jar-Ramona Plaza LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Shaw
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc, Grocery Outlet Hemet # 100 Inc, Grocery Outlet Inc, Jar-Ramona Plaza LLC, Leslie's Pollmart Inc, Mehnga Foods Inc and Radio Shack Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv01563
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendant Jar-Ramona Plaza's Motion for Attorneys' Fees 119 is DENIED. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 117 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant, JAR-Ramona Plaza, LLC, as to all claims filed by Plaintiff Cecil Shaw. (2) Defendant JAR-Ramona Plaza, LLC is the prevailing party in this litigation and is entitled to its costs, including its costs on appeal. (3) This Judgment shall be amended to reflect the amount of any costs, including, if applicable, any attorneys' fees, subsequently ordered by this Court. (gk)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST DEFENDANT JAR-RAMONA (dkt. 98-1, filed Jan. 28, 2015) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court DENIES plaintiffs motion for summary judgment 98 . (pj)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: denying 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (rne)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby DENIES Jar-Ramona's motion to strike certain allegations from the First Amended Complaint and also DENIES Jar-Ramona's motion to sever and dismiss based on misjoinder 58 . Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cecil Shaw v. Jar-Ramona Plaza LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet Hemet # 100 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet Inc
Represented By: Adam Benner Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jar-Ramona Plaza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie's Pollmart Inc
Represented By: Adrianus Scott Ruygrok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehnga Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radio Shack Corporation
Represented By: Alden J Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Shaw
Represented By: Tanya Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?