Blumenthal Distributing, Inc. d/b/a Office Star et al v. Herman Miller, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. and Blumenthal Distributing, Inc.
Defendant: Herman Miller, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv01926
Filed: September 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A. Kronstadt
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 420 FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (SEE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Judgment is entered against Herman Miller and in favor of Office Star as to the unprotectability of the asserted registered and unregistered Aeron chair trade dresses, except that th e Court is without subject matter to enter judgment as to the Posture Fit versio of the Aeron chair trade dress. Judgment is entered against Herman Miller and in favor of the Office Star as to the validity of U.S. Trademark Registered No. 2,754,826. The Jury's Verdict as to lack of secondary meaning is vacated, and judgment is entered in Herman Miller's favor as to secondary meaning. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (SEE JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS OF NOTICE OF REGISTRATION (Dkt. 353 ; PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS OF NO. 1 INVALIDITY OF ASSERTED EA MES TRADE DRESSES (Dkt. 374 ); PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS OF NO. 2 INFRINGEMENT, DILUTION AND WILLFULNESS (Dkt. 375 ); PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS O F NO. 3 DAMAGES (Dkt. 376 ); DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS OF FED.R.CIV.P. 50(a) (Dkt. 332 ); DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION WITH RESPECT TO THE EAMES TRADE DRESS (Dkt. 379 ); DEFENDANT� 39;S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS OF TRADE DRESS VALIDITY, AND A NEW TRIAL ON INFRINGEMENT (Dkt. 380 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Office Star's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to damages is GRANTED IN PART, a s to remittitur for dilution damages, and DENIED IN PART as to all other requests. Office Star's remaining Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law are DENIED. Herman Miller's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is GRANTED IN PART. Herm an Miller's Motion for Judgment and Permanent Injunction is GRANTED IN PART. On or before August 8, 2017, Herman Miller shall file a statement as to whether it will accept the remitter or request a new trial as to dilution damages. On or before August 15, 2017, counsel shall meet and confer to seek to reach an agreement on a proposed judgment for entry in this matter. (ah)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OFLAW ON THE BASIS OF NO. 1 INVALIDITY OF ASSERTED EAMESTRADE DRESSES 374 ; PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS OF NO. 2 INFRINGEMENT, DIL UTION AND WILLFULNESS 375 ; PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS OF NO. 3 DAMAGES 376 ; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION WITH RESPECT TO THE EAMES TRADE DRESS 379 ; and DEFENDANT' S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON THE BASIS OF TRADE DRESS VALIDITY, AND A NEW TRIAL ONINFRINGEMENT 380 held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The motion hearing is held. Counsel address the issues raised by the Court with respect to Pla intiff's Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law (the "Plaintiff's Motions"), and Defendant's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (the "Defendant's Motions"). Counsel address the Court. The Court takes Plaintiff's Motions and Defendant's Motions UNDER SUBMISSION and will issue a written ruling. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (pso)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blumenthal Distributing, Inc. d/b/a Office Star et al v. Herman Miller, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Represented By: David A Dillard
Represented By: Edward R Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blumenthal Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: David A Dillard
Represented By: Edward R Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Miller, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?