Amery Gaspard et al v. DEA Task Force et al
Plaintiff: Amery Gaspard and Yvonne Hrindich
Defendant: City of Ontario, City of San Bernardino, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, DEA Task Force, Does, Joseph A Farrow, B Karmann, John McMahon, Chuck Rosenburg, Stanley Sniff and Thornburg
Case Number: 5:2015cv01802
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Scott
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Adopting Feb. 27, 2019 R&R (Doc 162 ) by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. The Feb. 27, 2019 Report & Recommendation 162 is ADOPTED: San Bernardino County's motion for judgment [106 is denied. San Bernardino County's request for judicial notice 107 is GRANTED. The consolidated case remains open and referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for pre-trial matters. (See document for details.) (sbou)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Accepting Findings and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, the Court has reviewed the pleadings and records on file herein, the original Report and Recommenda tion, and the Amended Report and Recommendation [Final] of the United States Magistrate Judge. Further, the Court has engaged in a de novo review of those portions of the original Report and Recommendation to which objections have been made. The Cour t accepts the findings and recommendations of theMagistrate Judge. IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that all claims against (i) the Individual SBPD Defendants,1, (ii) Chuck Rosenburg, and (iii) Ernest Lee Cartwright are dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution. See document for footnote #1. (lwag)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Accepting Findings, Conclusions and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that (1) the following claims (listed in order) are dismissed without leave to amend and with pr ejudice and (2) the following remaining claims (listed in order) are dismissed with leave to amend. If Plaintiffs' wish to pursue the above-noted claims, Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ("SAC") shall be due within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of the District Court's Order. See document for further information. (lwag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amery Gaspard et al v. DEA Task Force et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ontario
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Bernardino
Represented By: Jason Michael Ewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Riverside
Represented By: Arthur Kenneth Cunningham
Represented By: Wai Hung Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Bernardino
Represented By: Laura Lynn Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEA Task Force
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Karmann
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McMahon
Represented By: Laura Lynn Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Rosenburg
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Sniff
Represented By: Arthur Kenneth Cunningham
Represented By: Wai Hung Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thornburg
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amery Gaspard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Hrindich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?