Gustavo Castro Zamudio v. Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Gustavo Castro Zamudio
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv02203
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Abrams
Presiding Judge: John F. Walter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. Pursuant to the Order accepting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 31 , IT IS ADJUDGED that the Complaint in this matter is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ch)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. NO LATER THAN JUNE 27, 2017, plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Filing of one of the two required documents, and compliance wit h the additional requirements set forth in the October 26, 2016, Order, shall be deemed compliance with this Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff's failure to timely respond to this Order shall result in dismissal of this action. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ch)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Pursuant to this Court's Order of October 26, 2016 8 , the parties were to notify the Court by May 3, 2017, through the lodging of a proposed Judgment, if a voluntary remand was bein g accepted in this case. To date, neither of these documents has been received by the Court. Accordingly, no later than May 18, 2017, plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gustavo Castro Zamudio v. Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Castro Zamudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?