Keana Fisher v. Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles
Plaintiff: Keana Fisher
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles
Case Number: 5:2016cv02479
Filed: December 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Filing 37 TRANSMITTAL of documents to SAN MATEO SUPERIOR COURT-SOUTHERN BRANCH-HALL OF JUSTICE. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to SAN MATEO SUPERIOR COURT-SOUTHERN BRANCH-HALL OF JUSTICE, Redwood City, CA 16CIV01521. (lc)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1. That this case is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court for the Stateof California, County of San Mateo, Case no. 16 CIV01521. 2. Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #27 is DISMISSED AS MOOT, vacated, and taken off calendar. 3. Plaintiffs Motion for Remand #29 is DISMISSED AS MOOT,vacated, and taken off calendar. 4. No sanctions or attorneys fees related to the removal of this case or the remand of this case or the proceedings in this Court are awarded to any party. Each party shall bear its own costs.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
January 6, 2017 Filing 35 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Entire Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(c) #27 filed by Defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Kim in support of Reply in support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Kim, Benjamin)
January 6, 2017 Filing 34 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Remand Case to State Court)(Kim, Benjamin)
January 3, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:ONLY ATTACHMENTS of exhibits to Greenstone Declaration, #32 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Filer attached exhibits with active electronic headers from prior efilings, thus clashing with current efiling headers, thus making these electronic headers illegible. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 30, 2016 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Mark S. Greenstone re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #31 filed by Plaintiff Keana Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mocek v. Allsaints USA Ltd. Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in Missouri Action, #3 Exhibit 3 - Missouri Action Order)(Greenstone, Mark)
December 30, 2016 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Entire Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(c) #27 filed by Plaintiff Keana Fisher. (Greenstone, Mark)
December 29, 2016 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Mark S. Greenstone In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Mateo County Superior Court #29 filed by Plaintiff Keana Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order Dismissing Missouri Action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mocek v. Allsaints USA Ltd. Opinion and Order)(Greenstone, Mark)
December 29, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Mateo County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Keana Fisher. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Greenstone, Mark)
December 19, 2016 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Entire Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(c) #27 filed by Defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kim, Benjamin)
December 19, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Entire Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(c) filed by Defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kim, Benjamin)
December 1, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 1, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
December 1, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:16-cv-05882-RS, from USDC Northern District of California (San Francisco). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 5:16-cv-02479-ODW (KKx). (et)
December 1, 2016 Filing 23 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
November 29, 2016 Transferring case electronically to the Central District of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #17 Motion to Transfer Case. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 21 Statement of Non-Opposition re #17 MOTION to Transfer Case Motion to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byEnterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/18/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 20 Declaration of Deborah Meredith in Support of #17 MOTION to Transfer Case Motion to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byEnterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/1/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion as to #17 MOTION to Transfer Case Motion to Transfer Venue . Motion Hearing previously set for 12/8/2016 Continued to 12/15/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #17 MOTION to Transfer Case Motion to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/1/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to Transfer Case Motion to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/15/2016. Replies due by 11/22/2016. (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/1/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 27, 2016 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/27/16. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 26, 2016 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Keana Fisher.. (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/25/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 24, 2016 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is given that the hearing re: #6 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities is continued to 11/30/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 20, 2016 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles.. (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/20/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles re #9 Answer to Complaint (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/18/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint byEnterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/18/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #7 Declaration in Support, (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/14/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 7 Declaration of Deborah Meredith in Support of #6 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byEnterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/14/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/28/2016. Replies due by 11/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/14/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 12, 2016 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2017. Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, Proof of Service of Notice of Removal, Certificate of Interested Parties and Disclosure Statement (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/11/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 7.1 (Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/11/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331 and 1441(c) (Federal Question Jurisdiction) with Exhibits A and B from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 16CIV01521. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-10841380). Filed byEnterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kim, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/11/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/1/2016.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keana Fisher v. Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-a-Car Company of Los Angeles
Represented By: Benjamin Juhyeok Kim
Represented By: Melissa Katherine Zonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keana Fisher
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?